|
06.02.2015 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.04.2014 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.03.2014 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.02.2014 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.02.2014 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.02.2014 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.02.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.2013 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.10.2013 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.10.2013 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.10.2013 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.10.2013 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
69 |
|
17.09.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.09.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.09.2013 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
12 |
|
12.09.2013 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
12.09.2013 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.09.2013 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.12.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
04.12.2012 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.11.2012 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.09.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
07.09.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
07.09.2012 |
Description |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.09.2012 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
12.05.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.05.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.05.2012 |
F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) |
Appeal |
13 |
|
22.11.2011 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Appeal |
6 |
|
11.01.2011 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.11.2010 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Appeal |
8 |
|
21.07.2010 |
CDS Clean up - amended applicant details |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.07.2010 |
Miscellaneous requests concerning client data |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.06.2010 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.05.2009 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.12.2008 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.11.2008 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.11.2008 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.10.2008 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.10.2008 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.10.2008 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.10.2008 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
18.08.2008 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.06.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.06.2008 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.2008 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.06.2008 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.06.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.06.2008 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.2008 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.06.2008 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
17.06.2008 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.06.2008 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.2008 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.2008 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.2008 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.04.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.04.2008 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.04.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.04.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.04.2008 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.02.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.02.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.02.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.02.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.02.2008 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.09.2007 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.08.2007 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.08.2007 |
Request for transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.07.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.07.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
06.07.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.05.2007 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.2007 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.01.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
05.01.2007 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.2006 |
Information about publication, reminder payment of designation fee, response to extended European search report, if applicable |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.11.2006 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.2006 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.2006 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.04.2004 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2004 |
Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.02.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
71 |
|
13.01.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.2003 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
20.11.2003 |
Description |
Search / examination |
47 |
|
20.11.2003 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.2003 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
20.11.2003 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |