|
29.09.2016 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.09.2016 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.09.2016 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.09.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.09.2016 |
English translation of the claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.09.2016 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.09.2016 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.09.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.08.2016 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.08.2016 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.08.2016 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.08.2016 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
12.08.2016 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.07.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.07.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.07.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.07.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.06.2016 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.06.2016 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.06.2016 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
23 |
|
07.06.2016 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.06.2016 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.06.2016 |
F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) |
Appeal |
14 |
|
08.04.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.04.2016 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
25 |
|
05.04.2016 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
25 |
|
01.04.2016 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
14 |
|
01.04.2016 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
14 |
|
29.03.2016 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
02.03.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.02.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.02.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.02.2016 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.02.2016 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.12.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.12.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.12.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.12.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.12.2015 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.12.2015 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.12.2015 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.12.2015 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.10.2015 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.01.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.01.2014 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
23.01.2014 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
10.01.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.08.2013 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.08.2013 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.07.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.06.2013 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
28.06.2013 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
28.06.2013 |
Request for change of name -opponent |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.06.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.06.2013 |
Request for change of name -opponent |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.03.2013 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.11.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.11.2012 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.11.2012 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
19 |
|
16.11.2012 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
19 |
|
16.11.2012 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
16.11.2012 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
10 |
|
29.10.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.10.2012 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.10.2012 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.10.2012 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.10.2012 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
32 |
|
17.10.2012 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
32 |
|
17.09.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.07.2012 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.07.2012 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.07.2012 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
10.07.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.07.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.06.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.06.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.06.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.06.2012 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.06.2012 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.06.2012 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.06.2012 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
25.06.2012 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.06.2012 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.06.2012 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.06.2012 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.06.2012 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.06.2012 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.06.2012 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.06.2012 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.06.2012 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.06.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.06.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.06.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.06.2012 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.06.2012 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.06.2012 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.06.2012 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.06.2012 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.06.2012 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.06.2012 |
Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.05.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.05.2012 |
Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.05.2012 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.05.2012 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.05.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.05.2012 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.2012 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.05.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
8 |
|
08.05.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
07.05.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
8 |
|
07.05.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.05.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.05.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
16.04.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.04.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.03.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.03.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.03.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.03.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.03.2012 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
13.03.2012 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.03.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.03.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.07.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.06.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
10.06.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.05.2011 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.05.2011 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
16.05.2011 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.05.2011 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.04.2011 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
3 |
|
30.04.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.04.2011 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.04.2011 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.04.2011 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
17 |
|
07.04.2011 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
07.04.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
07.04.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
07.04.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
07.04.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
07.04.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
40 |
|
07.04.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.04.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
07.04.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
43 |
|
10.06.2010 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.05.2010 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.05.2010 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.05.2010 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.04.2010 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.03.2010 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.03.2010 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.03.2010 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.03.2010 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
10.12.2009 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.10.2009 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2008 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.11.2008 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.01.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.01.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.01.2008 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.01.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
30.10.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.10.2007 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.08.2007 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2007 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.12.2005 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.12.2005 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.01.2005 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.01.2005 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.01.2004 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.01.2004 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.01.2004 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.01.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.10.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.09.2003 |
Communication regarding the Extended European Search Report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.08.2003 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.08.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.08.2003 |
Description |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
22.08.2003 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.08.2003 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.08.2003 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
7 |