EP1547756 - Method of manufacturing aircraft components [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.09.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.10.2006 [2006/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Airbus UK Limited New Filton House, Filton Bristol, BS99 7AR / GB | [2005/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cooper, Paul Anthony 37 Henleaze Park Drive Henleaze, Bristol, BS9 4LL / GB | [2005/26] | Representative(s) | Pearson, James Ginn, et al Abel & Imray 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/26] | Pearson, James Ginn, et al Abel & Imray, 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 03258156.3 | 24.12.2003 | [2005/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1547756 | Date: | 29.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B29C70/46, B29C70/34, B29D31/00, B29C70/20, B29C70/22 | [2005/26] | CPC: |
B29C70/342 (EP);
B29C70/205 (EP);
B29C70/222 (EP);
B29K2063/00 (EP);
B29K2105/0845 (EP);
B29K2105/108 (EP);
B29K2277/10 (EP);
B29K2307/00 (EP);
B29K2309/08 (EP);
B29L2031/3076 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2006/12] |
Former [2005/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Flugzeugsteilen | [2005/26] | English: | Method of manufacturing aircraft components | [2005/26] | French: | Méthode de fabrication de pièces d'avion | [2005/26] | Examination procedure | 30.12.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/40] | 08.05.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2006/40] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 17.02.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2006 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2006 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2006 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 17.02.2006 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2005 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1216816 (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [X] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [X]EP1281504 (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [X] 1-10 * paragraphs [0144] - [0171]; figures 12,13; claims 10,12 *; | [X]DE10156123 (EADS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,4-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US2003104156 (OSADA TAMOTSU [JP], et al) [A] 1-10* the whole document * |