EP1420453 - Image pickup apparatus, radiation image pickup apparatus and radiation image pickup system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.01.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 23.01.2013 [2013/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2011/10] |
Former [2004/21] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Morii, Toshiko Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Morishita, Masakazu Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Watanabe, Minoru Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2004/21] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/34] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/21] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing. Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner GbR, TBK-Patent, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03025915.4 | 12.11.2003 | [2004/21] | Priority number, date | JP20020329653 | 13.11.2002 Original published format: JP 2002329653 | [2004/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1420453 | Date: | 19.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1420453 | Date: | 05.10.2005 | [2005/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1420453 | Date: | 09.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/146 | [2004/21] | CPC: |
H01L27/14658 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2006/24] |
Former [2004/21] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Bildaufnahmevorrichtung, Strahlungsbildaufnahmevorrichtung und Strahlungsbildaufnahmesystem | [2004/21] | English: | Image pickup apparatus, radiation image pickup apparatus and radiation image pickup system | [2004/21] | French: | Dispositif de prise d'images, dispositif de prise d'images de rayonnement et système de prise d'images de rayonnement | [2004/21] | Examination procedure | 05.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/22] | 18.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 08.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.01.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 14.01.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.12.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 09.03.2011 | NL | 09.03.2011 | FR | 30.11.2011 | [2013/04] |
Former [2012/23] | IT | 09.03.2011 | |
NL | 09.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/42] | NL | 09.03.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH1093063 ; | [X]US5262649 (ANTONUK LARRY E [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-9,13-16 * column 8, line 13 - column 9, line 36; figures 1,2 *; | [X]EP0964451 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1-4,6-9,13-16 * figures 1,3F,4,5,7,9 *; | [E]EP1388740 (CANON KK [JP]) [E] 1-4,6-9,13-16 * paragraphs [0071] - [0078] - [0083] * * figures 8A,11 *; | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980731), vol. 1998, no. 09, & JP10093063 A 19980410 (TOSHIBA CORP) [X] 1-4,6-16 * abstract * | [X] - POWELL M J ET AL MATERIALS RESEARCH SOCIETY, "AMORPHOUS SILICON PHOTODIODE-THIN FILM TRANSISTOR IMAGE SENSOR WITHDIODE ON TOP STRUCTURE", AMORPHOUS AND MICROCRYSTALLINE SILICON TECHNOLOGY - 1997. SAN FRANCISCO, CA, MARCH 31 - APRIL 4, 1997, MATERIALS RESEARCH SOCIETY SYMPOSIUM PROCEEDINGS. VOL. 467, PITTSBURGH, PA : MRS, US, (19970331), VOL. 467, ISBN 1-55899-371-1, pages 863 - 868, XP000905789 [X] 1-4,6-9,13-16 * page 863, paragraphs 3,4,INTRODUCTION * * page 868, paragraph CONCLUSION; figures 1,2 * | [X] - NATHAN A ET AL, "Amorphous silicon detector and thin film transistor technology for large-area imaging of X-rays", MICROELECTRONICS JOURNAL, MACKINTOSH PUBLICATIONS LTD. LUTON, GB, (200012), vol. 31, no. 11-12, ISSN 0026-2692, pages 883 - 891, XP004221093 [X] 1-4,6-9,13-16 * figures 14,15 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0026-2692(00)00082-3 |