EP1429082 - Central control system and method for controlling air conditioners [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.02.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.03.2013 [2013/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20 Yeoeuido-dong Youngdeungpo-ku Seoul 150-010 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/02] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20 Yeoeuido-dong Youngdeungpo-ku Seoul 150-010 / KR | ||
Former [2004/25] | For all designated states LG Electronics, Inc. 20, Yeoeuido-dong, Youngdeungpo-ku Seoul 150-010 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yoon, Sang Chul 1905-1803 Munchon-village Juyep-dong Ilsan-ku Koyang-si 411-370 Kyungki-do / KR | 02 /
Jeon, Duck Gu 122-1306 Daelim Apt. Haengdan-dong Seongdong-ku, 133-070 Seoul / KR | 03 /
Jung, Jae Sik 330-55 Mia8-dong Kangbuk-ku 142-108, Seoul / KR | 04 /
Kwon, Jae Hwan 507-902 Hyundai5-cha Apt. 4-ga Dangsan-dong Yeoungdungpo-ku, 150-754 Seoul / KR | [2011/48] |
Former [2004/25] | 01 /
Yoon, Sang Chul 1905-1803 Munchon-village Juyep-dong Ilsan-ku Koyang-si 411-370 Kyungki-do / KR | ||
02 /
Jeon, Duck Gu 122-1306 Daelim Apt. Haengdan-dong Seongdong-ku, 133-070 Seoul / KR | |||
03 /
Jung, Jae Sik 330-55 Mia8-dong Kangbuk-ku 142-108, Seoul / KR | |||
04 /
Kwon, Jae Hwan 507-902 Hyundai5-cha Apt. 4-ga Dangsan-dong Yeoungdungpo-ku, 150-754 / KR | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Strasse 4 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/15] | TER MEER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR Patentanwälte Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/25] | TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR Patentanwälte, Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03022281.4 | 01.10.2003 | [2004/25] | Priority number, date | KR20020078330 | 10.12.2002 Original published format: KR 2002078330 | KR20030013685 | 05.03.2003 Original published format: KR 2003013685 | [2004/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1429082 | Date: | 16.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1429082 | Date: | 11.01.2006 | [2006/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1429082 | Date: | 11.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F24F11/00 | [2004/25] | CPC: |
F24F11/30 (EP,US);
F24F11/58 (EP,US);
F24F11/62 (EP,US);
F24F11/54 (EP,US);
F25B2700/05 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [2006/37] |
Former [2004/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Zentrales Regelungssystem und Verfahren zur Steuerung der Klimaanlagen | [2004/25] | English: | Central control system and method for controlling air conditioners | [2004/25] | French: | Système de commande centrale et méthode de commande des dispositifs de conditionnement d'air | [2004/25] | Examination procedure | 01.10.2003 | Examination requested [2004/25] | 13.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 28.02.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.11.2006 | Opposition(s) | 14.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS58106342 ; | [X]US5279458 (DEWOLF THOMAS L [US], et al) [X] 1-5,12* the whole document *; | [A]DE20011934U (GOETZ ROLAND [DE]) [A] 8-11,14,15 * the whole document *; | [XY]US2002029096 (TAKAI TADASHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-7,12,13 * the whole document * [Y] 8-11,14,15; | [Y]US2002173929 (SEIGEL LAWRENCE J [US]) [Y] 8-11,14,15 * paragraph [0107] - paragraph [0109]; figures 13-15 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830917), vol. 007, no. 211, Database accession no. (M - 243), & JP58106342 A 19830624 (YAMATAKE HONEYWELL KK) [X] 1-5,12 * abstract * | by applicant | US2002029096 |