|
28.01.2013 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.07.2012 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.09.2011 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.09.2010 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.01.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.12.2009 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
4 |
|
03.09.2009 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.05.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.04.2009 |
F3028 Inadmissibility of the appeal: non-submission of the statement of grounds |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.04.2009 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.03.2009 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.03.2009 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.03.2009 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.12.2008 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.12.2008 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.10.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.2008 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.2008 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.09.2008 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.09.2008 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.09.2008 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.09.2008 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.09.2008 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.09.2008 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.08.2008 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.08.2008 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.08.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.08.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.08.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.08.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.08.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.08.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.08.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.08.2008 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
12.06.2008 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.05.2008 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.04.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.04.2008 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.04.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2008 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.05.2007 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.05.2007 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.05.2007 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (reply to communication from Examining Division too late) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.05.2007 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.04.2007 |
Refusal of request for extension of time limit |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.2007 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
23.04.2007 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.04.2007 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.2007 |
Request for change of name |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.02.2007 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.2007 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.10.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.10.2006 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.07.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.07.2006 |
Description |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
07.07.2006 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.05.2006 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.2006 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.03.2006 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.02.2006 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.10.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.10.2005 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.07.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.07.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.07.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.06.2005 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.02.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.02.2005 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.2004 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.08.2004 |
Final instructions (loss of partial rights) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.07.2004 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.05.2004 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.05.2004 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.05.2004 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.05.2004 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.05.2004 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.05.2004 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.04.2004 |
Claim deemed abandoned |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.04.2004 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.04.2004 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.04.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.04.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.04.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.04.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.03.2004 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.03.2004 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.02.2004 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.02.2004 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.02.2004 |
Partial European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.02.2004 |
Invitation to pay claims fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.2003 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
24.11.2003 |
Description |
Search / examination |
42 |
|
24.11.2003 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.11.2003 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.2003 |
Request for grant of a European patent (divisional application) |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
08.03.1999 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
42 |
|
08.03.1999 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
54 |