EP1437088 - Pulse wave measuring apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.09.2013 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 18.12.2013 [2013/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Omron Healthcare Co., Ltd. 24, Yamanouchi, Yamanoshita-cho, Ukyo-ku, Kyoto-shi Kyoto 615-0084 / JP | [2012/43] |
Former [2004/35] | For all designated states Omron Healthcare Co., Ltd. 24, Yamanouchi, Yamanoshita-cho, Ukyou-ku, Kyoto-shi Kyoto 615-0084 / JP | ||
Former [2004/29] | For all designated states Omron Healthcare Co., Ltd. 24, Yamanouchi, Yamanoshita-cho Ukyou-ku, Kyoto-shi Kyoto 600-0084 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hashimoto, Masao, @Omron Healthcare Co., Ltd. 24, Yamanouchi Yamanoshita-cho Ukyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 615-0084 / JP | 02 /
Itonaga, Kazunobu, @Omron Healthcare Co., Ltd. 24, Yamanouchi Yamanoshita-cho Ukyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 615-0084 / JP | [2012/39] |
Former [2004/29] | 01 /
Hashimoto, Masao, Omron Healthcare Co., Ltd. 24, Yamanouchi Yamanoshita-cho Ukyou-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 600-00084 / JP | ||
02 /
Itonaga, Kazunobu, Omron Healthcare Co., Ltd. 24, Yamanouchi Yamanoshita-cho Ukyou-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 600-00084 / JP | Representative(s) | Kilian Kilian & Partner mbB Zielstattstraße 23a 81379 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/09] | Kilian Kilian & Partner Aidenbachstraße 54 81379 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/44] | Kilian, Helmut Wilhelms, Kilian & Partner Patentanwälte Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/29] | Kilian, Helmut, Dr. Wilhelms, Kilian & Partner Patentanwälte Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03028976.3 | 17.12.2003 | [2004/29] | Priority number, date | JP20030004356 | 10.01.2003 Original published format: JP 2003004356 | [2004/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1437088 | Date: | 14.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1437088 | Date: | 22.09.2004 | [2004/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1437088 | Date: | 31.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/021 | [2004/29] | CPC: |
A61B5/021 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2005/23] |
Former [2004/29] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Pulswellenmessvorrichtung | [2004/29] | English: | Pulse wave measuring apparatus | [2004/29] | French: | Appareil de mesure d'une onde d'impulsion | [2004/38] |
Former [2004/29] | Appareil de mesure D'UNE ONDE D'IMPULSION | Examination procedure | 20.10.2004 | Examination requested [2004/51] | 23.03.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 26.07.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 05.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 06.02.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.08.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 22.08.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.01.2011 | Opposition(s) | 01.08.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 09.05.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 31.10.2012 | FR | 02.01.2013 | GB | 31.01.2013 | ES | 11.02.2013 | [2013/51] |
Former [2013/50] | IT | 31.10.2012 | |
FR | 02.01.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | IT | 31.10.2012 | |
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | ES | 11.02.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4320767 (VILLA-REAL ANTONY-EUCLID C) [Y] 2,6 * column 12, line 26 - line 34; figures 1,1A,1B *; | [XY]US5240007 (PYTEL KENNETH J [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 2, line 25 - column 3, line 28 * * column 7, line 16 - column 8, line 6 * * figures 11-16 * [Y] 2,6; | [X]US5271405 (BOYER STANLEY J [US], et al) [X] 1,7 * column 10, line 59 - column 11, line 43 *; | [A]EP0649629 (COLIN CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 19 - column 3, line 11 *; | [A]US6132383 (CHESNEY CHARLES F [US], et al) [A] 1,7-9* abstract *; | [PX]EP1360930 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO [JP]) [PX] 1,8,9 * paragraph [0103] - paragraph [0104] * * figure 25 * |