EP1361699 - Method and system for monitoring of a network device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.05.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 31.12.2008 [2009/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [2006/26] |
Former [2003/46] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Torii, Minoru, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2003/46] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/46] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court, High Holborn London WC1R 5DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 03252621.2 | 25.04.2003 | [2003/46] | Priority number, date | JP20020129329 | 30.04.2002 Original published format: JP 2002129329 | JP20020129330 | 30.04.2002 Original published format: JP 2002129330 | [2003/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1361699 | Date: | 12.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1361699 | Date: | 28.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/26 | [2003/46] | CPC: |
H04L41/0213 (EP,US);
H04L41/045 (EP);
H04L41/06 (EP,US);
H04L41/069 (EP,US);
H04L41/0896 (US);
H04L41/22 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2004/32] |
Former [2003/46] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zur Überwachung eines Netzwerkgerätes | [2003/46] | English: | Method and system for monitoring of a network device | [2003/46] | French: | Méthode et système pour la surveillance d'un dispositif de réseau | [2003/46] | Examination procedure | 26.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/22] | 29.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 15.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.04.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Divisional application(s) | EP06075784.6 / EP1679825 | EP07075580.6 / EP1843522 | Opposition(s) | 29.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/23] | Request for further processing for: | 12.05.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 12.05.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.05.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 28.06.2006 | IT | 28.06.2006 | NL | 28.06.2006 | DE | 29.09.2006 | ES | 09.10.2006 | [2009/01] |
Former [2007/40] | IT | 28.06.2006 | |
NL | 28.06.2006 | ||
DE | 29.09.2006 | ||
ES | 09.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | NL | 28.06.2006 | |
ES | 09.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | ES | 09.10.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4972367 (BURKE THOMAS J [US]) [X] 1-21 * abstract * * figures 1,9-11 * * column 2, line 10 - line 57 * * column 3, line 54 - column 4, line 15 * * column 5, line 4 - line 20 * * column 5, line 64 - column 6, line 37 * * column 9, line 43 - line 49 * * column 14, line 34 - line 68 * * column 15, line 63 - column 16, line 17 *; | [YA]US5638514 (YOSHIDA KOJUN [JP], et al) [Y] 1-3,5-10,20,21 * abstract * * figure 1 * * column 2, line 14 - line 34 * * column 3, line 1 - line 35 * [A] 4,11-19; | [YA]US6182134 (COLLINS MICHAEL G [US], et al) [Y] 1-3,5-10,20,21 * abstract * * figures 1-3 * * column 2, line 48 - line 58 * * column 3, line 43 - column 4, line 43 *[A] 4,11-19 |