EP1406174 - Methods and mechanisms for proactive memory management [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.08.2012 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MICROSOFT CORPORATION One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [2004/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sechrest, Stuart 21509 NE 97th Place Redmond Washington 98053 / US | 02 /
Fortin, Michael R. 21846 NE 69th Street Redmond Washington 98053 / US | 03 /
Iyigun, Mehmet 9805 Avondale Road Apt G320 Redmond Washington 98052 / US | 04 /
Ergan, Cenk 15201 NE 16th Place Apt. 41 Bellevue Washington 98007 / US | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/39] | 01 /
Sechrest, Stuart 21509 NE 97th Place Redmond Washington 98052 / US | ||
02 /
Fortin, Michael R. 21846 NE 69th Street Redmond Washington 98053 / US | |||
03 /
Iyigun, Mehmet 9805 Avondale Road Apt G320 Redmond Washington 98052 / US | |||
04 /
Ergan, Cenk 15201 NE 16th Place Apt. 41 Bellevue Washington 98007 / US | |||
Former [2004/15] | 01 /
Sechrest, Stuart 21509 NE 97th Place Redmond Washington 98052 / US | ||
02 /
Fortin, Michael R. 21846 NE 69th Street Redmond Washington 98053 / US | |||
03 /
Iyigun, Mehmet 9805 Avondale Road Apt G320 Redmond Washington 98052 / US | |||
04 /
Ergan, Cenk 15201 NE 16th Place Apt. 41 Bellevue Washington 98007 / US | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/39] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/15] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03022573.4 | 02.10.2003 | [2004/15] | Priority number, date | US20020416115P | 04.10.2002 Original published format: US 416115 P | US20020325591 | 20.12.2002 Original published format: US 325591 | [2004/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1406174 | Date: | 07.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1406174 | Date: | 05.09.2007 | [2007/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1406174 | Date: | 28.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/39] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1406174 | Date: | 29.02.2012 | [2012/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06F12/12, G06F12/10, G06F9/46, G06F3/06 | [2004/15] | CPC: |
G06F12/121 (EP,US);
G06F12/08 (KR);
G06F12/122 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/15] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtungen zur proaktiven Speicherverwaltung | [2004/15] | English: | Methods and mechanisms for proactive memory management | [2004/15] | French: | Méthodes et mécanismes pour gestion proactive de la mémoire | [2004/15] | Examination procedure | 21.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/45] | 08.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 21.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.08.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 10.08.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.11.2007 | Opposition(s) | 29.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.09.2011 | BE | 28.09.2011 | CY | 28.09.2011 | CZ | 28.09.2011 | DK | 28.09.2011 | EE | 28.09.2011 | FI | 28.09.2011 | HU | 28.09.2011 | RO | 28.09.2011 | SE | 28.09.2011 | SI | 28.09.2011 | SK | 28.09.2011 | TR | 28.09.2011 | IE | 02.10.2011 | LU | 02.10.2011 | CH | 31.10.2011 | LI | 31.10.2011 | MC | 31.10.2011 | BG | 28.12.2011 | GR | 29.12.2011 | PT | 30.01.2012 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 28.09.2011 | |
BE | 28.09.2011 | ||
CY | 28.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
DK | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
TR | 28.09.2011 | ||
IE | 02.10.2011 | ||
LU | 02.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
BG | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 28.09.2011 | |
BE | 28.09.2011 | ||
CY | 28.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
DK | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
IE | 02.10.2011 | ||
LU | 02.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
BG | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 28.09.2011 | |
BE | 28.09.2011 | ||
CY | 28.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
DK | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
IE | 02.10.2011 | ||
LU | 02.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | AT | 28.09.2011 | |
BE | 28.09.2011 | ||
CY | 28.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
DK | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
IE | 02.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | AT | 28.09.2011 | |
BE | 28.09.2011 | ||
CY | 28.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
DK | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/33] | AT | 28.09.2011 | |
BE | 28.09.2011 | ||
CY | 28.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/25] | AT | 28.09.2011 | |
BE | 28.09.2011 | ||
CY | 28.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 28.09.2011 | |
BE | 28.09.2011 | ||
CY | 28.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | AT | 28.09.2011 | |
BE | 28.09.2011 | ||
CY | 28.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/18] | AT | 28.09.2011 | |
BE | 28.09.2011 | ||
CY | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 28.09.2011 | |
CY | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 28.09.2011 | |
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | FI | 28.09.2011 | |
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | FI | 28.09.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6237065 (BANERJIA SANJEEV [US], et al) [A] 1-117 * column 1, line 58 - column 3, line 5 *; | [XY]US6378043 (GIRKAR MAHESH [US], et al) [X] 38-49 * abstract * * column 1, line 8 - line 34 * * column 3, line 1 - line 43 * * column 5, line 32 - column 6, line 44 * * figure 1 * [Y] 22-24,94-97; | [XY]US2002087797 (ADRANGI FARID [US]) [X] 1-21,25-37,50-93,98-117 * abstract * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0047] * * figures 5a,5b,6,7 * [Y] 22-24,94-97; | [A]US6418510 (LAMBERTS BERND [US]) [A] 1-117 * abstract * * column 4, line 27 - column 5, line 3 * * column 6, line 3 - line 26 * * column 12, line 38 - column 13, line 22 * * figures 2,7a,7b *; | [A]US6425057 (CHERKASOVA LUDMILA [US], et al) [A] 1-117 * abstract ** column 4, line 45 - column 6, line 15 *; | [PX]US2002178326 (OHTA YOSHIYUKI [JP], et al) [PX] 1-6,13,14,18,21,22,25,26,28,29,31,32,50,52-54,57,58,60,64,71,72,74,81,93,94,99,106-111,116,117 * abstract * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0069] * * paragraph [0104] - paragraph [0108] * * figures 1,5,6 * |