EP1431580 - Screw compressor with in-line oil separator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/26] | In-line oil separator | ||
[2006/11] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.03.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CARRIER CORPORATION One Carrier Place Farmington Connecticut 06034-4015 / US | [2006/52] |
Former [2004/26] | For all designated states CARRIER CORPORATION Carrier Parkway P.O. Box 4800 Syracuse New York 13221 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bush, James W. 11 Academy Street Skaneateles, New York 13152 / US | [2004/26] | Representative(s) | Leckey, David Herbert Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Leckey, David Herbert Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2004/26] | Leckey, David H. Frank B. Dehn & Co., 179 Queen Victoria Street London EV4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 03257452.7 | 26.11.2003 | [2004/26] | Priority number, date | US20020319965 | 16.12.2002 Original published format: US 319965 | [2004/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1431580 | Date: | 23.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1431580 | Date: | 16.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F04B39/16 | [2004/26] | CPC: |
F04C29/026 (EP,US);
F25B43/04 (KR);
F04B39/16 (EP,US);
F04C29/0092 (EP,US);
F25B43/02 (EP,US);
F04C18/16 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2005/11] |
Former [2004/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Schraubenverdichter mit in-line Öl-Abscheider | [2006/11] | English: | Screw compressor with in-line oil separator | [2006/11] | French: | Compresseur à vis avec séparateur d'huile en ligne | [2006/11] |
Former [2004/26] | In-line Öl-Abscheider | ||
Former [2004/26] | In-line oil separator | ||
Former [2004/26] | Séparateur d'huile en ligne | Examination procedure | 27.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/26] | 12.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.12.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 31.03.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 09.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 20.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.01.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR | Opposition(s) | 19.02.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/17] | Request for further processing for: | 09.06.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 09.06.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.06.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 27.01.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH11132145 ; | [A]GB638315 (PERCIVAL JOHN JARVIS, et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [X]DE1172798 (GRAUBREMSE GMBH) [X] 1-4,11-14 * the whole document *; | [X]FR1524351 (LANGLET FROID S A) [X] 1-4,11-14 * page 1, column R, line 33 - page 2, column L, line 36; figure 1 *; | [X]FR1573527 (PITZNER FINN) [X] 1,11 * page 1, line 30 - page 2, line 18; figure . *; | [A]EP0843093 (CARRIER CORP [US]) [A] 1-14* abstract *; | [X]EP0867618 (ATLAS COPCO AIRPOWER NV [BE]) [X] 1,2,5,11 * column 2, line 33 - column 5, line 10; figures 1,2 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990831), vol. 1999, no. 10, & JP11132145 A 19990518 (ORION MACH CO LTD) [X] 1-3,11-14 * abstract * | Examination | US6080228 |