EP1545040 - HARQ protocol with synchronous retransmissions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.02.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 19.11.2014 [2014/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2005/25] | For all designated states Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. 1006, Ohaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Loehr, Joachim Ingelheimer Strasse 1, App. 24 64295 Darmstadt / DE | 02 /
Seidel, Eiko Moosbergstrasse 97 a-b 64285 Darmstadt / DE | 03 /
Petrovic, Dragan Am Kaiserschlag 15 64295 Darmstadt / DE | 04 /
Suzuki, Hidetoshi 6-2-803, Hikarinooka Yokosuka-shi, Kanagawa, 239-0847 / JP | [2005/25] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/25] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03029411.0 | 19.12.2003 | [2005/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1545040 | Date: | 22.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1545040 | Date: | 22.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/18, H04L1/00, H04B7/005 | [2005/25] | CPC: |
H04W52/286 (EP,US);
H04L1/18 (KR);
H04L1/00 (KR);
H04L1/1845 (EP,US);
H04L1/1887 (EP,US);
H04W52/262 (EP,US);
H04W52/343 (EP,US);
H04W52/48 (EP,US);
H04L1/0025 (EP,US);
H04L1/1819 (EP,US);
H04L1/1822 (EP,US);
H04L1/1825 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/51] |
Former [2005/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | HARQ Protokoll mit synchronen Wiederholungen | [2005/25] | English: | HARQ protocol with synchronous retransmissions | [2005/25] | French: | Protocole HARQ avec retransmissions synchrones | [2005/25] | Examination procedure | 22.12.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/08] | 31.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.11.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 05.11.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 16.01.2009 | Appeal received | 16.01.2009 | Statement of grounds filed | 18.02.2009 | Interlocutory revision of appeal | Opposition(s) | 25.01.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.04.2009 | BE | 22.04.2009 | CY | 22.04.2009 | CZ | 22.04.2009 | DK | 22.04.2009 | EE | 22.04.2009 | FI | 22.04.2009 | GR | 22.04.2009 | NL | 22.04.2009 | RO | 22.04.2009 | SE | 22.04.2009 | SI | 22.04.2009 | SK | 22.04.2009 | TR | 22.04.2009 | PT | 18.05.2009 | ES | 02.08.2009 | HU | 23.10.2009 | IE | 19.12.2009 | BG | 31.12.2009 | CH | 31.12.2009 | LI | 31.12.2009 | LU | 31.12.2009 | [2014/47] |
Former [2014/38] | AT | 22.04.2009 | |
CY | 22.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2009 | ||
DK | 22.04.2009 | ||
EE | 22.04.2009 | ||
FI | 22.04.2009 | ||
GR | 22.04.2009 | ||
NL | 22.04.2009 | ||
RO | 22.04.2009 | ||
SE | 22.04.2009 | ||
SI | 22.04.2009 | ||
SK | 22.04.2009 | ||
TR | 22.04.2009 | ||
PT | 18.05.2009 | ||
ES | 02.08.2009 | ||
HU | 23.10.2009 | ||
IE | 19.12.2009 | ||
BG | 31.12.2009 | ||
CH | 31.12.2009 | ||
LI | 31.12.2009 | ||
LU | 31.12.2009 | ||
Former [2013/32] | AT | 22.04.2009 | |
CY | 22.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2009 | ||
DK | 22.04.2009 | ||
EE | 22.04.2009 | ||
FI | 22.04.2009 | ||
NL | 22.04.2009 | ||
RO | 22.04.2009 | ||
SE | 22.04.2009 | ||
SI | 22.04.2009 | ||
SK | 22.04.2009 | ||
TR | 22.04.2009 | ||
PT | 18.05.2009 | ||
ES | 02.08.2009 | ||
HU | 23.10.2009 | ||
IE | 19.12.2009 | ||
BG | 31.12.2009 | ||
CH | 31.12.2009 | ||
LI | 31.12.2009 | ||
LU | 31.12.2009 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 22.04.2009 | |
CY | 22.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2009 | ||
DK | 22.04.2009 | ||
EE | 22.04.2009 | ||
FI | 22.04.2009 | ||
NL | 22.04.2009 | ||
RO | 22.04.2009 | ||
SI | 22.04.2009 | ||
SK | 22.04.2009 | ||
TR | 22.04.2009 | ||
PT | 18.05.2009 | ||
ES | 02.08.2009 | ||
HU | 23.10.2009 | ||
IE | 19.12.2009 | ||
BG | 31.12.2009 | ||
CH | 31.12.2009 | ||
LI | 31.12.2009 | ||
LU | 31.12.2009 | ||
Former [2011/44] | AT | 22.04.2009 | |
CY | 22.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2009 | ||
DK | 22.04.2009 | ||
EE | 22.04.2009 | ||
FI | 22.04.2009 | ||
NL | 22.04.2009 | ||
RO | 22.04.2009 | ||
SI | 22.04.2009 | ||
SK | 22.04.2009 | ||
TR | 22.04.2009 | ||
PT | 18.05.2009 | ||
HU | 23.10.2009 | ||
IE | 19.12.2009 | ||
BG | 31.12.2009 | ||
CH | 31.12.2009 | ||
LI | 31.12.2009 | ||
LU | 31.12.2009 | ||
Former [2011/31] | AT | 22.04.2009 | |
CZ | 22.04.2009 | ||
DK | 22.04.2009 | ||
EE | 22.04.2009 | ||
FI | 22.04.2009 | ||
NL | 22.04.2009 | ||
RO | 22.04.2009 | ||
SI | 22.04.2009 | ||
SK | 22.04.2009 | ||
PT | 18.05.2009 | ||
HU | 23.10.2009 | ||
IE | 19.12.2009 | ||
BG | 31.12.2009 | ||
CH | 31.12.2009 | ||
LI | 31.12.2009 | ||
LU | 31.12.2009 | ||
Former [2011/23] | AT | 22.04.2009 | |
CZ | 22.04.2009 | ||
DK | 22.04.2009 | ||
EE | 22.04.2009 | ||
FI | 22.04.2009 | ||
NL | 22.04.2009 | ||
RO | 22.04.2009 | ||
SI | 22.04.2009 | ||
PT | 18.05.2009 | ||
IE | 19.12.2009 | ||
BG | 31.12.2009 | ||
CH | 31.12.2009 | ||
LI | 31.12.2009 | ||
LU | 31.12.2009 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 22.04.2009 | |
CZ | 22.04.2009 | ||
DK | 22.04.2009 | ||
EE | 22.04.2009 | ||
FI | 22.04.2009 | ||
NL | 22.04.2009 | ||
RO | 22.04.2009 | ||
SI | 22.04.2009 | ||
PT | 18.05.2009 | ||
IE | 19.12.2009 | ||
BG | 31.12.2009 | ||
CH | 31.12.2009 | ||
LI | 31.12.2009 | ||
Former [2011/13] | AT | 22.04.2009 | |
CZ | 22.04.2009 | ||
DK | 22.04.2009 | ||
EE | 22.04.2009 | ||
FI | 22.04.2009 | ||
NL | 22.04.2009 | ||
RO | 22.04.2009 | ||
SI | 22.04.2009 | ||
PT | 18.05.2009 | ||
IE | 19.12.2009 | ||
CH | 31.12.2009 | ||
LI | 31.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/48] | AT | 22.04.2009 | |
CZ | 22.04.2009 | ||
DK | 22.04.2009 | ||
EE | 22.04.2009 | ||
NL | 22.04.2009 | ||
SI | 22.04.2009 | ||
PT | 18.05.2009 | ||
IE | 19.12.2009 | ||
CH | 31.12.2009 | ||
LI | 31.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/46] | AT | 22.04.2009 | |
CZ | 22.04.2009 | ||
DK | 22.04.2009 | ||
EE | 22.04.2009 | ||
NL | 22.04.2009 | ||
SI | 22.04.2009 | ||
PT | 18.05.2009 | ||
IE | 19.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 22.04.2009 | |
CZ | 22.04.2009 | ||
DK | 22.04.2009 | ||
EE | 22.04.2009 | ||
NL | 22.04.2009 | ||
SI | 22.04.2009 | ||
PT | 18.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | AT | 22.04.2009 | |
DK | 22.04.2009 | ||
EE | 22.04.2009 | ||
NL | 22.04.2009 | ||
SI | 22.04.2009 | ||
PT | 18.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/51] | AT | 22.04.2009 | |
NL | 22.04.2009 | ||
SI | 22.04.2009 | ||
PT | 18.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/50] | AT | 22.04.2009 | |
NL | 22.04.2009 | ||
PT | 18.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/38] | PT | 18.05.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6018516 (PACKER ROBERT L [US]) [A] 1-26* figure 2B *; | [A]EP1286491 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-26 * the whole document *; | [X]WO03021903 (SONY CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,6,15-26 * figures 10,14 *; | [X]WO03096567 (INTERDIGITAL TECH CORP [US]) [X] 1-6,9,15-27 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0052] *; | [X]WO03096617 (INTERDIGITAL TECH CORP [US]) [X] 1-4,15-26 * the whole document *; | [XL] - CHASE D, "CODE COMBINING - A MAXIMUM-LIKELIHOOD DECODING APPROACH FOR COMBINING AN ARBITRARY NUMBER OF NOISY PACKETS", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (198505), vol. COM-33, no. 5, ISSN 0090-6778, pages 385 - 393, XP000758537 [XL] 1-3,15-18,22,23,25,26 * Section III C: Two-way Links (ARQ Code Combining) * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TCOM.1985.1096314 |