|
24.10.2014 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.10.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.10.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.09.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.09.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.09.2014 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.09.2014 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.09.2014 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
15 |
|
15.07.2014 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
5 |
|
23.06.2014 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.06.2014 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.06.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.06.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.06.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.06.2014 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
06.06.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.06.2014 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.06.2014 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.05.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.05.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.05.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.05.2014 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.04.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.04.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.04.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.04.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.04.2014 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
9 |
|
31.03.2014 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.02.2014 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.02.2014 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.04.2013 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.05.2012 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.09.2010 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.08.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.08.2010 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
18 |
|
16.08.2010 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
18 |
|
25.06.2010 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.06.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.06.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.06.2010 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
154 |
|
23.04.2010 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.04.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.04.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.04.2010 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.04.2010 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.03.2010 |
Refund of fees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.03.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.02.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.02.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.02.2010 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.02.2010 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.2010 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.02.2010 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
08.02.2010 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.2010 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.2010 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.2010 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.2010 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.2010 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.2010 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.01.2010 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.01.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.12.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.12.2009 |
Annex |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.12.2009 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.12.2009 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.2009 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.12.2009 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.12.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.12.2009 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
12 |
|
19.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
19.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
19.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
19.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
60 |
|
19.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
19.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
19.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
16.12.2009 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
12 |
|
16.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
25.11.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.2009 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.11.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.11.2009 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.11.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.11.2009 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.11.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.10.2009 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.09.2009 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.08.2009 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.08.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.07.2009 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.07.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.07.2009 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.07.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.07.2009 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.07.2009 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.07.2009 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.07.2009 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.07.2009 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.07.2009 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.06.2009 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.06.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.05.2009 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.05.2009 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
3 |
|
20.05.2009 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
19.05.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.05.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
3 |
|
19.05.2009 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
22.04.2009 |
Refund of fees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.04.2009 |
Refund of fees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.03.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.03.2009 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.03.2009 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
3 |
|
11.11.2008 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.11.2008 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.10.2008 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
21 |
|
07.10.2008 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
20 |
|
07.10.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
07.10.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
07.10.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
07.10.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
07.10.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
28 |
|
07.10.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
07.10.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
54 |
|
07.10.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
42 |
|
07.10.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
02.10.2008 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.10.2008 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
20 |
|
02.10.2008 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
02.10.2008 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.12.2007 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.11.2007 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.2007 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
15.11.2007 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
15.11.2007 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.11.2007 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.07.2007 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.07.2007 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.07.2007 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.07.2007 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
83 |
|
11.06.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
11.06.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.06.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.06.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.06.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.06.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.06.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.06.2007 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.06.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.03.2007 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.03.2007 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.11.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.11.2006 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.11.2006 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.11.2006 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.11.2006 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
07.11.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.11.2006 |
Description |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.11.2006 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.11.2006 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.11.2006 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.11.2006 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.10.2006 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.08.2006 |
Communication concerning signing of documents |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.08.2006 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.04.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.04.2006 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.04.2006 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.04.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.04.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.04.2006 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.04.2006 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
10.04.2006 |
Invitation to confirm documents filed by fax |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.04.2006 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
31.01.2006 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.01.2006 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.09.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.09.2005 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.09.2004 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.09.2004 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.09.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.09.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.09.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.09.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.07.2004 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
25.06.2004 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.05.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
90 |
|
18.05.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
141 |
|
06.05.2004 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
06.05.2004 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
06.05.2004 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
06.05.2004 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
06.05.2004 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
06.05.2004 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
06.05.2004 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
06.05.2004 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
04.05.2004 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
09.01.2004 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
18.11.2003 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
18.11.2003 |
Written opinion - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
18.11.2003 |
Written opinion - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
15.10.2003 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
30.09.2003 |
Written opinion - Automated |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
19.09.2003 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
19.09.2003 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
08.09.2003 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
21.08.2003 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.08.2003 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
86 |
|
26.03.2003 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
26.03.2003 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
5 |
|
26.03.2003 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
32 |
|
26.03.2003 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
47 |
|
26.03.2003 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
1 |