EP1476120 - TREATMENT METHODS USING ANTI-CD22 ANTIBODIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.08.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Duke University M454 Davison Building, DUMC Box 3664 Durham, NC 27710 / US | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2010/39] | For all designated states Duke University M454 Davison Building, DUMC Box 3664 Durham, NC 27710 / US | ||
For all designated states The Regents of The University of California 5th floor, 1111 Franklin Street Oakland, CA 94607-5200 / US | |||
Former [2004/47] | For all designated states Duke University M454 Davison Building, DUMC Box 3664 Durham, NC 27710 / US | ||
For all designated states The Regents of The University of California 5th floor, 1111 Franklin Street Oakland, CA 94607-5200 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TEDDER, Thomas 3000 Wild Meadow Drive Durham, NC 27705 / US | 02 /
TUSCANO, Joseph 150 Torndike Way Folsom, CA 95630 / US | [2004/47] | Representative(s) | Grund, Martin, et al Grund Intellectual Property Group Patentanwälte und Solicitor PartG mbB Steinsdorfstraße 2 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/08] | Grund, Martin, et al GRUND Intellectual Property Group Postfach 44 05 16 80754 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/47] | Grund, Martin, Dr., et al Dr. Volker Vossius, Patentanwaltskanzlei, Geibelstrasse 6 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03711190.3 | 21.02.2003 | [2004/47] | WO2003US05323 | Priority number, date | US20020359419P | 21.02.2002 Original published format: US 359419 P | US20020420472P | 21.10.2002 Original published format: US 420472 P | [2004/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03072036 | Date: | 04.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/36] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1476120 | Date: | 17.11.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.09.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1476120 | Date: | 29.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 31.12.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/00, A61K39/395, A61K35/00, C07K16/46, C12N15/13, A61P35/00, // C07K16/28 | [2005/52] | CPC: |
C07K16/2803 (EP,US);
A61K39/395 (KR);
A61K39/39533 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P13/02 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/04 (EP);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P21/04 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P5/00 (EP);
A61P5/14 (EP);
A61P5/16 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP);
A61P7/04 (EP);
A61P7/06 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/08 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C07K16/28 (KR);
C12N15/11 (KR);
A61K2039/505 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K39/39533, A61K2300/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/49] | A61K39/395 | ||
Former IPC [2004/47] | A61K6/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/47] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEHANDLUNGSVERFAHREN UNTER VERWENDUNG VON ANTI-CD22-ANTIKÖRPERN | [2004/47] | English: | TREATMENT METHODS USING ANTI-CD22 ANTIBODIES | [2004/47] | French: | METHODES THERAPEUTIQUES UTILISANT DES ANTICORPS ANTI-CD22 | [2004/47] | Entry into regional phase | 04.08.2004 | National basic fee paid | 04.08.2004 | Search fee paid | 04.08.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.08.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.08.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/47] | 19.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 24.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.08.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 18.08.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2009 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   26.06.2009 | 28.02.2010 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   26.04.2010 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.09.2010 | BE | 29.09.2010 | CY | 29.09.2010 | CZ | 29.09.2010 | DK | 29.09.2010 | EE | 29.09.2010 | FI | 29.09.2010 | HU | 29.09.2010 | IT | 29.09.2010 | NL | 29.09.2010 | SE | 29.09.2010 | SI | 29.09.2010 | SK | 29.09.2010 | TR | 29.09.2010 | BG | 29.12.2010 | GR | 30.12.2010 | ES | 09.01.2011 | PT | 31.01.2011 | IE | 21.02.2011 | LU | 21.02.2011 | CH | 28.02.2011 | LI | 28.02.2011 | MC | 28.02.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
BE | 29.09.2010 | ||
CY | 29.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
DK | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
IT | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
TR | 29.09.2010 | ||
BG | 29.12.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
ES | 09.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
IE | 21.02.2011 | ||
LU | 21.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2013/42] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
BE | 29.09.2010 | ||
CY | 29.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
DK | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
IT | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
BG | 29.12.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
ES | 09.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
IE | 21.02.2011 | ||
LU | 21.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2013/26] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
BE | 29.09.2010 | ||
CY | 29.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
DK | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
IT | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
ES | 09.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
IE | 21.02.2011 | ||
LU | 21.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
BE | 29.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
DK | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
IT | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
ES | 09.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
IE | 21.02.2011 | ||
LU | 21.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
BE | 29.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
DK | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
IT | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
ES | 09.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
IE | 21.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
BE | 29.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
DK | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
IT | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
ES | 09.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/45] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
BE | 29.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
DK | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
IT | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
ES | 09.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/40] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
BE | 29.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
DK | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
IT | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
ES | 09.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
BE | 29.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
IT | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
ES | 09.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/31] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
BE | 29.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
IT | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/24] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/23] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 29.09.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]US5484892 (TEDDER THOMAS F [US], et al) [DX] 1-43 * column 3, line 4 - line 42 * * column 5, line 61 - line 67 * * column 6, line 1 - line 7 * * column 8, line 57 - line 62 * * column 10, line 28 - line 67 * * column 11, line 1 - line 17 * * column 16, line 8 - line 11 * * column 16, line 33 - line 35 * * tables II,III,IV,V *; | [L]WO03072736 (UNIV DUKE [US], et al) [L] 1-43* the whole document *; | [X] - LEONARD J P ET AL, "EPRATUZUMAB, A NEW ANTI-CD22. HUMANIZED, MONOCLONAL ANTIBODY FOR THE THERAPY OF NON-HODGKIN'S LYMPHOMA (NHL): PHASE I/II TRIAL RESULTS", BLOOD, W.B. SAUNDERS, PHILADELPHIA, VA, US, (19991115), vol. 94, no. 10 SUPPL PART 1, ISSN 0006-4971, pages 92A - 93A, XP000929541 [X] 1-39 * the whole document * | [A] - STEIN R ET AL, "EPITOPE SPECIFICITY OF THE ANTI-(B CELL LYMPHOMA) MONOCLONAL ANTIBODY LL2", CANCER IMMUNOLOGY AND IMMUNOTHERAPY, BERLIN, DE, (1993), vol. 37, no. 5, ISSN 0340-7004, pages 293 - 298, XP002070322 [A] 1-39 * page 296, column RIGHT, line 3 - line 27 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF01518451 | International search | [Y]US5484892 (TEDDER THOMAS F [US], et al) | Examination | - CARNAHAN JOSETTE ET AL, "Epratuzumab, a humanized monoclonal antibody targeting CD22: characterization of in vitro properties.", CLINICAL CANCER RESEARCH : AN OFFICIAL JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH 1 SEP 2003, (20030901), vol. 9, no. 10 Pt 2, ISSN 1078-0432, pages 3982S - 90S | - LEONARD JOHN P ET AL, "Phase I/II trial of epratuzumab (humanized anti-CD22 antibody) in indolent non-Hodgkin's lymphoma.", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL ONCOLOGY : OFFICIAL JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY OF CLINICAL ONCOLOGY 15 AUG 2003, (20030815), vol. 21, no. 16, ISSN 0732-183X, pages 3051 - 3059 | by applicant | - "EPRATUZUMAB, A NEW ANTI-CD22, HUMANIZED, MONOCLONAL ANTIBODY FOR THE THERAPY OF NON-HODGKIN'S LYMPHOMA and PHASE I/II TRIAL RESULTS", LEONARD J P ET AL., BLOOD, W.B. SAUNDERS, (19991115), vol. 94, pages 92A - 93A |