|
29.06.2018 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.06.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.06.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.06.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.06.2018 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.06.2018 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.05.2018 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.05.2018 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
24 |
|
28.05.2018 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
3 |
|
08.02.2018 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
3 |
|
08.02.2018 |
F3317 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Proprietor + Opponent) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
31.01.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.01.2018 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.01.2018 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.01.2018 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.01.2018 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.01.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.01.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.01.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
22.01.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.01.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.01.2018 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.11.2017 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.11.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.11.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.11.2017 |
Authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.11.2017 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.10.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.10.2017 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.10.2017 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.10.2017 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
6 |
|
24.10.2017 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
8 |
|
19.10.2017 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.10.2017 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.12.2016 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.03.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.03.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.03.2016 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
16.03.2016 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.01.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.01.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.01.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.01.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.01.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.01.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.01.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.01.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.01.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.01.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.01.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.01.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.01.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.01.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.01.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.01.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.01.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.01.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.01.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.01.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.01.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.01.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.01.2016 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
24 |
|
13.01.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.01.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.01.2016 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
4 |
|
14.09.2015 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.09.2015 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.09.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.09.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.09.2015 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.09.2015 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
7 |
|
04.09.2015 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
6 |
|
20.07.2015 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
20.07.2015 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
07.07.2015 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.07.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.07.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.07.2015 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.07.2015 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.07.2015 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.06.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.05.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.05.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.05.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.05.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.05.2015 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
06.05.2015 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.05.2015 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.05.2015 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
15 |
|
06.05.2015 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.05.2015 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.05.2015 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.05.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.05.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.05.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.05.2015 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.05.2015 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
11.03.2015 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
05.03.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.02.2015 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.2015 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.02.2015 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.02.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.02.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.02.2015 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
19 |
|
11.02.2015 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
11.02.2015 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
11.02.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.02.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.02.2015 |
Main request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.02.2015 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
11.02.2015 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
11.02.2015 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
885 |
|
11.02.2015 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.02.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
23 |
|
11.02.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
11.02.2015 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
22 |
|
11.02.2015 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.02.2015 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Opposition |
20 |
|
09.02.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.02.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.02.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.02.2015 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.02.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.02.2015 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.01.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.01.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.01.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.01.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
12.01.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
07.01.2015 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.01.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.01.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.01.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
06.01.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
06.01.2015 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
21.08.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.08.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.08.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.08.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.08.2014 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
04.08.2014 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.08.2014 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.08.2014 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.08.2014 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.08.2014 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.11.2013 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.11.2013 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.11.2013 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.11.2013 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.10.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.10.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.10.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.10.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
16.10.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.10.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.10.2012 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.10.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.10.2012 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
29 |
|
04.10.2012 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.06.2012 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.06.2012 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.06.2012 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.06.2012 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.05.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.05.2012 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.05.2012 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.05.2012 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.05.2012 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.05.2012 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
17.05.2012 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
17.05.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
25 |
|
17.05.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
17.05.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
17.05.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.05.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
17.05.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
17.05.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
17.05.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
17.05.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
114 |
|
17.05.2012 |
Translation of the evidence during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
17.05.2012 |
Translation of the evidence during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
16.05.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.05.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
24 |
|
16.05.2012 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
16.05.2012 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
16.05.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
35 |
|
16.05.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
16.05.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
16.05.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
16.05.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
16.05.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
41 |
|
21.07.2011 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.06.2011 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.06.2011 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.06.2011 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.04.2011 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.04.2011 |
Communication about the grant of a European patent according to Board of Appeal decision |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.04.2011 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
14.04.2011 |
Processing of grant of a patent after appeal (internal) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.02.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.02.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.02.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.02.2011 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
12 |
|
02.02.2011 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
18.01.2011 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.01.2011 |
Notification of termination of representative's authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.12.2010 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.12.2010 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
10 |
|
28.10.2010 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
27.08.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.08.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.08.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.08.2010 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.04.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.04.2010 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.05.2009 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.07.2008 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.06.2008 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.05.2008 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.04.2008 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
28.04.2008 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.04.2008 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.04.2008 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.04.2008 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.04.2008 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
51 |
|
01.04.2008 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
51 |
|
03.12.2007 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.11.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.11.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.11.2007 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
23.11.2007 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.11.2007 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.11.2007 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.11.2007 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.2007 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.2007 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.2007 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.2007 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.2007 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.08.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.08.2007 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.08.2007 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.07.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.07.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.07.2007 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.2007 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.06.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.06.2007 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.02.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.02.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
12.02.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
15.12.2006 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.12.2006 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.08.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.08.2006 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.11.2004 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.11.2004 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.10.2004 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.10.2004 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.10.2004 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.10.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.2004 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.06.2004 |
General authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.06.2004 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
19.05.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
07.05.2004 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
12.03.2004 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
12.03.2004 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
12.03.2004 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
12.03.2004 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
12.03.2004 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
12.03.2004 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
12.03.2004 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
12.03.2004 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
29.12.2003 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
19.12.2003 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.11.2003 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
05.11.2003 |
Written opinion - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
05.11.2003 |
Written opinion - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
14.10.2003 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.09.2003 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
24.09.2003 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
10.09.2003 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
10.09.2003 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
10.09.2003 |
Submission concerning representation |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
28.08.2003 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
28.08.2003 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
17.03.2003 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
17.03.2003 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
17.03.2003 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
5 |