|
08.09.2016 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.09.2016 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.09.2016 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.08.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.08.2016 |
English translation of the claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.08.2016 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.08.2016 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.08.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.05.2016 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
4 |
|
25.05.2016 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
25.05.2016 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.05.2016 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.05.2016 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.01.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.01.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.01.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.01.2016 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.01.2016 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.01.2016 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
25.01.2016 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.01.2016 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
25.01.2016 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
25.01.2016 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.01.2016 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.01.2016 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.01.2016 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.01.2016 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.01.2016 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.01.2016 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.01.2016 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
25.01.2016 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.11.2015 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.09.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.09.2015 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.08.2015 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.08.2015 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.08.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.07.2015 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.06.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.06.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.06.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.06.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.06.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.06.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.06.2015 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
01.06.2015 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
01.06.2015 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
7 |
|
01.06.2015 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
7 |
|
01.06.2015 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.06.2015 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.05.2015 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.05.2015 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.05.2015 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.05.2015 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.05.2015 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.05.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
05.05.2015 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.04.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
7 |
|
24.04.2015 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.04.2015 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.04.2015 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Opposition |
6 |
|
30.03.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.03.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.03.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.03.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.03.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.03.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.03.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.03.2015 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.03.2015 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.03.2015 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.03.2015 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.03.2015 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.03.2015 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.03.2015 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.2014 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.11.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.11.2013 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.11.2013 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.10.2013 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.2013 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.2013 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.2013 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.2013 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.2013 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.2013 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.2013 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.10.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
28.10.2013 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
10 |
|
30.08.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.08.2013 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.08.2013 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.08.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
20.08.2013 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.08.2013 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.04.2013 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.04.2013 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.04.2013 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.04.2013 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.2013 |
General enquiry |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.12.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.12.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.12.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.11.2012 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
14 |
|
07.11.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.11.2012 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.11.2012 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.11.2012 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.10.2012 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
14 |
|
25.09.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.09.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
21.09.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.09.2012 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
18.09.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.09.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.09.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.09.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.09.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.09.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.09.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.09.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
13.09.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.09.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
06.09.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
06.09.2012 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.08.2012 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.08.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.08.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.08.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.08.2012 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.08.2012 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.08.2012 |
Authorisation |
Appeal |
3 |
|
10.08.2012 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.08.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.08.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.07.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.07.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.07.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.07.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.07.2012 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
8 |
|
17.07.2012 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.04.2011 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.01.2011 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.08.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.08.2010 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
13.08.2010 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
18.06.2010 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.06.2010 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.06.2010 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.02.2010 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.02.2010 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.02.2010 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
04.02.2010 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
15 |
|
04.02.2010 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
04.02.2010 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
04.02.2010 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
04.02.2010 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.02.2010 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
7 |
|
01.02.2010 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
7 |
|
09.12.2009 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.12.2009 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.12.2009 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.12.2009 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.12.2009 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.10.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.10.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.10.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.10.2009 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.10.2009 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.10.2009 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.10.2009 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
06.10.2009 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.10.2009 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.10.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.10.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.10.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.10.2009 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.08.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.07.2009 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.07.2009 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.07.2009 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.03.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.03.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.03.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.03.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.03.2009 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
16.03.2009 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.03.2009 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.03.2009 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.11.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.11.2007 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
3 |
|
31.10.2007 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.09.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.09.2007 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.08.2007 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.07.2007 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.06.2007 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.03.2007 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.03.2007 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.01.2007 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
45 |
|
17.01.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
17.01.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.01.2007 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
17.01.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.01.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
25 |
|
17.01.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
24 |
|
16.03.2006 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.03.2006 |
Approval of request for amendments/corrections |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.02.2006 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.02.2006 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.02.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.02.2006 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.02.2006 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.02.2006 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.10.2005 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.10.2005 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
14.10.2005 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
21.09.2005 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.08.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.08.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.08.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.08.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.04.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.04.2005 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.12.2004 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.06.2004 |
Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.2004 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.03.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.03.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.03.2004 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.01.2004 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.01.2004 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.01.2004 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.2003 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.2003 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.2003 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
21.10.2003 |
Deficiency in designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.08.2003 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.08.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.08.2003 |
Description |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
30.08.2003 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.08.2003 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
7 |