EP1400872 - Image forming apparatus with belt fixing device for simultaneous fixing of both sides of a duplex print [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/13] | Image forming apparatus and image forming system | ||
[2006/48] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.02.2008 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.02.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.03.2008 [2008/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/16] | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | ||
Former [2004/13] | For all designated states Ricoh Company Ltd. 3-6 Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kikuchi, Toshiyuki Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6 Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [2004/13] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/13] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Stuntzstrasse 16 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03020507.4 | 16.09.2003 | [2004/13] | Priority number, date | JP20020273811 | 19.09.2002 Original published format: JP 2002273811 | JP20020274428 | 20.09.2002 Original published format: JP 2002274428 | [2004/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1400872 | Date: | 24.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1400872 | Date: | 07.04.2004 | [2004/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1400872 | Date: | 18.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/23 | [2004/13] | CPC: |
G03G15/232 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2005/01] |
Former [2004/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Bilderzeugungsapparat mit Bandfixiergerät zur gleichzeitigen Fixierung beider Seiten eines Duplexdruckes | [2006/48] | English: | Image forming apparatus with belt fixing device for simultaneous fixing of both sides of a duplex print | [2006/48] | French: | Appareil de formation d'image avec unité de fixation à bande pour fixation simultanée d'une impression recto-verso | [2006/48] |
Former [2004/13] | Gerät und Verfahren zur Bilderzeugung | ||
Former [2004/13] | Image forming apparatus and image forming system | ||
Former [2004/13] | Appareil et système de formation d'image | Examination procedure | 14.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/25] | 26.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.10.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 15.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 13.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.03.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 07.03.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 15.11.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.11.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.11.2004 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 15.11.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 15.11.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 15.11.2004 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 15.11.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 15.11.2004 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.11.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 15.11.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 15.11.2004 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 15.11.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.11.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 15.11.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 15.11.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.11.2004 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 15.11.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.11.2004 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 15.11.2004 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 15.11.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DYA]US5027159 (ODA MASATAKA [JP], et al) [DY] 1,3,14 * column 3 - column 6; figures 1-6 * * column 3 - column 6; figures 1-6 *[A] 10-13; | [Y]US6097921 (KAGEYAMA TOSHIKAZU [JP]) [Y] 1,3,4,14,22 * column 7 - column 23; figures 1-24 *; | [YA]EP1191405 (RICOH KK [JP]) [Y] 1,3,4,14,22 * column 6 - page 29; figures 1-8 * * column 6 - column 29; figures 1-8 * [A] 5,6,10,15,16,18-20 | Examination | EP1022622 |