EP1469823 - COSMETIC OR DERMATOLOGICAL USE OF VITAMIN A OR ESTERS THEREOF IN COMBINATION WITH A PARTIALLY METHYLATED BETA-CYCLODEXTRIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/44] | COSMETIC OR DERMATOLOGICAL USE OF VITAMIN A OR THE ESTERS THEREOF IN COMBINATION WITH A PARTLY METHYLATED BETA-CYCLODEXTRIN | ||
[2007/28] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.11.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 01.12.2010 [2010/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LVMH RECHERCHE 185 avenue de Verdun 45800 St. Jean de Braye / FR | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE 31-33, rue de la Fédération 75015 Paris / FR | [2004/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARCHAMBAULT, Jean-Christophe 10 Rue Pavé de Vendôme F-45130 MEUNG SUR LOIRE / FR | 02 /
OUVRARD-BARATON, Françoise 66 Rue de la Bretonnerie F-45000 ORLEANS / FR | 03 /
DJEDAINI-PILARD, Florence 50 rue Lucien Lecointe F-80000 AMIENS / FR | 04 /
WEISSE, Sandrine 39 Boulevard Magenta F-35000 RENNES / FR | [2004/44] | Representative(s) | Giraud, Françoise, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/44] | Giraud, Françoise, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 03712290.0 | 31.01.2003 | [2004/44] | WO2003FR00294 | Priority number, date | FR20020001241 | 01.02.2002 Original published format: FR 0201241 | [2004/44] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03063805 | Date: | 07.08.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/32] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1469823 | Date: | 27.10.2004 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.08.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1469823 | Date: | 16.01.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/67, A61K8/73, A61K31/07, A61Q19/08, A61Q19/00 | [2007/33] | CPC: |
A61K31/07 (EP,US);
A61K8/67 (KR);
A61K8/60 (KR);
A61K8/671 (EP,US);
A61K8/738 (EP,US);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61Q19/00 (EP,KR,US);
A61Q19/08 (EP,US);
A61K2800/56 (EP,US);
A61Q19/008 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2004/44] | A61K7/48 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/44] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOSMETISCHE ODER DERMATOLOGISCHE VERWENDUNG VON VITAMIN A ODER DEREN ESTERN IN KOMBINATION MIT EINEM TEILWEISE METHYLIERTEN BETA-CYCLODEXTRIN | [2007/28] | English: | COSMETIC OR DERMATOLOGICAL USE OF VITAMIN A OR ESTERS THEREOF IN COMBINATION WITH A PARTIALLY METHYLATED BETA-CYCLODEXTRIN | [2007/28] | French: | UTILISATION COSMETIQUE OU DERMATOLOGIQUE DE LA VITAMINE A OU DE SES ESTERS, EN ASSOCIATION AVEC UNE BETA-CYCLODEXTRINE PARTIELLEMENT METHYLEE | [2004/44] |
Former [2004/44] | KOSMETISCHE ODER DERMATOLOGISCHE VERWENDUNG VON VITAMIN A ODER ESTERN DAVON IN KOMBINATION MIT EINER TEILWEISEN METHYLIERTEN BETA-CYCLODEXTRINE | ||
Former [2004/44] | COSMETIC OR DERMATOLOGICAL USE OF VITAMIN A OR THE ESTERS THEREOF IN COMBINATION WITH A PARTLY METHYLATED BETA-CYCLODEXTRIN | Entry into regional phase | 06.08.2004 | National basic fee paid | 06.08.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.08.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.10.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.08.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/44] | 13.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.01.2008 | CY | 16.01.2008 | CZ | 16.01.2008 | DK | 16.01.2008 | EE | 16.01.2008 | FI | 16.01.2008 | GB | 16.01.2008 | IE | 16.01.2008 | IT | 16.01.2008 | NL | 16.01.2008 | SI | 16.01.2008 | SK | 16.01.2008 | TR | 16.01.2008 | BE | 31.01.2008 | CH | 31.01.2008 | FR | 31.01.2008 | LI | 31.01.2008 | LU | 31.01.2008 | MC | 31.01.2008 | BG | 16.04.2008 | SE | 16.04.2008 | DE | 17.04.2008 | GR | 17.04.2008 | ES | 27.04.2008 | PT | 16.06.2008 | HU | 17.07.2008 | [2010/48] |
Former [2010/37] | AT | 16.01.2008 | |
CY | 16.01.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2008 | ||
DK | 16.01.2008 | ||
EE | 16.01.2008 | ||
FI | 16.01.2008 | ||
GB | 16.01.2008 | ||
IE | 16.01.2008 | ||
IT | 16.01.2008 | ||
NL | 16.01.2008 | ||
SI | 16.01.2008 | ||
SK | 16.01.2008 | ||
TR | 16.01.2008 | ||
BE | 31.01.2008 | ||
CH | 31.01.2008 | ||
FR | 31.01.2008 | ||
LI | 31.01.2008 | ||
LU | 31.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
BG | 16.04.2008 | ||
SE | 16.04.2008 | ||
DE | 17.04.2008 | ||
ES | 27.04.2008 | ||
PT | 16.06.2008 | ||
HU | 17.07.2008 | ||
Former [2010/34] | AT | 16.01.2008 | |
CY | 16.01.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2008 | ||
DK | 16.01.2008 | ||
EE | 16.01.2008 | ||
FI | 16.01.2008 | ||
GB | 16.01.2008 | ||
IE | 16.01.2008 | ||
IT | 16.01.2008 | ||
NL | 16.01.2008 | ||
SI | 16.01.2008 | ||
SK | 16.01.2008 | ||
BE | 31.01.2008 | ||
CH | 31.01.2008 | ||
FR | 31.01.2008 | ||
LI | 31.01.2008 | ||
LU | 31.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
BG | 16.04.2008 | ||
SE | 16.04.2008 | ||
DE | 17.04.2008 | ||
ES | 27.04.2008 | ||
PT | 16.06.2008 | ||
HU | 17.07.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 16.01.2008 | |
CY | 16.01.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2008 | ||
DK | 16.01.2008 | ||
EE | 16.01.2008 | ||
FI | 16.01.2008 | ||
GB | 16.01.2008 | ||
IE | 16.01.2008 | ||
IT | 16.01.2008 | ||
NL | 16.01.2008 | ||
SI | 16.01.2008 | ||
SK | 16.01.2008 | ||
BE | 31.01.2008 | ||
CH | 31.01.2008 | ||
FR | 31.01.2008 | ||
LI | 31.01.2008 | ||
LU | 31.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
BG | 16.04.2008 | ||
SE | 16.04.2008 | ||
DE | 17.04.2008 | ||
ES | 27.04.2008 | ||
PT | 16.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/39] | AT | 16.01.2008 | |
CY | 16.01.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2008 | ||
DK | 16.01.2008 | ||
EE | 16.01.2008 | ||
FI | 16.01.2008 | ||
GB | 16.01.2008 | ||
IE | 16.01.2008 | ||
IT | 16.01.2008 | ||
NL | 16.01.2008 | ||
SI | 16.01.2008 | ||
SK | 16.01.2008 | ||
BE | 31.01.2008 | ||
CH | 31.01.2008 | ||
FR | 31.01.2008 | ||
LI | 31.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
BG | 16.04.2008 | ||
SE | 16.04.2008 | ||
DE | 17.04.2008 | ||
ES | 27.04.2008 | ||
PT | 16.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 16.01.2008 | |
CY | 16.01.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2008 | ||
DK | 16.01.2008 | ||
EE | 16.01.2008 | ||
FI | 16.01.2008 | ||
GB | 16.01.2008 | ||
IE | 16.01.2008 | ||
NL | 16.01.2008 | ||
SI | 16.01.2008 | ||
SK | 16.01.2008 | ||
BE | 31.01.2008 | ||
CH | 31.01.2008 | ||
FR | 31.01.2008 | ||
LI | 31.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
BG | 16.04.2008 | ||
SE | 16.04.2008 | ||
DE | 17.04.2008 | ||
ES | 27.04.2008 | ||
PT | 16.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 16.01.2008 | |
CZ | 16.01.2008 | ||
DK | 16.01.2008 | ||
EE | 16.01.2008 | ||
FI | 16.01.2008 | ||
GB | 16.01.2008 | ||
IE | 16.01.2008 | ||
NL | 16.01.2008 | ||
SI | 16.01.2008 | ||
SK | 16.01.2008 | ||
BE | 31.01.2008 | ||
CH | 31.01.2008 | ||
FR | 31.01.2008 | ||
LI | 31.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
BG | 16.04.2008 | ||
SE | 16.04.2008 | ||
DE | 17.04.2008 | ||
ES | 27.04.2008 | ||
PT | 16.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 16.01.2008 | |
CZ | 16.01.2008 | ||
DK | 16.01.2008 | ||
EE | 16.01.2008 | ||
FI | 16.01.2008 | ||
GB | 16.01.2008 | ||
IE | 16.01.2008 | ||
NL | 16.01.2008 | ||
SI | 16.01.2008 | ||
SK | 16.01.2008 | ||
BE | 31.01.2008 | ||
CH | 31.01.2008 | ||
LI | 31.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
BG | 16.04.2008 | ||
SE | 16.04.2008 | ||
DE | 17.04.2008 | ||
ES | 27.04.2008 | ||
PT | 16.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/04] | AT | 16.01.2008 | |
CZ | 16.01.2008 | ||
DK | 16.01.2008 | ||
FI | 16.01.2008 | ||
GB | 16.01.2008 | ||
IE | 16.01.2008 | ||
NL | 16.01.2008 | ||
SI | 16.01.2008 | ||
SK | 16.01.2008 | ||
CH | 31.01.2008 | ||
LI | 31.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
BG | 16.04.2008 | ||
SE | 16.04.2008 | ||
DE | 17.04.2008 | ||
ES | 27.04.2008 | ||
PT | 16.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/50] | AT | 16.01.2008 | |
CZ | 16.01.2008 | ||
DK | 16.01.2008 | ||
FI | 16.01.2008 | ||
IE | 16.01.2008 | ||
NL | 16.01.2008 | ||
SI | 16.01.2008 | ||
SK | 16.01.2008 | ||
CH | 31.01.2008 | ||
LI | 31.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
BG | 16.04.2008 | ||
SE | 16.04.2008 | ||
DE | 17.04.2008 | ||
ES | 27.04.2008 | ||
PT | 16.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | AT | 16.01.2008 | |
DK | 16.01.2008 | ||
FI | 16.01.2008 | ||
IE | 16.01.2008 | ||
NL | 16.01.2008 | ||
SI | 16.01.2008 | ||
CH | 31.01.2008 | ||
LI | 31.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
BG | 16.04.2008 | ||
SE | 16.04.2008 | ||
DE | 17.04.2008 | ||
ES | 27.04.2008 | ||
PT | 16.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 16.01.2008 | |
DK | 16.01.2008 | ||
FI | 16.01.2008 | ||
NL | 16.01.2008 | ||
SI | 16.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
BG | 16.04.2008 | ||
SE | 16.04.2008 | ||
DE | 17.04.2008 | ||
ES | 27.04.2008 | ||
PT | 16.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | AT | 16.01.2008 | |
FI | 16.01.2008 | ||
NL | 16.01.2008 | ||
SI | 16.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
BG | 16.04.2008 | ||
DE | 17.04.2008 | ||
ES | 27.04.2008 | ||
PT | 16.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | AT | 16.01.2008 | |
FI | 16.01.2008 | ||
NL | 16.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
BG | 16.04.2008 | ||
DE | 17.04.2008 | ||
ES | 27.04.2008 | ||
PT | 16.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 16.01.2008 | |
FI | 16.01.2008 | ||
NL | 16.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
BG | 16.04.2008 | ||
DE | 17.04.2008 | ||
ES | 27.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/36] | FI | 16.01.2008 | |
NL | 16.01.2008 | ||
DE | 17.04.2008 | ||
ES | 27.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/27] | NL | 16.01.2008 | Cited in | International search | [Y]JP2000256167 ; | [AD]FR2484252 (CHINOIN GYOGYSZER ES VEGYESZET [HU]) [AD] 1-16* the whole document *; | [Y]US4371673 (PITHA JOSEF) [Y] 1-16 * column W *; | [A]EP0396184 (JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV [BE]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [AD]EP0649653 (ADIR [FR]) [AD] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [X]US5472954 (LOFTSSON THORSTEINN [IS]) [X] 1-16 * column W *; | [XD]US5484816 (YANAGIDA TAKESHI [JP], et al) [XD] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [X]US6024941 (YANAGIDA TAKESHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-16 * column 6, line 14 - line 48; claims 1-11; tables 8-2 *; | [X]WO0119332 (BEIERSDORF AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [Y] - GUO, "binding of vitamin a by beta-cyclodextrin and heptakis (2,6-O-dimethyl)-beta-cyclodextrin", CAPLUS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (1996), Database accession no. 1996:71956, XP002227631 [Y] 1-16 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 2000, no. 12, Database accession no. (C - ), & JP2000256167 A 20000919 (SHISEIDO CO) [Y] 1-16 * abstract * |