EP1416411 - Systems and techniques to facilitate communications among individuals in an enterprise may use collaborative conversation channels that are associated with specific communities within the enterprise. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 25.01.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.01.2008 | Refusal of application | published on 27.02.2008 [2008/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAP AG Dietmar-Hopp-Allee 16 69190 Walldorf / DE | [2005/51] |
Former [2004/19] | For all designated states SAP AG Neurottstrasse 16 69190 Walldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Beringer, Joerg Wildenbruchstrasse 49 60431 Frankfurt / DE | [2004/19] | Representative(s) | Prins, Adrianus Willem, et al V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2004/19] | Prins, Adrianus Willem, Mr. Ir., et al Vereenigde, Nieuwe Parklaan 97 2587 BN Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 03078296.5 | 17.10.2003 | [2004/19] | Priority number, date | US20020422363P | 29.10.2002 Original published format: US 422363 P | US20030649377 | 27.08.2003 Original published format: US 649377 | [2004/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1416411 | Date: | 06.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1416411 | Date: | 09.06.2004 | [2004/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/60 | [2004/19] | CPC: |
G06Q10/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/19] | Title | German: | Systeme und Techniken zum Erleichtern der Kommunikation zwischen Einzelpersonen in einem Unternehmen mittels kollaborativen Gesprächskanälen, die mit spezifischen Gemeinschaften in dem Unternehmen verbunden sind | [2004/19] | English: | Systems and techniques to facilitate communications among individuals in an enterprise may use collaborative conversation channels that are associated with specific communities within the enterprise. | [2004/19] | French: | Systèmes et techniques de facilitation de la communication entre les individus d'une entreprise utilisant des canaux de conversation collaboratifs qui sont associés à des communautés spécifiques dans l'entreprise | [2004/19] | Examination procedure | 23.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/48] | 03.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 26.09.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2008/09] | 26.09.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 06.10.2007 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2008/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6078948 (PODGORNY MAREK [US], et al) [X] 1-35 * abstract * * page 17, column 3, lines 33-39 - column 4, lines 28-38 * * page 18, column 5, lines 9-19,48-64 - column 6, lines 52-59 * * page 19, column 8, lines 30-39 *; | [X]US2002097267 (DINAN MARK ANDREW [US], et al) [X] 1-35 * abstract * * page 2, paragraphs 13,14,16 - page 3, paragraphs 37,39,40,44 * * page 4, paragraphs 47,50,52 - page 5, paragraph 58 *; | [PX]US2003014482 (TOYOTA MAYO [JP], et al) [PX] 1-35 * abstract * * page 2, paragraphs 34-36 - page 3, paragraphs 40,46,59 ** page 4, paragraphs 104-106 - page 5, paragraphs 107,108 *; | [X] - LEE J H ET AL, SUPPORTING MULTI-USER, MULTI-APPLET WORKSPACES IN CBE, CSCW '96. PROCEEDINGS OF THE ACM 1996 CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER SUPPORTEDCOOPERATIVE WORK. BOSTON, NOV. 16 - 20, 1996, ACM CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER SUPPORTED COOPERATIVE WORK, NEW YORK,NY: ACM, US, PAGE(S) 344-353, ISBN 0-89791-765-0, XP000724421 [X] 1-35 * abstract * * page 344, column 2, paragraph 1 * * page 345, column 1, paragraph 2 - column 2, paragraphs 2,3,8,9 * * page 347, column 1, paragraphs 4,5 * * page 348, column 1, paragraphs 5,8,9 - column 2, paragraphs 7,8,10 * * page 349, column 1, paragraphs 1,2 - page 350, column 1, paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/240080.240326 | [A] - SAUL GREENBERG, "Collaborative Interfaces for the Web", HUMAN FACTORS AND WEB DEVELOPMENT, XX, XX, (1997), pages 241 - 253, XP002262651 [A] 1-35 * page 241, paragraph 3 * * page 243, paragraph 3 * * page 247, paragraph 1 * * page 249, paragraph 3 * |