|
07.02.2008 |
Acknowledgement of withdrawal of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.02.2008 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.02.2008 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.02.2008 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.02.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.02.2008 |
Withdrawal of application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.01.2008 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.01.2008 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.01.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.12.2007 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
27.12.2007 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
12 |
|
19.11.2007 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
14 |
|
14.11.2007 |
Cover page: Decision (ex parte) |
Appeal |
11 |
|
15.10.2007 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
19 |
|
11.10.2007 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
19 |
|
04.07.2007 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.06.2007 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.06.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.05.2007 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
4 |
|
25.05.2007 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.04.2007 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
25.09.2006 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.05.2006 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.04.2006 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.02.2006 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.02.2006 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.02.2006 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
01.02.2006 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
6 |
|
31.01.2006 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
31.01.2006 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
6 |
|
25.11.2005 |
Authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.11.2005 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.11.2005 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.11.2005 |
Authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.11.2005 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.09.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.09.2005 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.09.2005 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
23.09.2005 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.09.2005 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.08.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.07.2005 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.07.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.03.2005 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.12.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.12.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.11.2004 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.2004 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.10.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.10.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.10.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.10.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.09.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.09.2004 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.06.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.06.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.06.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.05.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
19.05.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
06.04.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.04.2004 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.03.2004 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
23.01.2004 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.01.2004 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.2004 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.2004 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.01.2004 |
Refund of fees (PCT) |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
31.12.2003 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.12.2003 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.2003 |
General authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.2003 |
General authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.2003 |
General authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.2003 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.12.2003 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.12.2003 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.11.2003 |
International preliminary examination report - Automated |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
17.11.2003 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
17.11.2003 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
13.11.2003 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.11.2003 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.10.2003 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
14.10.2003 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
16.09.2003 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
16.09.2003 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
11.09.2003 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
29.04.2003 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
29.04.2003 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
29.04.2003 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
8 |
|
29.04.2003 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
1 |