EP1543846 - Albumin-based bioresorbable cross-linked hydrogel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.06.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2020 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 25.11.2020 [2020/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Turzi, Antoine Rue de l'Eglise 5b 1146 Mollens / CH | [2005/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Turzi, Antoine Rue de l'Eglise 5b 1146 Mollens / CH | 02 /
Fortier, Guy 3428 Marcil Montréal, Québec H4A2Z3 / CA | 03 /
Liu, Yaode 3428 Marcil Montréal, Québec H4A2Z3 / CA | [2005/25] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2009/38] |
Former [2008/28] | reuteler & cie SA Chemin de la Vuarpillière 29 1260 Nyon / CH | ||
Former [2006/45] | Cornut, Isabelle, et al Leman Consulting S.A. Route de Clémenty 62 1260 Nyon / CH | ||
Former [2005/25] | Micheli & Cie Rue de Genève 122, Case Postale 61 1226 Genève-Thonex / CH | Application number, filing date | 03029118.1 | 18.12.2003 | [2005/25] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1543846 | Date: | 22.06.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1543846 | Date: | 19.08.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61L15/32, A61L24/10 | [2005/25] | CPC: |
A61L31/047 (EP);
A61L31/145 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/34] |
Former [2005/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Bioresorbierbares vernetztes Hydrogel bestehend aus Albumin | [2009/14] | English: | Albumin-based bioresorbable cross-linked hydrogel | [2005/25] | French: | Hydrogel biorésorbable réticulé à base d'albumine | [2005/25] |
Former [2005/25] | Bioresorbierbarer vernetzter Hydrogel bestehend aus Albumin | Examination procedure | 20.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/08] | 07.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 04.07.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2007 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   14.01.2008 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.08.2009 | CY | 19.08.2009 | CZ | 19.08.2009 | DK | 19.08.2009 | EE | 19.08.2009 | FI | 19.08.2009 | RO | 19.08.2009 | SE | 19.08.2009 | SI | 19.08.2009 | SK | 19.08.2009 | TR | 19.08.2009 | BG | 19.11.2009 | GR | 20.11.2009 | LU | 18.12.2009 | PT | 21.12.2009 | BE | 31.12.2009 | HU | 20.02.2010 | [2020/48] |
Former [2011/44] | AT | 19.08.2009 | |
CY | 19.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2009 | ||
DK | 19.08.2009 | ||
EE | 19.08.2009 | ||
FI | 19.08.2009 | ||
RO | 19.08.2009 | ||
SE | 19.08.2009 | ||
SI | 19.08.2009 | ||
SK | 19.08.2009 | ||
TR | 19.08.2009 | ||
BG | 19.11.2009 | ||
GR | 20.11.2009 | ||
LU | 18.12.2009 | ||
PT | 21.12.2009 | ||
BE | 31.12.2009 | ||
HU | 20.02.2010 | ||
Former [2011/31] | AT | 19.08.2009 | |
CY | 19.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2009 | ||
DK | 19.08.2009 | ||
EE | 19.08.2009 | ||
FI | 19.08.2009 | ||
RO | 19.08.2009 | ||
SE | 19.08.2009 | ||
SI | 19.08.2009 | ||
SK | 19.08.2009 | ||
BG | 19.11.2009 | ||
GR | 20.11.2009 | ||
LU | 18.12.2009 | ||
PT | 21.12.2009 | ||
BE | 31.12.2009 | ||
HU | 20.02.2010 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 19.08.2009 | |
CY | 19.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2009 | ||
DK | 19.08.2009 | ||
EE | 19.08.2009 | ||
FI | 19.08.2009 | ||
RO | 19.08.2009 | ||
SE | 19.08.2009 | ||
SI | 19.08.2009 | ||
SK | 19.08.2009 | ||
BG | 19.11.2009 | ||
GR | 20.11.2009 | ||
IT | 18.12.2009 | ||
LU | 18.12.2009 | ||
PT | 21.12.2009 | ||
BE | 31.12.2009 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 19.08.2009 | |
CY | 19.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2009 | ||
DK | 19.08.2009 | ||
EE | 19.08.2009 | ||
FI | 19.08.2009 | ||
RO | 19.08.2009 | ||
SE | 19.08.2009 | ||
SI | 19.08.2009 | ||
SK | 19.08.2009 | ||
BG | 19.11.2009 | ||
GR | 20.11.2009 | ||
IT | 18.12.2009 | ||
PT | 21.12.2009 | ||
BE | 31.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/48] | AT | 19.08.2009 | |
CY | 19.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2009 | ||
DK | 19.08.2009 | ||
EE | 19.08.2009 | ||
FI | 19.08.2009 | ||
RO | 19.08.2009 | ||
SE | 19.08.2009 | ||
SI | 19.08.2009 | ||
SK | 19.08.2009 | ||
BG | 19.11.2009 | ||
GR | 20.11.2009 | ||
PT | 21.12.2009 | ||
BE | 31.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/23] | AT | 19.08.2009 | |
CY | 19.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2009 | ||
DK | 19.08.2009 | ||
EE | 19.08.2009 | ||
FI | 19.08.2009 | ||
RO | 19.08.2009 | ||
SE | 19.08.2009 | ||
SI | 19.08.2009 | ||
SK | 19.08.2009 | ||
BG | 19.11.2009 | ||
PT | 21.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/22] | AT | 19.08.2009 | |
CY | 19.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2009 | ||
DK | 19.08.2009 | ||
EE | 19.08.2009 | ||
FI | 19.08.2009 | ||
RO | 19.08.2009 | ||
SE | 19.08.2009 | ||
SI | 19.08.2009 | ||
BG | 19.11.2009 | ||
PT | 21.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | AT | 19.08.2009 | |
CY | 19.08.2009 | ||
DK | 19.08.2009 | ||
EE | 19.08.2009 | ||
FI | 19.08.2009 | ||
SE | 19.08.2009 | ||
SI | 19.08.2009 | ||
BG | 19.11.2009 | ||
PT | 21.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/18] | AT | 19.08.2009 | |
CY | 19.08.2009 | ||
FI | 19.08.2009 | ||
SE | 19.08.2009 | ||
SI | 19.08.2009 | ||
BG | 19.11.2009 | ||
PT | 21.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/16] | AT | 19.08.2009 | |
CY | 19.08.2009 | ||
FI | 19.08.2009 | ||
SE | 19.08.2009 | ||
SI | 19.08.2009 | ||
PT | 21.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/11] | AT | 19.08.2009 | |
FI | 19.08.2009 | ||
SE | 19.08.2009 | ||
SI | 19.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 19.08.2009 | |
FI | 19.08.2009 | ||
SE | 19.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | AT | 19.08.2009 | |
SE | 19.08.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9515352 (UNIV QUEBEC MONTREAL [CA]) [X] 1-5,7,8 * page 11, line 8 - line 26 * * page 16, line 7 - line 20 *; | [X]US5583114 (BARROWS THOMAS H [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7 * column 2, line 2 - line 36 * * example 11 *; | [Y]US5791352 (REICH CARY J [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * column 2, line 13 - column 3, line 32 *; | [X]WO9966964 (SURGICAL SEALANTS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7,8 * page 3, line 15 - line 30 * * page 20, line 12 - line 20 *; | [X]WO0010618 (TISSUEMED LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-5,7,8 * page 6, line 6 - line 21 * * page 12; example 3 *; | [Y]FR2796558 (IMEDEX BIOMATERIAUX [FR]) [Y] 1-10 * page 31 - page 32; examples 6,7 *; | [Y] - GAYET J-C ET AL, "High water content BSA-PEG hydrogel for controlled release device: Evaluation of the drug release properties", JOURNAL OF CONTROLLED RELEASE, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V. AMSTERDAM, NL, (19960201), vol. 38, no. 2, ISSN 0168-3659, pages 177 - 184, XP004037403 [Y] 1-10 * page 178 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0168-3659(95)00118-2 |