|
20.10.2021 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
20 |
|
20.10.2021 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.10.2021 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.07.2021 |
Claims submitted during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.07.2021 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.07.2021 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.07.2021 |
F3317 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Proprietor + Opponent) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
24.06.2021 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.06.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.06.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.06.2021 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.06.2021 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.06.2021 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.04.2021 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.04.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.04.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.04.2021 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.04.2021 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.04.2021 |
Oral proceedings: change of venue |
Appeal |
8 |
|
14.04.2021 |
Oral proceedings: change of venue |
Appeal |
8 |
|
12.04.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.04.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.04.2021 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.11.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.11.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.11.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.11.2020 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.11.2020 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.11.2020 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.11.2020 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.11.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.11.2020 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.11.2020 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.11.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.11.2020 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.11.2020 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.11.2020 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.11.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.11.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.11.2020 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.10.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.10.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.10.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.10.2020 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.10.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.09.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.09.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.09.2020 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
21.09.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.09.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.09.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
16.09.2020 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
16.09.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.09.2020 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
22.07.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.07.2020 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.07.2020 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.04.2020 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
14 |
|
22.04.2020 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
14 |
|
12.02.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.01.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.01.2020 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.01.2020 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.01.2020 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.07.2019 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.07.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.07.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.07.2018 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
4 |
|
06.07.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.07.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.07.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.07.2018 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
10 |
|
14.03.2018 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.03.2018 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.03.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.03.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.03.2018 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
09.03.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.03.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.03.2018 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
8 |
|
09.03.2018 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
10 |
|
15.01.2018 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.01.2018 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.01.2018 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.01.2018 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.01.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.01.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.01.2018 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.01.2018 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.01.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.01.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.01.2018 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.11.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.11.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.11.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.11.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.11.2017 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.2017 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.2017 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
10.11.2017 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.2017 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
10.11.2017 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
10.11.2017 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.11.2017 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.2017 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.2017 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.11.2017 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.2017 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.11.2017 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.2017 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.2017 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
10.11.2017 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
06.10.2017 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
11 |
|
09.08.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
17 |
|
04.08.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.08.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.08.2017 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.08.2017 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
11 |
|
16.03.2017 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.03.2017 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.03.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
02.03.2017 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.02.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.02.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.2017 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.2017 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.2017 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.02.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
14 |
|
17.02.2017 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.02.2017 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.02.2017 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.2017 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.2017 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
11 |
|
13.02.2017 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.12.2016 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.10.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.10.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.10.2016 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.10.2016 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
10.10.2016 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.10.2016 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
10.10.2016 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.10.2016 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.10.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.10.2016 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
30 |
|
03.08.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.08.2016 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.07.2016 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
6 |
|
03.05.2016 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.04.2016 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.04.2016 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.04.2016 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.04.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.04.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.04.2016 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.03.2016 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.03.2016 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.02.2016 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.02.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.02.2016 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
27 |
|
16.02.2016 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
16.02.2016 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
24 |
|
16.02.2016 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
21 |
|
16.02.2016 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
16.02.2016 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
16.02.2016 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
16.02.2016 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
16.02.2016 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
25.06.2015 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.06.2015 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
16.06.2015 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.05.2015 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.2015 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.04.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.04.2015 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.04.2015 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.04.2015 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.04.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.12.2014 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.12.2014 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.12.2014 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.12.2014 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
30.06.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.06.2014 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
30.06.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.06.2014 |
Description |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
30.06.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.2014 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.03.2014 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.03.2014 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.11.2008 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.11.2008 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
25.11.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.11.2008 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
25.11.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.11.2008 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
25.11.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.09.2008 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.09.2008 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.09.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.09.2008 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.05.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.05.2008 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.08.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.08.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.08.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.08.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.06.2005 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.05.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.05.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.02.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.02.2005 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.08.2004 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.04.2004 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.02.2004 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.02.2004 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.01.2004 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.2004 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.2004 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.11.2003 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.11.2003 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.10.2003 |
Deficiency in designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.10.2003 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.10.2003 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
09.10.2003 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.10.2003 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
26.09.2003 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.09.2003 |
Description |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
26.09.2003 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.2003 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
24.09.2003 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
24.09.2003 |
Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language |
Search / examination |
11 |