|
13.10.2021 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.2020 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.11.2020 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.10.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.10.2020 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.10.2020 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.10.2020 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.07.2020 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.07.2020 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.07.2020 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.07.2020 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
29 |
|
07.07.2020 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
29 |
|
04.03.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.03.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.03.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.02.2020 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
14 |
|
26.02.2020 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.01.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.01.2020 |
General enquiry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.01.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.06.2019 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.02.2017 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.01.2016 |
CDS Clean up - amended applicant details |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.12.2015 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Appeal |
5 |
|
09.09.2015 |
F3303.14 Composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.06.2015 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.06.2015 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.06.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.06.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
08.06.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
08.06.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
08.06.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
08.06.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
08.06.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
08.06.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
08.06.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
08.06.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
08.06.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
08.06.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
08.06.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.06.2015 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
7 |
|
27.05.2015 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.05.2015 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
5 |
|
15.04.2015 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.04.2015 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.04.2015 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.04.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.04.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.04.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.04.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.04.2015 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.04.2015 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.04.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.04.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.04.2015 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Appeal |
10 |
|
20.02.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.02.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.02.2015 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
09.02.2015 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.02.2015 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.02.2015 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.02.2015 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.12.2014 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.12.2014 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.12.2014 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.12.2014 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.12.2014 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.09.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.09.2014 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.09.2014 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.09.2014 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.09.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.09.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.09.2014 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.08.2014 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.08.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.08.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.08.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.08.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.08.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.08.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.08.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.08.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.08.2014 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
02.06.2014 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.05.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.05.2014 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.05.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.05.2014 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.05.2014 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.05.2014 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2014 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.03.2014 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.03.2014 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
19.03.2014 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
35 |
|
01.02.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.02.2013 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.02.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.10.2011 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.10.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.10.2011 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.10.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.06.2011 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.2009 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.2009 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.10.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.10.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.10.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.10.2009 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.10.2009 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.10.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.2009 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.06.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.06.2009 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.02.2009 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.02.2009 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.02.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.02.2009 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.02.2009 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.10.2008 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.10.2008 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
10.10.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.10.2008 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.09.2008 |
Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
07.04.2008 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.2008 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.02.2008 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
28.06.2007 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.06.2007 |
Request for transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
29 |
|
11.12.2006 |
Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
05.12.2006 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.11.2006 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
08.02.2005 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.01.2005 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.01.2005 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.10.2004 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.10.2004 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.10.2004 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.08.2004 |
Reminder for payment period (examination fee/designation fees) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.08.2004 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.08.2004 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.06.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
52 |
|
14.06.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
34 |
|
30.12.2003 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
19.12.2003 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.12.2003 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
29 |
|
07.10.2003 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
21.05.2003 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
21.05.2003 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
21.05.2003 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
22 |
|
21.05.2003 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
21.05.2003 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
1 |