|
03.07.2012 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.06.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.06.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.06.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.06.2012 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
17 |
|
11.05.2012 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
4 |
|
08.03.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.03.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.03.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.03.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.03.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.02.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.02.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.02.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.02.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.02.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
31.01.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.01.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.01.2012 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.01.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.01.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.01.2012 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.01.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.01.2012 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
4 |
|
12.01.2012 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.09.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.09.2010 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
09.09.2010 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
31.05.2010 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.05.2010 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.05.2010 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.05.2010 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
07.05.2010 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.05.2010 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.05.2010 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
06.05.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.05.2010 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.04.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.04.2010 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.04.2010 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.03.2010 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
7 |
|
29.03.2010 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
9 |
|
23.02.2010 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.02.2010 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.02.2010 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.02.2010 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.01.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.01.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.01.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.12.2009 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.12.2009 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.12.2009 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
22.12.2009 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.12.2009 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.12.2009 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.12.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.12.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.12.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.12.2009 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.12.2009 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.12.2009 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
22.12.2009 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
22.12.2009 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.12.2009 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
10 |
|
13.10.2009 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.10.2009 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.10.2009 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.10.2009 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.09.2009 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.09.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.09.2009 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.09.2009 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.08.2009 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.08.2009 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
27.08.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
27.08.2009 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.08.2009 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
21.08.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.08.2009 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.08.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.08.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.08.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.08.2009 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.08.2009 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.08.2009 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.08.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
31.07.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.07.2009 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.07.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
27.04.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.04.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.04.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.04.2009 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
16.04.2009 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.04.2009 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
16.04.2009 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.04.2009 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.04.2009 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.02.2009 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
09.02.2009 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
31.10.2008 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.10.2008 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.2008 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.09.2008 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
16.09.2008 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
16.09.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
16.09.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
16.09.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
16.09.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
10.09.2008 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
10.09.2008 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
10.09.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.09.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.09.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.09.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.11.2007 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.11.2007 |
Approval of request for amendments/corrections |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.10.2007 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.10.2007 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.10.2007 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.06.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
25.06.2007 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.06.2007 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.06.2007 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.06.2007 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.2007 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.2007 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.03.2007 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
16.02.2007 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.08.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.08.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
01.08.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.08.2005 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.2004 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.04.2004 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.03.2004 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.03.2004 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.03.2004 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.02.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.02.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.02.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2003 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
14.11.2003 |
Description |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
14.11.2003 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2003 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.11.2003 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
14.11.2003 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |