blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1371446

EP1371446 - Use helium/nitrogen gas mixtures in laser welding of abutted flanks [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  18.10.2013
Database last updated on 24.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip17.01.2014Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CH, LI
published on 19.02.2014  [2014/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
L'AIR LIQUIDE, Société Anonyme pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude
75, Quai d'Orsay
75007 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2007/26]For all designated states
L'AIR LIQUIDE, Société Anonyme pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude
75, quai d'Orsay
75007 Paris / FR
Former [2007/17]For all designated states
L'AIR LIQUIDE, Société Anonyme pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude
75, Quai d'Orsay
75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
Former [2003/51]For all designated states
L'Air Liquide S. A. à Directoire et Conseil de Surveillance pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude
75, Quai d'Orsay
75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Briand, Francis
62 rue St. Lazare
75009 Paris / FR
02 / Chouf, Karim
5 rue Lucien Guillou
93380 Epinay S/seine / FR
03 / Lefebvre, Philippe
7 rue Waldeck Rousseau
95310 Saitouen l'Aumone / FR
04 / Verna, Eric
34 rue Pasteur
95650 Boissy l'Aillerie / FR
 [2003/51]
Representative(s)Pittis, Olivier
L'Air Liquide S.A.
75, quai d'Orsay
75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2003/51]Pittis, Olivier
L'Air Liquide S.A. 75, quai d'Orsay
75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
Application number, filing date03291249.526.05.2003
[2003/51]
Priority number, dateFR2002000734314.06.2002         Original published format: FR 0207343
[2003/51]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1371446
Date:17.12.2003
Language:FR
[2003/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1371446
Date:12.03.2008
Language:FR
[2008/11]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.09.2003
ClassificationIPC:B23K26/12, B23K35/38, B23K26/32
[2003/51]
CPC:
B23K26/123 (EP,US); B23K26/125 (EP,US); B23K26/32 (EP,US);
B23K35/383 (EP,US); B23K2101/35 (EP,US); B23K2103/04 (EP,US);
B23K2103/50 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2003/51]
TitleGerman:Gebrauch von Helium/Stickstoff-Gasgemischen beim Schweissen von gestumpften Flanken[2003/51]
English:Use helium/nitrogen gas mixtures in laser welding of abutted flanks[2003/51]
French:Utilisation de mélanges gazeux hélium/azote en soudage laser de flancs raboutés[2003/51]
Examination procedure17.06.2004Examination requested  [2004/34]
28.09.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.01.2008Fee for grant paid
10.01.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  11.12.2008    ADMISSIBLE
Linde AG
Klosterhofstr. 1
80331 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2009/04]
Opponent(s)01  11.12.2008    ADMISSIBLE
Linde Aktiengesellschaft
Klosterhofstr. 1
80331 München / DE
09.02.2009Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
26.02.2009Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
04.03.2010Date of oral proceedings
01.04.2010Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
01.04.2010Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
07.02.2013Legal effect of revocation of patent [2013/47]
Appeal following opposition07.05.2010Appeal received No.  T1125/10
04.06.2010Statement of grounds filed
07.02.2013Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected
07.02.2013Date of oral proceedings
19.02.2013Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
13.04.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
16.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH12.03.2008
CY12.03.2008
DK12.03.2008
EE12.03.2008
FI12.03.2008
IE12.03.2008
LI12.03.2008
SI12.03.2008
TR12.03.2008
MC31.05.2008
BG12.06.2008
GR13.06.2008
HU13.09.2008
[2014/08]
Former [2010/48]CY12.03.2008
DK12.03.2008
EE12.03.2008
FI12.03.2008
IE12.03.2008
SI12.03.2008
TR12.03.2008
MC31.05.2008
BG12.06.2008
GR13.06.2008
HU13.09.2008
Former [2010/37]CY12.03.2008
DK12.03.2008
EE12.03.2008
FI12.03.2008
IE12.03.2008
SI12.03.2008
TR12.03.2008
MC31.05.2008
BG12.06.2008
HU13.09.2008
Former [2010/34]CY12.03.2008
DK12.03.2008
EE12.03.2008
FI12.03.2008
IE12.03.2008
SI12.03.2008
MC31.05.2008
BG12.06.2008
HU13.09.2008
Former [2009/43]CY12.03.2008
DK12.03.2008
EE12.03.2008
FI12.03.2008
IE12.03.2008
SI12.03.2008
MC31.05.2008
BG12.06.2008
Former [2009/23]DK12.03.2008
EE12.03.2008
FI12.03.2008
IE12.03.2008
SI12.03.2008
MC31.05.2008
BG12.06.2008
Former [2009/22]DK12.03.2008
EE12.03.2008
FI12.03.2008
IE12.03.2008
SI12.03.2008
MC31.05.2008
Former [2009/08]DK12.03.2008
FI12.03.2008
IE12.03.2008
SI12.03.2008
MC31.05.2008
Former [2009/04]FI12.03.2008
SI12.03.2008
MC31.05.2008
Former [2008/44]FI12.03.2008
SI12.03.2008
Former [2008/39]FI12.03.2008
Documents cited:Search[A]DE3726072  (THYSSEN EDELSTAHLWERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1* claims 1,6,8 *;
 [A]US6281472  (FAERBER MARK [DE]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO0243918  (LINDE AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-7,10 * the whole document *
by applicantDE2713904
 JPS56122690
 JPS61232087
 JPS62104693
 DE3619513
 WO8801553
 JPS645692
 JPS645693
 JPS645694
 JPS6448692
 US4871897
 JPH0220681
 JPH0220682
 JPH0220683
 JPH0230389
 DE3934920
 DE4034745
 DE4123716
 WO9734730
 WO9814302
 WO9932671
 DE19936151
 WO0243918
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.