EP1474221 - PRE-METERED, UNSUPPORTED MULTILAYER MICROPOROUS MEMBRANE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.11.2007 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O.Box 33427 St. Paul MN 55133-3427 / US | ||
Former [2006/34] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company P.O.Box 33427 St. Paul Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | ||
Former [2004/46] | For all designated states Cuno Incorporated 400 Research Parkway Meriden, CT 06450-1018 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SALE, Richard 35 Marabella Lane Tolland, CT 06084 / US | 02 /
OSTREICHER, Eugene 9 Reservation Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [2004/46] | Representative(s) | Charig, Raymond Julian, et al Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/46] | Charig, Raymond Julian, et al Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 03707331.9 | 09.01.2003 | [2004/46] | WO2003US00549 | Priority number, date | US20020072202 | 07.02.2002 Original published format: US 72202 | [2004/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03066202 | Date: | 14.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1474221 | Date: | 10.11.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.08.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B01D67/00, B01D69/12, B01D69/02 | [2004/46] | CPC: |
B01D67/0018 (EP,US);
B01D69/02 (EP,US);
B01D69/06 (EP,US);
B01D69/1213 (EP,US);
B01D71/34 (EP,US);
B01D71/56 (EP,US);
B01D71/68 (EP,US);
B29C41/32 (EP,US);
B32B5/32 (EP,US);
B01D2323/18 (EP,US);
B01D2325/0231 (EP,US);
B05B9/06 (EP,US);
B05C5/0254 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249978 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24998 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249981 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/46] | Title | German: | VORGEMESSENE, UNGESTÜTZTE UND MEHRSCHICHTIGE MIKROPORÖSE MEMBRAN | [2004/46] | English: | PRE-METERED, UNSUPPORTED MULTILAYER MICROPOROUS MEMBRANE | [2004/46] | French: | MEMBRANE MICROPOREUSE MULTICOUCHE NON RENFORCEE PRE-MESUREE | [2004/46] | Entry into regional phase | 02.09.2004 | National basic fee paid | 02.09.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.09.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.08.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/46] | 20.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 03.07.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/01] | 06.08.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4489671 (CHOINSKI EDWARD J [US]); | [Y]US5620790 (HOLZKI UDO [DE], et al); | [L]WO0211868 (CUNO INC [US]) |