blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1403716

EP1403716 - Process for developing lithographic printing plate [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.11.2013
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip17.07.2015Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU, LU
published on 19.08.2015  [2015/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FUJIFILM Corporation
26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2007/11]For all designated states
FUJIFILM Corporation
26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
Former [2004/14]For all designated states
Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd.
210, Nakanuma, Minami-Ashigara-shi
Kanagawa / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Tsuchiya, Mitsumasa
c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd.
4000, Kawashiri, Yoshida-cho
Haibara-gun Shizuoka / JP
02 / Kawauchi, Ikuo
c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd.
4000, Kawashiri, Yoshida-cho
Haibara-gun Shizuoka / JP
 [2012/37]
Former [2004/14]01 / Tsuchiya, Mitsumasa
c/o Fuji photo Film Co., Ltd., 4000, Kawashiri
Yoshida-cho Haibara-gun Shizuoka / JP
02 / Kawauchi, Ikuo
c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. 4000, Kawashiri
Yoshida-cho Haibara-gun Shizuoka-ken / JP
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/03]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Former [2004/14]HOFFMANN - EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date03022141.030.09.2003
[2004/14]
Priority number, dateJP2002028611130.09.2002         Original published format: JP 2002286111
[2004/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1403716
Date:31.03.2004
Language:EN
[2004/14]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1403716
Date:30.06.2004
[2004/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1403716
Date:16.01.2013
Language:EN
[2013/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.05.2004
ClassificationIPC:G03F7/32, G03F7/40
[2012/32]
CPC:
G03F7/322 (EP); G03F7/40 (EP); G03F7/3042 (EP);
G03F7/3057 (EP)
Former IPC [2004/14]G03F7/32, B41C1/10, B41M5/40
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2004/14]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Entwickeln einer lithographischen Druckplatte[2004/14]
English:Process for developing lithographic printing plate[2004/14]
French:Procédé de développement d'une plaque d'impression lithographique[2004/14]
Examination procedure06.09.2004Examination requested  [2004/45]
13.01.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.04.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.08.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.12.2012Fee for grant paid
04.12.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.01.2012
Opposition(s)17.10.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2013/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
21.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
24.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
25.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
25.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
22.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
27.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 09
17.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 10
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU30.09.2003
AT16.01.2013
BE16.01.2013
CY16.01.2013
CZ16.01.2013
DK16.01.2013
EE16.01.2013
FI16.01.2013
IT16.01.2013
MC16.01.2013
NL16.01.2013
RO16.01.2013
SE16.01.2013
SI16.01.2013
SK16.01.2013
TR16.01.2013
BG16.04.2013
GR17.04.2013
ES27.04.2013
PT16.05.2013
CH30.09.2013
FR30.09.2013
IE30.09.2013
LI30.09.2013
LU30.09.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2015/32]AT16.01.2013
BE16.01.2013
CY16.01.2013
CZ16.01.2013
DK16.01.2013
EE16.01.2013
FI16.01.2013
IT16.01.2013
MC16.01.2013
NL16.01.2013
RO16.01.2013
SE16.01.2013
SI16.01.2013
SK16.01.2013
TR16.01.2013
BG16.04.2013
GR17.04.2013
ES27.04.2013
PT16.05.2013
CH30.09.2013
FR30.09.2013
IE30.09.2013
LI30.09.2013
Former [2014/37]AT16.01.2013
BE16.01.2013
CY16.01.2013
CZ16.01.2013
DK16.01.2013
EE16.01.2013
FI16.01.2013
IT16.01.2013
MC16.01.2013
NL16.01.2013
RO16.01.2013
SE16.01.2013
SI16.01.2013
SK16.01.2013
BG16.04.2013
GR17.04.2013
ES27.04.2013
PT16.05.2013
CH30.09.2013
FR30.09.2013
IE30.09.2013
LI30.09.2013
Former [2014/34]AT16.01.2013
BE16.01.2013
CY16.01.2013
CZ16.01.2013
DK16.01.2013
EE16.01.2013
FI16.01.2013
IT16.01.2013
MC16.01.2013
NL16.01.2013
RO16.01.2013
SE16.01.2013
SI16.01.2013
SK16.01.2013
BG16.04.2013
GR17.04.2013
ES27.04.2013
PT16.05.2013
CH30.09.2013
IE30.09.2013
LI30.09.2013
Former [2014/33]AT16.01.2013
BE16.01.2013
CY16.01.2013
CZ16.01.2013
DK16.01.2013
EE16.01.2013
FI16.01.2013
IT16.01.2013
MC16.01.2013
NL16.01.2013
RO16.01.2013
SE16.01.2013
SI16.01.2013
SK16.01.2013
BG16.04.2013
GR17.04.2013
ES27.04.2013
PT16.05.2013
IE30.09.2013
Former [2014/20]AT16.01.2013
BE16.01.2013
CY16.01.2013
CZ16.01.2013
DK16.01.2013
EE16.01.2013
FI16.01.2013
IT16.01.2013
MC16.01.2013
NL16.01.2013
RO16.01.2013
SE16.01.2013
SI16.01.2013
SK16.01.2013
BG16.04.2013
GR17.04.2013
ES27.04.2013
PT16.05.2013
Former [2014/03]AT16.01.2013
BE16.01.2013
CY16.01.2013
CZ16.01.2013
DK16.01.2013
EE16.01.2013
FI16.01.2013
IT16.01.2013
NL16.01.2013
RO16.01.2013
SE16.01.2013
SI16.01.2013
SK16.01.2013
BG16.04.2013
GR17.04.2013
ES27.04.2013
PT16.05.2013
Former [2013/49]AT16.01.2013
BE16.01.2013
CY16.01.2013
CZ16.01.2013
DK16.01.2013
EE16.01.2013
FI16.01.2013
NL16.01.2013
RO16.01.2013
SE16.01.2013
SI16.01.2013
SK16.01.2013
BG16.04.2013
GR17.04.2013
ES27.04.2013
PT16.05.2013
Former [2013/48]AT16.01.2013
BE16.01.2013
CY16.01.2013
DK16.01.2013
EE16.01.2013
FI16.01.2013
NL16.01.2013
SE16.01.2013
SI16.01.2013
BG16.04.2013
GR17.04.2013
ES27.04.2013
PT16.05.2013
Former [2013/40]AT16.01.2013
BE16.01.2013
CY16.01.2013
FI16.01.2013
NL16.01.2013
SE16.01.2013
SI16.01.2013
BG16.04.2013
GR17.04.2013
ES27.04.2013
PT16.05.2013
Former [2013/37]AT16.01.2013
BE16.01.2013
CY16.01.2013
FI16.01.2013
NL16.01.2013
SE16.01.2013
SI16.01.2013
BG16.04.2013
GR17.04.2013
ES27.04.2013
Former [2013/36]AT16.01.2013
BE16.01.2013
CY16.01.2013
SE16.01.2013
BG16.04.2013
ES27.04.2013
Former [2013/35]BE16.01.2013
CY16.01.2013
SE16.01.2013
BG16.04.2013
Former [2013/34]SE16.01.2013
BG16.04.2013
Documents cited:Search[A]US4837131  (KOBAYASHI KESANAO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 4, line 30 - line 35; example - *;
 [A]EP0909657  (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1* paragraph [0177]; example - *;
 [A]EP1147884  (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * example - *;
 [A]EP1156371  (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0146]; example - *;
 [A]EP1162063  (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * example - *
ExaminationDE3705896
 JPS62196656
 JPS62215266
by applicantDE3705896
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.