EP1352976 - Probe array [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2003/42] | Method of spotting probe on solid support, probe array and method of manufacturing thereof, and method of detecting target substance and method of identifying structure of target substance using probe array | ||
[2011/40] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.08.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 11.09.2013 [2013/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [2012/37] |
Former [2003/42] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Okamoto, Tadashi C/0 Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Yamamoto, Nobuko c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Suzuki, Tomohiro c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [2012/37] |
Former [2003/42] | 01 /
Okamoto, Tadashi C/0 Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
02 /
Yamamoto, Nobuko c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | |||
03 /
Suzuki, Tomohiro c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Representative(s) | Weser, Wolfgang, et al Weser & Kollegen Patentanwälte Radeckestrasse 43 81245 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/37] | Weser, Wolfgang, et al Weser & Kollegen Patentanwälte Radeckestrasse 43 81245 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/21] | Weser, Wolfgang, et al Weser & Kollegen, Patentanwälte Radeckestrasse 43 81245 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/42] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court, High Holborn London WC1R 5DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 03076692.7 | 31.07.1998 | [2003/42] | Priority number, date | JP19970207837 | 01.08.1997 Original published format: JP 20783797 | JP19970287046 | 20.10.1997 Original published format: JP 28704697 | JP19980209923 | 24.07.1998 Original published format: JP 20992398 | [2003/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1352976 | Date: | 15.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1352976 | Date: | 29.10.2003 | [2003/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1352976 | Date: | 12.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, G01N33/543, G01N33/68, C12N11/14, B01J19/00, B01L3/02, C07B61/00, C07H21/00 | [2003/42] | CPC: |
B01L3/0268 (EP,US);
B01J19/0046 (EP,US);
C07H21/00 (EP,US);
C12N11/14 (EP,US);
C12N15/11 (EP,US);
C12Q1/00 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6837 (EP,US);
C40B30/04 (EP,US);
C40B50/14 (EP,US);
G01N33/54366 (EP,US);
G01N33/68 (EP,US);
G01N33/6845 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00274 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00315 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00317 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00378 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00432 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00497 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00527 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00585 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00596 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00605 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00612 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00619 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00621 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00626 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00637 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00659 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00677 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00702 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00722 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00725 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00729 (EP,US);
B01L2200/143 (EP,US);
B01L2400/0442 (EP,US);
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
C07B2200/11 (EP,US);
C12N2310/351 (EP,US);
C40B40/06 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2003/42] | Title | German: | Sondenarray | [2011/40] | English: | Probe array | [2011/40] | French: | Réseau de sondes | [2011/40] |
Former [2003/42] | Verfahren zur Probenaufgabe auf festen Trägern, Sondenarray und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung, und Verfahren zum Nachweis einer Zielsubstanz und Verfahren zur Identifizierung der Struktur der Zielsubstanz unter Benutzung von Sondenarrays | ||
Former [2003/42] | Method of spotting probe on solid support, probe array and method of manufacturing thereof, and method of detecting target substance and method of identifying structure of target substance using probe array | ||
Former [2003/42] | Procédé pour déposer des échantillons sur des supports solides, réseau de sondes et procédé de sa fabrication, et procédé de détection d'un substance cible et procédé d'identification de structure d'un substance cible utilisant des réseau de sondes | Examination procedure | 26.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/22] | 28.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.01.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 25.01.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP98306107.8 / EP0895082 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19980306107) is 26.10.2000 | Opposition(s) | 13.06.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 02.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 01.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 31.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.09.2012 | BE | 12.09.2012 | CY | 12.09.2012 | DK | 12.09.2012 | FI | 12.09.2012 | IT | 12.09.2012 | NL | 12.09.2012 | SE | 12.09.2012 | GR | 13.12.2012 | ES | 23.12.2012 | PT | 14.01.2013 | [2013/37] |
Former [2013/34] | AT | 12.09.2012 | |
BE | 12.09.2012 | ||
CY | 12.09.2012 | ||
DK | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
ES | 23.12.2012 | ||
PT | 14.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 12.09.2012 | |
BE | 12.09.2012 | ||
CY | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
ES | 23.12.2012 | ||
PT | 14.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | BE | 12.09.2012 | |
CY | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
ES | 23.12.2012 | ||
PT | 14.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | BE | 12.09.2012 | |
CY | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
ES | 23.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | BE | 12.09.2012 | |
CY | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | CY | 12.09.2012 | |
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 12.09.2012 | |
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 12.09.2012 | |
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | FI | 12.09.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH0954093 ; | [A]JPS5921391 ; | [A]JPH04359072 ; | [A]JPH07179797 ; | [A]JPH0666799 ; | [A]US5108926 (KLEBE ROBERT J [US]) [A] 1,23-25 * column 9, line 1 - line 19 * * column 4, line 35 - line 41 * * column 3, line 31 - line 32 * * column 3, lines 1-22 *; | [A]US5324650 (OBZANSKY DAVID M [US], et al) [A] 7-11,48,49,64,87-91,127-131 * column 4, line 4 - line 14 * * column A; example 1 *; | [DX]US5405783 (PIRRUNG MICHAEL C [US], et al) [DX] 41-47,52-56,58-63,68-76,80,121 * column A; claim - * * column 6, line 44 - column 7, line 68 * * column 11, line 37 - line 40 * * column 11, line 55 - column 12, line 18 *; | [DXA]US5474796 (BRENNAN THOMAS M [US]) [DX] 41-47,51-56,80 * column 2, line 10 - column 3, line 35 * [A] 1-6,23-29,81-86,103-109,121-126,143-149; | [A]WO9535505 (UNIV LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR [US]) [A] 30,33,35-37,39,40,57,78,79,113,115-117,119,120,150,153,155-157,159,160 * page 18, line 16 - line 21 * * page 23, line 30 - page 25, line 33 * * figure 11 *; | [A]US5601980 (GORDON GARY B [US], et al); | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970630), vol. 097, no. 006, & JP09054093 A 19970225 (ADTEC KK) [X] 1-6,23-27,29,81-86,103-107,109,121-126,143-147,149 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840518), vol. 008, no. 106, Database accession no. (C - 223), & JP59021391 A 19840203 (SHIMAZU SEISAKUSHO KK) [A] 13,14,50,66,93,94,133,134 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 93, no. 04, Database accession no. 93-031735, XP002105850 & JPH04359072 A 19921211 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [A] 16,17,96,97,136,137 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951130), vol. 095, no. 010, & JP07179797 A 19950718 (CANON INC) [A] 16,22,96,102,136,142 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940610), vol. 018, no. 306, Database accession no. (P - 1752), & JP06066799 A 19940311 (S R L:KK) [A] 31,32,111,112,151,152 * abstract * | [A] - O'DONNELL-MALONEY M J ET AL, "Microfabrication and array technologies for DNA sequencing and diagnostics", GENETIC ANALYSIS: BIOMOLECULAR ENGINEERING, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHING, US, (19961201), vol. 13, no. 6, ISSN 1050-3862, pages 151 - 157, XP004017264 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1050-3862(96)00166-0 | [A] - CHRISEY L A ET AL, "FABRICATION OF PATTERNED DNA SURFACES", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, SURREY, GB, (1996), vol. 24, no. 15, ISSN 0305-1048, pages 3040 - 3047, XP002913337 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/24.15.3040 |