EP1634093 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MAPPING AND CORRECTING GEOMETRIC DISTORTION IN MRI [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.12.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2012 | Withdrawal of application | published on 09.01.2013 [2013/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE UNIVERSITY OF QUEENSLAND St Lucia, QLD 4072 / AU | [2006/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Deming, The University of Queensland Centre for Magnetic Resonance St Lucia, QLD 4072 / AU | 02 /
DODDRELL, David, Michael 6 Lucerne Street Westlake, QLD 4074 / AU | [2006/11] | Representative(s) | Findlay, Alice Rosemary, et al Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Findlay, Alice Rosemary, et al Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2008/02] | Findlay, Alice Rosemary, et al Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2006/11] | Findlay, Alice Rosemary Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House 1-19 New Oxford Street GB-London WC1A 1LW / GB | Application number, filing date | 03722084.5 | 29.05.2003 | [2006/11] | WO2003AU00662 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004106962 | Date: | 09.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1634093 | Date: | 15.03.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 09.12.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G01R33/58, // G01R33/565 | [2006/50] | CPC: |
G01R33/56572 (EP,US);
G01R33/56563 (EP,US);
G01R33/58 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/11] | G01R33/565 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [2006/36] |
Former [2006/11] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM ABBILDEN UND KORRIGIEREN GEOMETRISCHER VERZERRUNGEN BEI DER MRI | [2006/11] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MAPPING AND CORRECTING GEOMETRIC DISTORTION IN MRI | [2006/11] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL POUR FAIRE CORRESPONDRE ET CORRIGER LA DISTORSION GEOMETRIQUE DANS UN IRM | [2006/11] | Entry into regional phase | 16.12.2005 | National basic fee paid | 16.12.2005 | Search fee paid | 16.12.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.12.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/11] | 16.04.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2012 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/02] | 29.11.2012 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 01.02.2013 | 01.02.2013 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.10.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4644276 (SIEROCUK THOMAS J [US], et al) [X] 1-5,9-11,14,15 * column 3, line 8 - column 5, line 14 * [Y] 12,13; | [A]EP0278549 (PHILIPS CORP [US]) [A] 1-15 * figure 2; claim 1 *; | [X]US4888555 (VAUGHAN JOHN T [US], et al) [X] 1-5,9-11,14,15 * column 4, line 15 - line 30; claim 1 *; | [X]JPH02152441 (HITACHI MEDICAL CORP) [X] 1-5,9-11,14,15 * abstract *; | [A]US5005578 (GREER DOUGLAS S [US], et al) [A] 1-15* column 10, line 55 - column 11, line 9 *; | [X] - FINNIGAN, "Phantom System to quantify and map gradient induced distortions in MR images of the Pelvis", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR MAGNETIC RESONANCE IN MEDICINE,, Denver, Co, USA, (20000401), page 1688, XP002405582 [X] 1-5,9-11,14,15 * the whole document * | [YD] - BREEUWER M ET AL, "Detection and correction of geometric distortion in 3D MR images", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE, SPIE, BELLINGHAM, VA, US, (2001), vol. 4322, ISSN 0277-786X, pages 1110 - 1120, XP002376927 [YD] 12,13 * chapter 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.430986 | [X] - PRICE R R ET AL, "QUALITY ASSURANCE METHODS AND PHANTOMS FOR MAGNETIC RESONANCE IMAGING: REPORT OF AAPM NUCLEAR MAGNETIC RESONANCE TASK GROUP NO.1A", MEDICAL PHYSICS, AIP, MELVILLE, NY, US, (19900301), vol. 17, no. 2, ISSN 0094-2405, pages 287 - 295, XP000114577 [X] 1-4 * section C.1.;; figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1118/1.596566 | [T] - WANG D ET AL, "A novel phantom and method for comprehensive 3-dimensional measurement and correction of geometric distortion in magnetic resonance imaging", MAGNETIC RESONANCE IMAGING 2004 UNITED STATES, (2004), vol. 22, no. 4, ISSN 0730-725X, pages 529 - 542, XP002405583 [T] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.mri.2004.01.008 | International search | [A]US6445182 (DEAN DAVID [US], et al); | [A]US5872829 (WISCHMANN HANS-ALOYS [DE], et al); | [A]US5545995 (SCHNEIDER ERIKA [US], et al) | by applicant | US4644276 |