|
06.08.2015 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.02.2013 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.2012 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.03.2012 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.2012 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.2012 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.2012 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.03.2012 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.03.2012 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.03.2012 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.03.2012 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.03.2012 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.03.2012 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.03.2012 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.03.2012 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.02.2012 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.02.2012 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.02.2012 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.02.2012 |
Communication about the grant of a European patent according to Board of Appeal decision |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.02.2012 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
10.02.2012 |
Processing of grant of a patent after appeal (internal) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.01.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.12.2011 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.12.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.12.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.12.2011 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
17 |
|
05.12.2011 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
14.07.2011 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
16 |
|
14.06.2011 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.06.2011 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
14.06.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.06.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.06.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.06.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.06.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.06.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.06.2011 |
Description |
Appeal |
17 |
|
14.06.2011 |
Drawings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.06.2011 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.06.2011 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
14.06.2011 |
Non-scannable object |
Appeal |
3 |
|
10.06.2011 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.06.2011 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
08.06.2011 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.06.2011 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
08.06.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.06.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.06.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.06.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.06.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.06.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.06.2011 |
Description |
Appeal |
17 |
|
08.06.2011 |
Drawings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.06.2011 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
28.04.2011 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.04.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.04.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.04.2011 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
17 |
|
04.04.2011 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
11.01.2011 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.06.2010 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.05.2010 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.03.2010 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.04.2009 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.04.2008 |
Refund of fees |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.02.2008 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.02.2008 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.01.2008 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.12.2007 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
9 |
|
12.12.2007 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
9 |
|
11.12.2007 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.12.2007 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.11.2007 |
Authorisation |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.11.2007 |
Request for change of representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.10.2007 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.10.2007 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.10.2007 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.10.2007 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.10.2007 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.10.2007 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.10.2007 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.10.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.2007 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
28.09.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.08.2007 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.08.2007 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.08.2007 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.08.2007 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.08.2007 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.07.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.06.2007 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.06.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
01.06.2007 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.06.2007 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.06.2007 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.06.2007 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.05.2007 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.05.2007 |
Notification of termination of representative's authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.05.2007 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2007 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.05.2007 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.04.2007 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.04.2007 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.04.2007 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.04.2007 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.04.2007 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.2007 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.03.2007 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.2007 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.01.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.01.2007 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.01.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
11.09.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.09.2006 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.06.2006 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.12.2005 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.12.2005 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.11.2005 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.2005 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.11.2005 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
28.10.2005 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.2005 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.2005 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.10.2005 |
Description |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
28.10.2005 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.10.2005 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
12.10.2005 |
Free text |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
12.10.2005 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
12.10.2005 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
12.10.2005 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
12.10.2005 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
12.10.2005 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
12.10.2005 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
12.10.2005 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
12.10.2005 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
16.09.2005 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.07.2005 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
14.07.2005 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
14.07.2005 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
14.07.2005 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
14.07.2005 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
13.07.2005 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
13.07.2005 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
13.07.2005 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
13.07.2005 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
13.07.2005 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
13.06.2005 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
13.06.2005 |
Written opinion - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
13.06.2005 |
Written opinion - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
08.06.2005 |
Free text |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
10.12.2004 |
Annex |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
10.12.2004 |
Annex |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
10.12.2004 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
10.12.2004 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
10.12.2004 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
10.12.2004 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
10.12.2004 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
10.12.2004 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
07.12.2004 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
07.12.2004 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
26.11.2004 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
26.11.2004 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
26.11.2004 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
26.11.2004 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
26.11.2004 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
26.11.2004 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
11.11.2004 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.11.2004 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
06.06.2003 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
06.06.2003 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
06.06.2003 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
17 |
|
06.06.2003 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
06.06.2003 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
1 |