|
12.06.2013 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.08.2012 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.07.2012 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.06.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.06.2012 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.06.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.04.2012 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.02.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.02.2012 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.02.2012 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
29.02.2012 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
29.02.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.01.2012 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.01.2012 |
Communication about the grant of a European patent according to Board of Appeal decision |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.01.2012 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
47 |
|
18.01.2012 |
Processing of grant of a patent after appeal (internal) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.11.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.11.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.11.2011 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
16 |
|
18.11.2011 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
31.10.2011 |
F3042 Dispatch of attendance note about a phone conversation |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.10.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.10.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.10.2011 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.10.2011 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.10.2011 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
3 |
|
07.10.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
07.10.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
07.10.2011 |
Description |
Appeal |
4 |
|
07.10.2011 |
Description |
Appeal |
4 |
|
07.10.2011 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.09.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.09.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
22.09.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
22.09.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.09.2011 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Appeal |
4 |
|
15.08.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.08.2011 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Appeal |
3 |
|
21.07.2011 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
8 |
|
19.07.2011 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.06.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.06.2011 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.06.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
7 |
|
07.06.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
07.06.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.06.2011 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
21.02.2011 |
F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) |
Appeal |
9 |
|
04.02.2011 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.01.2011 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.10.2010 |
F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.10.2010 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.06.2010 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.01.2010 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.01.2010 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.09.2008 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.03.2008 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.01.2008 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.11.2007 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
22.11.2007 |
Claims |
Appeal |
7 |
|
22.11.2007 |
Claims |
Appeal |
10 |
|
22.11.2007 |
Claims |
Appeal |
7 |
|
22.11.2007 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
9 |
|
20.11.2007 |
Claims |
Appeal |
7 |
|
20.11.2007 |
Claims |
Appeal |
10 |
|
20.11.2007 |
Claims |
Appeal |
7 |
|
20.11.2007 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
20.11.2007 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
9 |
|
04.10.2007 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.10.2007 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.08.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.08.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.08.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.08.2007 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
02.08.2007 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.08.2007 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.08.2007 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
02.08.2007 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.06.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.06.2007 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.06.2007 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.06.2007 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.06.2007 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2007 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.05.2007 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
04.05.2007 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
04.05.2007 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.05.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.05.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
04.05.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.05.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
04.05.2007 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2007 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.05.2007 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.05.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.2007 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.2007 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.04.2007 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.04.2007 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
53 |
|
02.04.2007 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
02.04.2007 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
02.04.2007 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
02.04.2007 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.04.2007 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.04.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.04.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
02.04.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
02.04.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.04.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.04.2007 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.04.2007 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
26.02.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.02.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
16.02.2007 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.02.2007 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.09.2006 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.09.2006 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.09.2006 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
08.09.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
08.09.2006 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.09.2006 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
05.09.2006 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
29.05.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
29.05.2006 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.2006 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.03.2006 |
Request for change of address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.03.2006 |
Request for change of address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.11.2005 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.10.2005 |
Request for change of name |
Search / examination |
59 |
|
17.08.2005 |
Request for change of address of the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.2005 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.04.2005 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.01.2005 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.2004 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
20.12.2004 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
20.07.2004 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.07.2004 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.07.2004 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.07.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
29.01.2004 |
Communication regarding the Extended European Search Report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.01.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.2003 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
23.12.2003 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.12.2003 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.12.2003 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.11.2003 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.11.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
22.11.2003 |
Description |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
22.11.2003 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
22.11.2003 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
21.11.2003 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
21.11.2003 |
Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language |
Search / examination |
51 |