EP1441466 - Method of controlling loop-back process in Ethernet passive optical network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.03.2012 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/18] | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 416 Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | ||
Former [2004/31] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lim, Se-Youn c/o 416, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Song, Jae-Yeon c/o 416, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Kim, A-Jung c/o 416, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
Kim, Jin-Hee c/o 416, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 05 /
Kim, Su-Hyung c/o 416, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 06 /
Lee, Min-Hyo c/o 416, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 07 /
Oh, Ho-Il c/o 416, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2010/49] |
Former [2004/31] | 01 /
Lim, Se-Youn 416, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | ||
02 /
Song, Jae-Yeon 416, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
03 /
Kim, A-Jung 416, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
04 /
Kim, Jin-Hee 416, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
05 /
Kim, Su-Hyung 416, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
06 /
Lee, Min-Hyo 416, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
07 /
Oh, Ho-Il 416, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/31] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03029625.5 | 22.12.2003 | [2004/31] | Priority number, date | KR20030000145 | 02.01.2003 Original published format: KR 2003000145 | [2004/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1441466 | Date: | 28.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1441466 | Date: | 01.04.2009 | [2009/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1441466 | Date: | 04.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/26, H04L1/24 | [2009/13] | CPC: |
H04L1/243 (EP,US);
H04L12/42 (KR);
H04L41/26 (EP,US);
H04L41/34 (EP);
H04L43/50 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/31] | H04L12/26 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/31] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Steuerung eines Rückschleifeprozesses in einem passiven, optischen Ethernetnetzwerk | [2004/31] | English: | Method of controlling loop-back process in Ethernet passive optical network | [2004/31] | French: | Procédé de contrôle d'un procédé de bouclage dans un réseau optique passif Ethernet | [2004/31] | Examination procedure | 22.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/31] | 09.03.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.11.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.11.2010 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 23.03.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 23.03.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.02.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.05.2011 | BE | 04.05.2011 | CY | 04.05.2011 | CZ | 04.05.2011 | DK | 04.05.2011 | EE | 04.05.2011 | FI | 04.05.2011 | HU | 04.05.2011 | IT | 04.05.2011 | RO | 04.05.2011 | SE | 04.05.2011 | SI | 04.05.2011 | SK | 04.05.2011 | TR | 04.05.2011 | BG | 04.08.2011 | GR | 05.08.2011 | ES | 15.08.2011 | PT | 05.09.2011 | IE | 22.12.2011 | LU | 22.12.2011 | CH | 31.12.2011 | LI | 31.12.2011 | MC | 31.12.2011 | FR | 02.01.2012 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 04.05.2011 | |
BE | 04.05.2011 | ||
CY | 04.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2011 | ||
DK | 04.05.2011 | ||
EE | 04.05.2011 | ||
FI | 04.05.2011 | ||
IT | 04.05.2011 | ||
RO | 04.05.2011 | ||
SE | 04.05.2011 | ||
SI | 04.05.2011 | ||
SK | 04.05.2011 | ||
TR | 04.05.2011 | ||
BG | 04.08.2011 | ||
GR | 05.08.2011 | ||
ES | 15.08.2011 | ||
PT | 05.09.2011 | ||
IE | 22.12.2011 | ||
LU | 22.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
FR | 02.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 04.05.2011 | |
BE | 04.05.2011 | ||
CY | 04.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2011 | ||
DK | 04.05.2011 | ||
EE | 04.05.2011 | ||
FI | 04.05.2011 | ||
IT | 04.05.2011 | ||
RO | 04.05.2011 | ||
SE | 04.05.2011 | ||
SI | 04.05.2011 | ||
SK | 04.05.2011 | ||
BG | 04.08.2011 | ||
GR | 05.08.2011 | ||
ES | 15.08.2011 | ||
PT | 05.09.2011 | ||
IE | 22.12.2011 | ||
LU | 22.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
FR | 02.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 04.05.2011 | |
BE | 04.05.2011 | ||
CY | 04.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2011 | ||
DK | 04.05.2011 | ||
EE | 04.05.2011 | ||
FI | 04.05.2011 | ||
IT | 04.05.2011 | ||
RO | 04.05.2011 | ||
SE | 04.05.2011 | ||
SI | 04.05.2011 | ||
SK | 04.05.2011 | ||
GR | 05.08.2011 | ||
ES | 15.08.2011 | ||
PT | 05.09.2011 | ||
IE | 22.12.2011 | ||
LU | 22.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
FR | 02.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/19] | AT | 04.05.2011 | |
BE | 04.05.2011 | ||
CY | 04.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2011 | ||
DK | 04.05.2011 | ||
EE | 04.05.2011 | ||
FI | 04.05.2011 | ||
IT | 04.05.2011 | ||
RO | 04.05.2011 | ||
SE | 04.05.2011 | ||
SI | 04.05.2011 | ||
SK | 04.05.2011 | ||
GR | 05.08.2011 | ||
ES | 15.08.2011 | ||
PT | 05.09.2011 | ||
IE | 22.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
FR | 02.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | AT | 04.05.2011 | |
BE | 04.05.2011 | ||
CY | 04.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2011 | ||
DK | 04.05.2011 | ||
EE | 04.05.2011 | ||
FI | 04.05.2011 | ||
IT | 04.05.2011 | ||
RO | 04.05.2011 | ||
SE | 04.05.2011 | ||
SI | 04.05.2011 | ||
SK | 04.05.2011 | ||
GR | 05.08.2011 | ||
ES | 15.08.2011 | ||
PT | 05.09.2011 | ||
IE | 22.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/47] | AT | 04.05.2011 | |
BE | 04.05.2011 | ||
CY | 04.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2011 | ||
DK | 04.05.2011 | ||
EE | 04.05.2011 | ||
FI | 04.05.2011 | ||
IT | 04.05.2011 | ||
RO | 04.05.2011 | ||
SE | 04.05.2011 | ||
SI | 04.05.2011 | ||
SK | 04.05.2011 | ||
GR | 05.08.2011 | ||
ES | 15.08.2011 | ||
PT | 05.09.2011 | ||
IE | 22.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/33] | AT | 04.05.2011 | |
BE | 04.05.2011 | ||
CY | 04.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2011 | ||
DK | 04.05.2011 | ||
EE | 04.05.2011 | ||
FI | 04.05.2011 | ||
IT | 04.05.2011 | ||
RO | 04.05.2011 | ||
SE | 04.05.2011 | ||
SI | 04.05.2011 | ||
SK | 04.05.2011 | ||
GR | 05.08.2011 | ||
ES | 15.08.2011 | ||
PT | 05.09.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 04.05.2011 | |
BE | 04.05.2011 | ||
CY | 04.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2011 | ||
DK | 04.05.2011 | ||
EE | 04.05.2011 | ||
FI | 04.05.2011 | ||
IT | 04.05.2011 | ||
RO | 04.05.2011 | ||
SE | 04.05.2011 | ||
SI | 04.05.2011 | ||
SK | 04.05.2011 | ||
GR | 05.08.2011 | ||
ES | 15.08.2011 | ||
PT | 05.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | AT | 04.05.2011 | |
BE | 04.05.2011 | ||
CY | 04.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2011 | ||
DK | 04.05.2011 | ||
EE | 04.05.2011 | ||
FI | 04.05.2011 | ||
RO | 04.05.2011 | ||
SE | 04.05.2011 | ||
SI | 04.05.2011 | ||
SK | 04.05.2011 | ||
GR | 05.08.2011 | ||
ES | 15.08.2011 | ||
PT | 05.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | AT | 04.05.2011 | |
BE | 04.05.2011 | ||
CY | 04.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2011 | ||
EE | 04.05.2011 | ||
FI | 04.05.2011 | ||
SE | 04.05.2011 | ||
SI | 04.05.2011 | ||
GR | 05.08.2011 | ||
ES | 15.08.2011 | ||
PT | 05.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 04.05.2011 | |
BE | 04.05.2011 | ||
CY | 04.05.2011 | ||
FI | 04.05.2011 | ||
SE | 04.05.2011 | ||
SI | 04.05.2011 | ||
GR | 05.08.2011 | ||
ES | 15.08.2011 | ||
PT | 05.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/52] | AT | 04.05.2011 | |
CY | 04.05.2011 | ||
FI | 04.05.2011 | ||
SE | 04.05.2011 | ||
SI | 04.05.2011 | ||
GR | 05.08.2011 | ||
ES | 15.08.2011 | ||
PT | 05.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 04.05.2011 | |
FI | 04.05.2011 | ||
SE | 04.05.2011 | ||
SI | 04.05.2011 | ||
GR | 05.08.2011 | ||
ES | 15.08.2011 | ||
PT | 05.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 04.05.2011 | |
FI | 04.05.2011 | ||
SE | 04.05.2011 | ||
GR | 05.08.2011 | ||
ES | 15.08.2011 | ||
PT | 05.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | PT | 05.09.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9859521 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [A] 2-5 * page 8, line 28 - page 11, line 20 * * figure 4 *; | [XY] - B.BROWN ET AL., "EFM OAM Loopback", IEEE P802.3AH ETHERNET IN THE FIRST MILE TASK FORCE, (200209), pages 1 - 9, XP002514840 [X] 1,6 *Slides 1-4* *Slide 6* [Y] 2-5 | [YA] - B.BARRETT, "EFM OAM - Loop back and status indication", IEEE P802.3AH ETHERNET IN THE FIRST MILE TASK FORCE, (200203), pages 1 - 9, XP002514839 [Y] 2-5 *Slide 6* [A] 1,6 | [T] - K.DAINES, "IEEE P802.3ah EFM OAM Draft Development", IEEE P802.3AH ETHERNET IN THE FIRST MILE TASK FORCE, (20020611), pages 1 - 30, XP002514838 [T] 1-6 *Slide 7* *Slide 17* *Slide 21* | by applicant | - K.DAINES, "IEEE P802.3ah EFM OAM Draft Development", IEEE P802.3AH ETHERNET IN THE FIRST MILE TASK FORCE, (20020611), pages 1 - 30, XP002514838 |