|
19.10.2017 |
Request for change of client data cannot be registered anymore |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.2017 |
Request for change of client data cannot be registered anymore |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.10.2017 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.10.2017 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.10.2016 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.09.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.09.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.09.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.09.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.09.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.09.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.09.2016 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
24 |
|
06.09.2016 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.09.2016 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.09.2016 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.08.2016 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.08.2016 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2016 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.07.2016 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.07.2016 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.06.2016 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
29.04.2016 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.04.2016 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.04.2016 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.04.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.04.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.04.2016 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.04.2016 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.04.2016 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.04.2016 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
11 |
|
05.04.2016 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
11 |
|
05.04.2016 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
11 |
|
29.03.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.03.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.03.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.03.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.03.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.03.2016 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.03.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.03.2016 |
Request concerning the applicant/representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.03.2016 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.03.2016 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.10.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.10.2015 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.10.2015 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.10.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.10.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.10.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.10.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.10.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.10.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.10.2015 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
6 |
|
08.10.2015 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.05.2014 |
Request for change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.01.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.01.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.01.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.01.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
16.01.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
16.01.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
16.01.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.01.2014 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
13 |
|
03.12.2013 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.11.2013 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.11.2013 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.11.2013 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.11.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.11.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.11.2013 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.07.2013 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.07.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.07.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.07.2013 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
4 |
|
01.07.2013 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
4 |
|
27.06.2013 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.06.2013 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
27.06.2013 |
Non-scannable object |
Appeal |
4 |
|
27.06.2013 |
Non-scannable object |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.06.2013 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
6 |
|
25.06.2013 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
15 |
|
23.04.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.04.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.04.2013 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.04.2013 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.04.2013 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.04.2013 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.04.2013 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
18.04.2013 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.04.2013 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.04.2013 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.04.2013 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.03.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.02.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.02.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.02.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.2013 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
25.02.2013 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.2013 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.02.2013 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
25.02.2013 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.2013 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.2013 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.2013 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.2013 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.2013 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.01.2013 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.01.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.01.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.01.2013 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.12.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.12.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.11.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.11.2012 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.11.2012 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.11.2012 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.11.2012 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.11.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.11.2012 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.11.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.11.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.2012 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.11.2012 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.11.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.11.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.11.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.11.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.11.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.11.2012 |
Request for change of name -opponent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.11.2012 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.10.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.10.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.10.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.10.2012 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.10.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.10.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.10.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.10.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.10.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.10.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.10.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.10.2012 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.10.2012 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.10.2012 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.10.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.10.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.10.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.10.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.10.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.10.2012 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.10.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.10.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.10.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.10.2012 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.10.2012 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.10.2012 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.10.2012 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.10.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.10.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.10.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.10.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.10.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.10.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.10.2012 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
05.10.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.10.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.10.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.09.2012 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.09.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.09.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.09.2012 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.08.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.08.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.08.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.08.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.08.2010 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.08.2010 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.05.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.05.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.05.2010 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.05.2010 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.01.2010 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.01.2010 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.01.2010 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.12.2009 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.2009 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
12.12.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
12.12.2009 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
42 |
|
12.12.2009 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.2009 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
12.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
40 |
|
12.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
48 |
|
12.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
12.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
12.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
12.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
12.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
34 |
|
11.12.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.12.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.2009 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
11.12.2009 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
11.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
10.12.2009 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
21 |
|
12.02.2009 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.01.2009 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.2009 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
13.01.2009 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
24.09.2008 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.09.2008 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.09.2008 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.09.2008 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
06.08.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
06.08.2008 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.08.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.08.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.04.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.04.2008 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.03.2007 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.03.2007 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.03.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
30.03.2007 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.03.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.11.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.11.2006 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.2006 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.2006 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.2006 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
20.11.2006 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
20.11.2006 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.2006 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.11.2006 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2006 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2006 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.11.2006 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.11.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
13.11.2006 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.11.2006 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
23.10.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
23.10.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.10.2006 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.08.2006 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
16.08.2006 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.07.2006 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.04.2006 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.03.2006 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2006 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
14.03.2006 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.03.2006 |
Refusal of request for extension of time limit |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.03.2006 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.02.2006 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.01.2006 |
Communication concerning non paid of designation fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.10.2005 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.05.2005 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.09.2004 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.09.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
18.09.2004 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.06.2004 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.06.2004 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.06.2004 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.06.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.02.2004 |
Communication regarding the Extended European Search Report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.02.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.12.2003 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.12.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.12.2003 |
Description |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
18.12.2003 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.12.2003 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.12.2003 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.12.2003 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.12.2003 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
18.12.2003 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
18.12.2003 |
Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language |
Search / examination |
18 |