EP1481316 - METHOD FOR DEFINING A JOB TICKET IN A PRE-PRESS WORKFLOW SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.01.2009 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.02.2009 [2009/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agfa Graphics N.V. Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | [2007/09] |
Former [2004/49] | For all designated states AGFA-GEVAERT Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRINGS, Peter, c/o AGFA-GEVAERT Corporate IP Department 3800, Septestraat 27 B-2640 Mortsel / BE | [2004/49] | Representative(s) | Goedeweeck, Rudi, et al AGFA NV Intellectual Property Department Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/09] | Goedeweeck, Rudi, et al Agfa Graphics N.V. IP Department 3622 Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | Application number, filing date | 03714932.5 | 27.02.2003 | [2004/49] | WO2003EP50034 | Priority number, date | EP20020100205 | 28.02.2002 Original published format: EP 02100205 | US20020373671P | 18.04.2002 Original published format: US 373671 P | [2004/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03075148 | Date: | 12.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1481316 | Date: | 01.12.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/12 | [2004/49] | CPC: |
G06F3/1205 (EP,US);
G06F3/1275 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/49] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UM EIN AUFTRAGSTICKET IN EINEM VORPRESS-ARBEITSFLUSSSYSTEM ZU BESTIMMEN | [2004/49] | English: | METHOD FOR DEFINING A JOB TICKET IN A PRE-PRESS WORKFLOW SYSTEM | [2004/49] | French: | PROCEDE DE DEFINITION D'UNE FICHE DE TRAVAIL DANS UN SYSTEME DE FLUX PREPRESSE | [2004/49] | Entry into regional phase | 28.09.2004 | National basic fee paid | 28.09.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.09.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.08.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/49] | 25.11.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.09.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/09] | 10.10.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]GB2344483 (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH [DE]) [X] 1-3,5-10 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1156410 (HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCH AG [DE]) [A] 1,2,7-10* the whole document * |