|
11.01.2010 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.02.2009 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.01.2009 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2008 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.2008 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.2008 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.07.2008 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.04.2008 |
Request for issuance of patent certificate with patent specification |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.04.2008 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.04.2008 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.04.2008 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
19.03.2008 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.03.2008 |
Registration under Rule 23 EPC |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.03.2008 |
Registration under Rule 23 EPC |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.03.2008 |
Processing of grant of a patent after appeal (internal) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.02.2008 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.02.2008 |
Letter to the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.02.2008 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.02.2008 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
15 |
|
25.01.2008 |
Deficiencies as to Rule 23 EPC |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
25.01.2008 |
Deficiencies as to Rule 23 EPC |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
24.12.2007 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
24.12.2007 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
24.12.2007 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
24.12.2007 |
Letter to the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
24.12.2007 |
Letter to the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.12.2007 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
3 |
|
30.11.2007 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.11.2007 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.11.2007 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
06.11.2007 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
06.11.2007 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.11.2007 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
06.11.2007 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
35 |
|
06.11.2007 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
35 |
|
02.11.2007 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.11.2007 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
46 |
|
23.07.2007 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.07.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.07.2007 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
100 |
|
04.07.2007 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.01.2007 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.01.2007 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
14 |
|
28.12.2006 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
15 |
|
25.10.2006 |
F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) |
Appeal |
10 |
|
07.08.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.08.2006 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.2006 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.06.2006 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.04.2006 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
18 |
|
18.04.2006 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
19 |
|
20.02.2006 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.02.2006 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
10.01.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.12.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.12.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.12.2005 |
Decision to refuse according to the state of the file |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.12.2005 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.09.2005 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.2005 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.09.2005 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.09.2005 |
Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.2005 |
Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.07.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.07.2005 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
15.07.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.07.2005 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.07.2005 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.2005 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.04.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.04.2005 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.04.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.04.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.04.2005 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.04.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
15.02.2005 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.11.2004 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.11.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.10.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.07.2004 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.07.2004 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.07.2004 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.07.2004 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.07.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.07.2004 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.03.2004 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.03.2004 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.03.2004 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.03.2004 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.03.2004 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.03.2004 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.03.2004 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.03.2004 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.03.2004 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.02.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.02.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.12.2003 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.12.2003 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.12.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.12.2003 |
Description |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
01.12.2003 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.12.2003 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.12.2003 |
Request for grant of a European patent (divisional application) |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
09.02.1994 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
32 |