EP1488994 - Hull for small jet propelled boat [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.02.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pantaleo, Vincenzo Via Alta no. 15, Borgo Sabotino 04100 Latina / IT | [2004/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pantaleo, Vincenzo Via Alta No. 15 04100 Borgo Sabotino, Latina / IT | 02 /
Salvatore, Cinque Via Arienzo No. 54 84017 Positano (Salerno) / IT | [2004/52] | Application number, filing date | 03425399.7 | 19.06.2003 | [2004/52] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1488994 | Date: | 22.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B63B1/04 | [2004/52] | CPC: |
B63C9/02 (EP);
B63B34/10 (EP,US);
B63B1/042 (EP);
B63B1/125 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2005/37] |
Former [2004/52] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Rumpf für ein kleines, von Strahlwassser angetriebenes Boot | [2004/52] | English: | Hull for small jet propelled boat | [2004/52] | French: | Coque pour un petit bateau à propulsion par jet | [2004/52] | Examination procedure | 23.06.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/14] | 24.10.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2006/14] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 04.08.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.08.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.08.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 04.08.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 04.08.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 04.08.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 04.08.2005 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.08.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 04.08.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.08.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 04.08.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 04.08.2005 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.08.2005 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 04.08.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.08.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 04.08.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.08.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.08.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 04.08.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 04.08.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 04.08.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.08.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 04.08.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.08.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 04.08.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 04.08.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 04.08.2005 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2005 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3996869 (HADLEY ROBERT O) [X] 1,8-14 * figures 1-8 *; | [X]US4091761 (FEHN ALLAN J) [X] 1,8-14* figures 1-8 *; | [X]FR2549005 (SERY HENRI [FR]) [X] 1-4,8-14 * page 6, line 1 - line 2 *; | [X]US4907520 (PIPKORN HOWARD W [US]) [X] 1-14 * figures 1-10 *; | [X]DE9000582U (LÜBECKER BOOTSWERFT FRITZ STAACK & CO) [X] 1,8-14 * figures 1-5 *; | [X]US4932347 (MARDIKIAN ALBERT A [US]) [X] 1,8-14 * figures 1-9 *; | [XY]US5458078 (PERETTE ROBERT J [US]) [X] 1,8-14 * figures 1-8 * [Y] 2-4; | [X]US5526762 (KILEY JOHN C [US]) [X] 1,8-14 * figures 1-7 *; | [X]WO9836961 (JOHN YOUNG DEVELOPMENTS PTY LT [AU], et al) [X] 1,8-14 * figures 1-14 *; | [X]US6067923 (RATLIEFF JR WILLIAM D [US]) [X] 1,8-14 * figures 1,2,5 *; | [XY]US6343964 (MARDIKIAN ALBERT [US]) [X] 1 * figures 1,2,4 * [Y] 2-4 |