EP1508490 - Friction wedge assembly for a railway truck, with a replaceable backing plate supporting the liner [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2007 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Westinghouse Air Brake Technologies Corporation 1001 Air Brake Avenue Wilmerding Pennsylvania 15148 / US | [2006/21] |
Former [2005/08] | For all designated states Westhinghouse Air Brake Technologies Corporation 1001 Air Brake Avenue Wilmerding Pennsylvania 15148 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McCabe, Thomas W. 470 Country Club Drive, Southern Pines 28387 North Carolina / US | 02 /
Formolo, Joseph F. 911 West Scotsdale Road, Laurinburg 28353 North Carolina / US | 03 /
Shute, Bruce W. 506 Seven Lakes North, West End 27376 North Carolina / US | [2005/08] | Representative(s) | Kreutzer, Ulrich, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie Lessingstrasse 6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Kreutzer, Ulrich, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie Bavariaring 26 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/21] | Kreutzer, Ulrich, Dipl.-Phys., et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie, Bavariaring 26 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/08] | Intès, Didier Gérard André, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie, 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 03292046.4 | 19.08.2003 | [2005/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1508490 | Date: | 23.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1508490 | Date: | 24.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B61F5/12 | [2005/08] | CPC: |
B61F5/122 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/45] |
Former [2005/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Reibungskeil eines Eisenbahndrehgestells, mit einer austauschbaren Belagträgerplatte | [2005/08] | English: | Friction wedge assembly for a railway truck, with a replaceable backing plate supporting the liner | [2005/08] | French: | Coin de friction pour bogie ferroviaire, comprenant une plaque de support de revètement interchangeable | [2005/08] | Examination procedure | 09.06.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.06.2004 | Examination requested [2005/08] | 03.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.08.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 18.11.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.12.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 27.03.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.02.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 27.09.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2597909 (TACK CARL E) [A] 1,2,10-16 * column 4, line 25 - column 5, line 43; figures 9-19 *; | [A]US2827987 (WILLIAMS RAY C) [A] 1,2,10* the whole document *; | [X]EP1090826 (NACO INC [US]) [X] 1-17 * column 1, line 46 - column 2, line 28 * * column 9, line 21 - column 12, line 6; figures 11,13-16 * |