EP1371449 - Chemical mechanical polishing head having floating retaining ring and carrier with multi-zone polishing pressure control [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 26.10.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.10.2007 | Refusal of application | published on 28.11.2007 [2007/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EBARA CORPORATION 11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho Ohta-ku Tokyo 144-8510 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/26] | For all designated states EBARA CORPORATION 11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho Ohta-ku, Tokyo 144-8510 / JP | ||
Former [2003/51] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORPORATION 5-1, Otemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8117 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wang, Huey-Ming 34294 Quartz Terrace Fremont, CA 94555 / US | 02 /
Moloney, Gerard S 74 Washington Square Drive Milpitas, CA 95035 / US | 03 /
Chin, Scott 473 Pepper Drive Palo Alto, CA / US | 04 /
Geraghity, Joh J 52 Buckley Court Phoenixville, Pennsylvania 19460 / US | 05 /
Dyson, William Jr 6912 Bollonger Road San Jose, CA 95129 / US | 06 /
Dickey, Tanlin K 1063 Morse Avenue 5-205 Sunnyvale, CA 92089 / US | [2004/16] |
Former [2004/04] | 01 /
Wang, Huey-Ming 34294 Quartz Terrace Fremont, CA 94555 / US | ||
02 /
Moloney, Gerard S 74 Washington Square Drive Milpitas, CA 95035 / US | |||
03 /
Chin, Scott 473 Pepper Drive Palo Alto, CA / US | |||
04 /
Geraghity, Joh J 1029 El Camino Real 8 Burlingame, CA 94010 / US | |||
05 /
Dyson, William Jr 6912 Bollonger Road San Jose, CA 95129 / US | |||
06 /
Dickey, Tanlin K 1063 Morse Avenue 5-205 Sunnyvale, CA 92089 / US | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/51] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03020525.6 | 24.02.2000 | [2003/51] | Priority number, date | US19990261112 | 03.03.1999 Original published format: US 261112 | US19990294547 | 19.04.1999 Original published format: US 294547 | US19990390142 | 03.09.1999 Original published format: US 390142 | [2003/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1371449 | Date: | 17.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1371449 | Date: | 21.04.2004 | [2004/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B24B37/04, B24B41/06, B24B53/007, B24B49/16 | [2003/51] | CPC: |
B24B37/30 (EP,US);
B24B37/32 (EP,US);
B24B41/061 (EP,US);
B24B49/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2003/51] | Title | German: | Chemisch-mechanische Polierträgervorrichtung mit einem schwimmenden Halterring und einer Trägerplatte mit mehrzonaler Rucksteuervorrichtung | [2003/51] | English: | Chemical mechanical polishing head having floating retaining ring and carrier with multi-zone polishing pressure control | [2003/51] | French: | Tête de polissage mécanico-chimique pourvue d'une bague de maintien de tranche flottante et d'un porte-tranche à commande de pression de polissage multi-zone | [2003/51] | Examination procedure | 07.10.2004 | Examination requested [2004/50] | 16.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 28.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 26.06.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2007/48] | 26.06.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 06.07.2007 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2007/48] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00919082.8 / EP1091829 | Divisional application(s) | EP07011957.3 / EP1837122 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPH10249707 ; | [Y]JP8011055 ; | [A]US4918869 (KITTA SATORU [JP]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 61 - column 4, line 68; figures 5-6B *; | [T]GB2307342 (NEC CORP [JP]) [T] 25 * the whole document *; | [A]US5651724 (KIMURA NORIO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 3, line 58 - column 4, line 50 * * column 7, line 28 - line 56 * * figures 1,4 *; | [XY]EP0791431 (SHINETSU HANDOTAI KK [JP]) [X] 1-14,20-22 * column 3, line 37 - column 4, line 33 * * figure 1 * [Y] 15-19; | [T]US5679065 (HENDERSON GARY O [US]) [T] 24 * column W *; | [Y]US5716258 (METCALF ROBERT L [US]) [Y] 15-18 * column 5, line 60 - column 6, line 10; figure 1 *; | [Y]US5851136 (LEE LAWRENCE L [US]) [Y] 19 * column 12, line 60 - column 13, line 6; figure 13 *; | [PX]US6019670 (CHENG TSUNGNAN [US], et al) [PX] 23* column 11, line 57 - column 12, line 18; figure 9 * | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981231), vol. 1998, no. 14, & JP10249707 A 19980922 (APPLIED MATERIALS INC) [X] 23,30-38 * abstract * [Y] 24,25 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960531), vol. 1996, no. 05, & JP8011055 A 19960116 (SONY CORP) [Y] 24,25 * abstract * |