EP1419990 - Method of forming a via hole through a glass wafer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.03.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.03.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.04.2012 [2012/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Paldal-gu Suwon-City, Kyungki-do / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/19] | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 416, Maetan-dong, Paldal-gu Suwon-City, Kyungki-do / KR | ||
Former [2004/21] | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 416, Maetan-dong, Paldal-gu Suwon-City, Kyungki-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Moon-chul 1003-804 Samsung Apartment Imae-dong Bundang-gu Sungnam-city Gyunggi-do / KR | 02 /
Choi, Hyung 125-603 Sibeomdanji Hansin Apartment Seohyun-dong Bundang-gu Sungnam-city Gyunggi-do / KR | 03 /
Jung, Kyu-dong 946-806 Lotte Apartment Youngtong-dong Paldal-gu Suwon-city Gyunggi-do / KR | 04 /
Jang, Mi 606-1 Ha-dong Paldal-gu Suwon-city Gyunggi-do / KR | [2004/21] | Representative(s) | Ertl, Nicholas Justin Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/21] | Ertl, Nicholas Justin Elkington and Fife, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 03256961.8 | 04.11.2003 | [2004/21] | Priority number, date | KR20020070121 | 12.11.2002 Original published format: KR 2002070121 | [2004/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1419990 | Date: | 19.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1419990 | Date: | 30.11.2005 | [2005/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1419990 | Date: | 11.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B81B1/00 | [2004/21] | CPC: |
B81C1/00087 (EP,US);
H01L21/84 (KR);
H01L21/486 (EP,US);
H01L23/13 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/31] |
Former [2004/21] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Durchgangsloches in einem Wafer aus Glas | [2004/21] | English: | Method of forming a via hole through a glass wafer | [2004/21] | French: | Procédé de formation d'un trou traversant dans une plaquette de verre | [2004/21] | Examination procedure | 24.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/27] | 26.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.01.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.03.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 23.03.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.02.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JP2001341314 ; | [PXY] - OBERHAMMER J ET AL, "Incrementally etched electrical feedthroughs for wafer-level transfer of glass lid packages", TRANSDUCERS, SOLID-STATE SENSORS, ACTUATORS AND MICROSYSTEMS, 12TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE, 2003, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, IEEE, (20030609), vol. 2, ISBN 0-7803-7731-1, pages 1832 - 1835, XP010647406 [PX] 1,3,5-10 * abstract * [Y] 4,2 | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20020804), vol. 2002, no. 04, & JP2001341314 A 20011211 (RICOH CO LTD) [X] 1,3,5-10 * abstract * * Abstract; paragraphs [0029] - [0040]; figure 8 * [Y] 4,2 | [Y] - GRETILLAT M-A ET AL, "A new fabrication method for borosilicate glass capillary tubes with lateral inlets and outlets", SENSORS AND ACTUATORS A, ELSEVIER SEQUOIA S.A., LAUSANNE, CH, (199705), vol. 60, no. 1-3, ISSN 0924-4247, pages 219 - 222, XP004134625 [Y] 2 * page 219 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0924-4247(97)01360-5 | [XY] - DIEPOLD T ET AL, "Smoothing of ultrasonically drilled holes in borosilicate glass by wet chemical etching", JOURNAL OF MICROMECHANICS AND MICROENGINEERING, IOP PUBLISHING, UK, (199603), vol. 6, no. 1, ISSN 0960-1317, pages 29 - 32, XP002346952 [X] 1 * the whole document * [Y] 4 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/0960-1317/6/1/003 | [X] - SCHLAUTMANN S ET AL, "Powder-blasting technology as an alternative tool for microfabrication of capillary electrophoresis chips with integrated conductivity sensors", JOURNAL OF MICROMECHANICS AND MICROENGINEERING, IOP PUBLISHING, UK, (20001001), vol. 11, no. 4, ISSN 0960-1317, pages 386 - 389, XP002221383 [X] 1 * Section "2.1 Channel etching" on page 387 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/0960-1317/11/4/318 | [X] - BELLOY E ET AL, "Micromachining of glass inertial sensors", JOURNAL OF MICROELECTROMECHANICAL SYSTEMS, IEEE, USA, (200202), vol. 11, no. 1, ISSN 1057-7157, pages 85 - 90, XP001124520 [X] 1 * Section "B. Erosion Mechanism" on page 86 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/84.982867 | [A] - WENSINK H ET AL, "Fine tuning the roughness of powder blasted surfaces", JOURNAL OF MICROMECHANICS AND MICROENGINEERING, IOP PUBLISHING, UK, (200209), vol. 12, no. 5, ISSN 0960-1317, pages 616 - 620, XP002346953 [A] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/0960-1317/12/5/316 | by applicant | JP2001341314 | - "A new fabrication method for borosilicate glass capillary tubes with lateral inlets and outlets", SENSORS AND ACTUATORS A, (199705), vol. 60, no. 1-3, pages 219 - 222 | - "Smoothing of ultrasonically drilled holes in borosilicate glass by wet chemical etching", JOURNAL OF MICROMECHANICS AND MICROENGINEERING, (19960301), vol. 6, pages 29 - 32 |