EP1440897 - Fabrication process for crimpable metallic crossbar terminals for flexible handles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.2005 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 16.05.2007 [2007/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ruggero, Peroni Via Corsica, 31 21100 Varese / IT | [2004/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2004/31] | Representative(s) | Pellegri, Alberto Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A. Via Carducci, 8 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2004/31] | Pellegri, Alberto c/o Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A. Piazza Repubblica, 5 21100 Varese / IT | Application number, filing date | 03425030.8 | 23.01.2003 | [2004/31] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1440897 | Date: | 28.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1440897 | Date: | 04.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B65D33/12, B21D53/58 | [2004/31] | CPC: |
B21D53/58 (EP);
B65D33/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/31] | Title | German: | Herstellungsverfahren von Crimpbaren metallischen Querstänge für Trageschnüre | [2004/31] | English: | Fabrication process for crimpable metallic crossbar terminals for flexible handles | [2004/31] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de barettes métalliques sertissables pour poignées flexibles | [2004/31] | Examination procedure | 11.10.2003 | Examination requested [2004/31] | 13.10.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.05.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 10.05.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/30] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.08.2004 | BE | 04.08.2004 | BG | 04.08.2004 | CH | 04.08.2004 | CZ | 04.08.2004 | EE | 04.08.2004 | FI | 04.08.2004 | LI | 04.08.2004 | NL | 04.08.2004 | SI | 04.08.2004 | SK | 04.08.2004 | DK | 04.11.2004 | GR | 04.11.2004 | SE | 04.11.2004 | HU | 05.11.2004 | CY | 23.01.2005 | LU | 23.01.2005 | IE | 24.01.2005 | MC | 31.01.2005 | [2007/20] |
Former [2007/13] | AT | 04.08.2004 | |
BE | 04.08.2004 | ||
BG | 04.08.2004 | ||
CH | 04.08.2004 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2004 | ||
EE | 04.08.2004 | ||
FI | 04.08.2004 | ||
LI | 04.08.2004 | ||
NL | 04.08.2004 | ||
SI | 04.08.2004 | ||
SK | 04.08.2004 | ||
DK | 04.11.2004 | ||
GR | 04.11.2004 | ||
SE | 04.11.2004 | ||
HU | 05.11.2004 | ||
LU | 23.01.2005 | ||
IE | 24.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2006/35] | AT | 04.08.2004 | |
BE | 04.08.2004 | ||
BG | 04.08.2004 | ||
CH | 04.08.2004 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2004 | ||
FI | 04.08.2004 | ||
LI | 04.08.2004 | ||
NL | 04.08.2004 | ||
SI | 04.08.2004 | ||
SK | 04.08.2004 | ||
DK | 04.11.2004 | ||
GR | 04.11.2004 | ||
SE | 04.11.2004 | ||
HU | 05.11.2004 | ||
IE | 24.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2006/23] | AT | 04.08.2004 | |
BE | 04.08.2004 | ||
BG | 04.08.2004 | ||
CH | 04.08.2004 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2004 | ||
FI | 04.08.2004 | ||
LI | 04.08.2004 | ||
NL | 04.08.2004 | ||
SI | 04.08.2004 | ||
SK | 04.08.2004 | ||
DK | 04.11.2004 | ||
GR | 04.11.2004 | ||
SE | 04.11.2004 | ||
IE | 24.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 04.08.2004 | |
BE | 04.08.2004 | ||
BG | 04.08.2004 | ||
CH | 04.08.2004 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2004 | ||
FI | 04.08.2004 | ||
LI | 04.08.2004 | ||
SI | 04.08.2004 | ||
SK | 04.08.2004 | ||
DK | 04.11.2004 | ||
GR | 04.11.2004 | ||
SE | 04.11.2004 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/50] | AT | 04.08.2004 | |
BE | 04.08.2004 | ||
BG | 04.08.2004 | ||
CH | 04.08.2004 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2004 | ||
FI | 04.08.2004 | ||
LI | 04.08.2004 | ||
SI | 04.08.2004 | ||
SK | 04.08.2004 | ||
DK | 04.11.2004 | ||
GR | 04.11.2004 | ||
SE | 04.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/30] | AT | 04.08.2004 | |
BE | 04.08.2004 | ||
BG | 04.08.2004 | ||
CH | 04.08.2004 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2004 | ||
FI | 04.08.2004 | ||
LI | 04.08.2004 | ||
SK | 04.08.2004 | ||
DK | 04.11.2004 | ||
GR | 04.11.2004 | ||
SE | 04.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/28] | AT | 04.08.2004 | |
BE | 04.08.2004 | ||
CH | 04.08.2004 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2004 | ||
FI | 04.08.2004 | ||
LI | 04.08.2004 | ||
SK | 04.08.2004 | ||
DK | 04.11.2004 | ||
GR | 04.11.2004 | ||
SE | 04.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | AT | 04.08.2004 | |
CH | 04.08.2004 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2004 | ||
FI | 04.08.2004 | ||
LI | 04.08.2004 | ||
SK | 04.08.2004 | ||
DK | 04.11.2004 | ||
GR | 04.11.2004 | ||
SE | 04.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | AT | 04.08.2004 | |
CH | 04.08.2004 | ||
FI | 04.08.2004 | ||
LI | 04.08.2004 | ||
DK | 04.11.2004 | ||
GR | 04.11.2004 | ||
SE | 04.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/21] | AT | 04.08.2004 | |
CH | 04.08.2004 | ||
FI | 04.08.2004 | ||
LI | 04.08.2004 | ||
GR | 04.11.2004 | ||
SE | 04.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 04.08.2004 | |
FI | 04.08.2004 | ||
GR | 04.11.2004 | ||
SE | 04.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/13] | AT | 04.08.2004 | |
FI | 04.08.2004 | ||
SE | 04.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 04.08.2004 | |
SE | 04.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/10] | SE | 04.11.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB805378 (AMP INC) [Y] 2,3 * page 2, line 69 - line 73; figure 2 ** page 3, line 62 - line 69; figure 8 *; | [XY]EP1166672 (SPAZIANI CARLO [IT]) [X] 1 * figure -; claims 1,2 * [Y] 2,3 |