EP1406225 - Universal-type remote controller [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.01.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.02.2014 [2014/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | [2012/38] |
Former [2004/41] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan 3-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 442-742 / KR | ||
Former [2004/15] | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 416, Maetan-dong, Paldal-gu Suwon-City, Kyungki-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ha, Hoeseong, No. 422-1702 Gunyoung Apt. Chungmyungmaul 4 danji Youngtong-dong Paldal-gu Suwon-city Kyungki-do / KR | [2013/12] |
Former [2004/15] | 01 /
Ha, Hoeseong, No. 422-1702 Gunyoung Apt. Chungmyungmaul 4 danji Youngtong-dong Paldal-gu Suwon-city Kyungki-do / KR | Representative(s) | Walaski, Jan Filip, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/12] | Walaski, Jan Filip, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | ||
Former [2010/21] | Walaski, Jan Filip, et al Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | ||
Former [2004/15] | Geary, Stuart Lloyd, et al Venner, Shipley & Co., 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 03256010.4 | 24.09.2003 | [2004/15] | Priority number, date | KR20020060506 | 04.10.2002 Original published format: KR 2002060506 | [2004/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1406225 | Date: | 07.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1406225 | Date: | 22.03.2006 | [2006/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1406225 | Date: | 20.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G08C19/28, H04N5/445 | [2006/12] | CPC: |
G08C19/28 (EP,US);
H04Q9/00 (KR);
G08C2201/92 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/15] | G08C19/28 | Designated contracting states | GB, NL [2006/48] |
Former [2004/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Universalfernbedienung | [2004/15] | English: | Universal-type remote controller | [2004/15] | French: | Télécommande universelle | [2004/15] | Examination procedure | 21.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/44] | 23.09.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 24.01.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 14.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 05.02.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.04.2008 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 03.11.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.2006 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.2006 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6262780 (HO KESSE [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * column 3, line 47 - column 6, line 11 *; | [A]US2002024617 (KWON IL GUN [KR]) [A] 1-20 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0039] ** paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0058] * | by applicant | KR930006709 |