|
14.02.2019 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.02.2019 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.02.2019 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.2019 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.01.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.01.2019 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.01.2019 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
29.01.2019 |
German translation of the claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
29.01.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.11.2018 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.11.2018 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
4 |
|
13.11.2018 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
4 |
|
13.11.2018 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
06.11.2018 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.08.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.08.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.08.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.08.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.07.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.07.2018 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.07.2018 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
24.07.2018 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.07.2018 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.07.2018 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.07.2018 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.03.2018 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.2018 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.03.2018 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.03.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.02.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.02.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.02.2018 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.01.2018 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.01.2018 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.01.2018 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.09.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.09.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.09.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.09.2017 |
Amended description with annotations |
Opposition |
5 |
|
18.09.2017 |
Description |
Opposition |
5 |
|
18.09.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.09.2017 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.05.2017 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.05.2017 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.05.2017 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.05.2017 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.01.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.01.2017 |
Amended description with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.01.2017 |
Description |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.01.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.01.2017 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.09.2016 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.09.2016 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.09.2016 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.02.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.01.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.01.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.01.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.01.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.01.2016 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
36 |
|
18.01.2016 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.01.2016 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.01.2016 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.06.2015 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
3 |
|
03.06.2015 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
27.04.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
27.04.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
27.04.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
27.04.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
27.04.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
27.04.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
27.04.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
27.04.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
27.04.2015 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
27.04.2015 |
Non-scannable object |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.04.2015 |
Non-scannable object |
Appeal |
4 |
|
21.04.2015 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
3 |
|
21.04.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.04.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.04.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
15.04.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
15.04.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
15.04.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
15.04.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
15.04.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
15.04.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
15.04.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
15.04.2015 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
15.04.2015 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.04.2015 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.04.2015 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.03.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.03.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.03.2015 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.03.2015 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
4 |
|
16.02.2015 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
30 |
|
13.02.2015 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
3 |
|
10.02.2015 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.10.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.10.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.10.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.10.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.10.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.10.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.10.2014 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.10.2014 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.10.2014 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.09.2014 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.08.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.08.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.08.2014 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Appeal |
3 |
|
19.08.2014 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.08.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.08.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.08.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.08.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.08.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.08.2014 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.08.2012 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.08.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.08.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.07.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.07.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
27.07.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
27.07.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
27.07.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
27.07.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
27.07.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
27.07.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
27.07.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
27.07.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.07.2012 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
7 |
|
26.07.2012 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.04.2012 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.04.2012 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.04.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.04.2012 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
4 |
|
30.03.2012 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
8 |
|
15.02.2012 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
10.02.2012 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
10.02.2012 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.02.2012 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.02.2012 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.02.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
3 |
|
08.02.2012 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.02.2012 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.02.2012 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.12.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.12.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.12.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.12.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.12.2011 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
12 |
|
15.12.2011 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
14 |
|
15.12.2011 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
15.12.2011 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.12.2011 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
15.12.2011 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
15.12.2011 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.12.2011 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.12.2011 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.12.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.12.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.12.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.12.2011 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.11.2011 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.10.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.10.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.10.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
5 |
|
17.10.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.10.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
5 |
|
17.10.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.10.2011 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.10.2011 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.10.2011 |
Claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
17.10.2011 |
Claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
17.10.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.10.2011 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.09.2011 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.09.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.09.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.09.2011 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.09.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
3 |
|
08.09.2011 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.09.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.09.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.09.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
5 |
|
06.09.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
5 |
|
06.09.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
6 |
|
06.09.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
5 |
|
06.09.2011 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.09.2011 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
06.09.2011 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
06.09.2011 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
06.09.2011 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
06.09.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.09.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.09.2011 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.09.2011 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
07.01.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.01.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.12.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.12.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.12.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.12.2010 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.12.2010 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.12.2010 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.12.2010 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.11.2010 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.06.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.05.2010 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.05.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.05.2010 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.01.2010 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.2010 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.01.2010 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.01.2010 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.07.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.07.2009 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Opposition |
49 |
|
16.07.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.07.2009 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
08.07.2009 |
Claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
08.07.2009 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
08.07.2009 |
Claims |
Opposition |
6 |
|
08.07.2009 |
Claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
08.07.2009 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
08.07.2009 |
Claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
08.07.2009 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
08.07.2009 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
06.07.2009 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
48 |
|
12.05.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.05.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.05.2009 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.05.2009 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.05.2009 |
Request for change of representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.04.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.04.2009 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.03.2009 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.03.2009 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.03.2009 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.01.2009 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.2009 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.01.2009 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
24.01.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
39 |
|
22.01.2009 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
22.01.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.01.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
22.01.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
22.01.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
22.01.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
22.01.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
22.01.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
21.01.2009 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
21.01.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
63 |
|
20.01.2009 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
20.01.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
3 |
|
20.01.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Opposition |
24 |
|
20.01.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
20.01.2009 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
20.01.2009 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
20.01.2009 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.2009 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
20.01.2009 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
20.01.2009 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.03.2008 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.03.2008 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2008 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2008 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.03.2008 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.03.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.11.2007 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.11.2007 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.11.2007 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.11.2007 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
10.08.2007 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.08.2007 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
13.11.2006 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.09.2006 |
Request for change of address |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
23.02.2005 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.2005 |
Request for change of name |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.02.2005 |
Request for change of name |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.11.2004 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.05.2004 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.2004 |
Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.03.2004 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.02.2004 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.02.2004 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.02.2004 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.07.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.05.2003 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.05.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.05.2003 |
Description |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
28.05.2003 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.05.2003 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.05.2003 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
28.05.2003 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |