EP1420370 - Communicating data relating to a site having one or more visitor destinations [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.02.2006 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.04.2006 [2006/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mymobiletimes Ltd Sycamore House Harden Hewish Chippenham SN14 6HN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/21] | For all designated states Mymobiletimes Ltd Sycamore House Harden Hewish, Chippenham SN14 6HN / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tapsell, David Leslie 16 Martingale Road Burbage, Marlborough SN8 3TY / GB | 02 /
Nicholas, John Nigel Davies Beaven House Fore Street Chudleigh Newton Abbott, Devon TQ13 0HX / GB | 03 /
Monnery, Andrew William Martello House Three Gables Lane Streatley, Berkshire RG8 9LJ / GB | [2004/21] | Representative(s) | Dunlop, Brian Kenneth Charles, et al Wynne-Jones, Lainé & James LLP Essex Place 22 Rodney Road Cheltenham Gloucestershire GL50 1JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/21] | Dunlop, Brian Kenneth Charles, et al Wynne-Jones, Lainé & James 22 Rodney Road Cheltenham Gloucestershire GL50 1JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 03078378.1 | 27.10.2003 | [2004/21] | Priority number, date | GB20020025867 | 06.11.2002 Original published format: GB 0225867 | [2004/27] |
Former [2004/21] | GB20020025867 | 06.11.2002 | |
US20020423990P | 06.11.2002 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1420370 | Date: | 19.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G07C11/00 | [2004/21] | CPC: |
G06Q30/02 (EP,US);
G06Q10/02 (EP,US);
G06Q10/1095 (EP,US);
G07B15/00 (EP,US);
G07C11/00 (EP,US);
G07C2011/02 (EP,US);
G07C2011/04 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB [2005/06] |
Former [2004/21] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Übertragen von Daten, die sich auf Örtlichkeiten mit einem oder mehreren Besucherzielen beziehen | [2004/21] | English: | Communicating data relating to a site having one or more visitor destinations | [2004/21] | French: | Communication de données en relation avec une location avec un ou plusieurs destinations a visiter | [2004/21] | Examination procedure | 18.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/03] | 20.11.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 16.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.03.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 27.09.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/15] | 03.11.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/15] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 29.12.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.12.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.12.2004 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 29.12.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 29.12.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 29.12.2004 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 29.12.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 29.12.2004 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.12.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 29.12.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 29.12.2004 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 29.12.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.12.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.12.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 29.12.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 29.12.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 29.12.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.12.2004 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 29.12.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.12.2004 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 29.12.2004 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 29.12.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2005 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5978770 (WAYTENA WILLIAM [US], et al) [X] 1-9,13,17,19-21 * the whole document *[Y] 10-12,15,16; | [XY]WO02084556 (PRYTZ SVEN [SE]) [X] 1-9,13,14,17-22 * abstract * * page 3, line 23 - page 5, line 30 * * page 8, line 5 - page 16, line 20; claim - * [Y] 10-12,15,16 |