EP1525671 - MULTIPLE MODE RF COMMUNICATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.02.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU, TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Motorola Solutions, Inc. 1303 East Algonquin Road Schaumburg IL 60196 / US | [2011/14] |
Former [2005/17] | For all designated states MOTOROLA, INC. 1303 East Algonquin Road Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUFFNER, Stephen 940 Applewood Lane Algonquin, IL 60102 / US | [2005/17] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/51] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2005/17] | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 03724401.9 | 05.05.2003 | [2005/17] | WO2003US13779 | Priority number, date | US20020179551 | 25.06.2002 Original published format: US 179551 | [2005/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004001997 | Date: | 31.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2004/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1525671 | Date: | 27.04.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.12.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1525671 | Date: | 16.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 31.12.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/40, H04W36/36, H04W72/00, H04W88/06, H04B1/00, H04W36/06, H04W36/30 | [2013/43] | CPC: |
H04W88/06 (EP,KR,US);
H04B1/005 (EP,US);
H04B1/40 (KR);
H04B1/406 (EP,US);
H04W36/304 (EP,KR);
H04W36/06 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2005/17] | H04B1/40, H04B7/216, H04L12/56, H04Q7/20 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/17] | Title | German: | RF-KOMMUNIKATIONSGERÄT MIT MEHREREN MODI | [2005/17] | English: | MULTIPLE MODE RF COMMUNICATION DEVICE | [2005/17] | French: | DISPOSITIF MULTIMODE DE COMMUNICATIONS RF | [2005/17] | Entry into regional phase | 07.01.2005 | National basic fee paid | 07.01.2005 | Search fee paid | 07.01.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.01.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/17] | 14.07.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.02.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 04.03.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.09.2011 | Opposition(s) | 19.01.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.05.2003 | AT | 16.04.2014 | BE | 16.04.2014 | CY | 16.04.2014 | CZ | 16.04.2014 | DK | 16.04.2014 | EE | 16.04.2014 | ES | 16.04.2014 | FI | 16.04.2014 | IT | 16.04.2014 | MC | 16.04.2014 | NL | 16.04.2014 | RO | 16.04.2014 | SI | 16.04.2014 | SK | 16.04.2014 | TR | 16.04.2014 | IE | 05.05.2014 | LU | 05.05.2014 | CH | 31.05.2014 | LI | 31.05.2014 | FR | 16.06.2014 | BG | 16.07.2014 | GR | 17.07.2014 | PT | 18.08.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 05.05.2003 | |
AT | 16.04.2014 | ||
BE | 16.04.2014 | ||
CY | 16.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
ES | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
IT | 16.04.2014 | ||
MC | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
RO | 16.04.2014 | ||
SI | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
IE | 05.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
FR | 16.06.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 16.04.2014 | |
BE | 16.04.2014 | ||
CY | 16.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
ES | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
IT | 16.04.2014 | ||
MC | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
RO | 16.04.2014 | ||
SI | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
IE | 05.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
FR | 16.06.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 16.04.2014 | |
BE | 16.04.2014 | ||
CY | 16.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
ES | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
IT | 16.04.2014 | ||
MC | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
RO | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
IE | 05.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
FR | 16.06.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | AT | 16.04.2014 | |
BE | 16.04.2014 | ||
CY | 16.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
ES | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
IT | 16.04.2014 | ||
MC | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
RO | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
IE | 05.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 16.04.2014 | |
BE | 16.04.2014 | ||
CY | 16.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
ES | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
IT | 16.04.2014 | ||
MC | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
RO | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | AT | 16.04.2014 | |
BE | 16.04.2014 | ||
CY | 16.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
ES | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
MC | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
RO | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | AT | 16.04.2014 | |
BE | 16.04.2014 | ||
CY | 16.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
ES | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
MC | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | AT | 16.04.2014 | |
BE | 16.04.2014 | ||
CY | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
ES | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
MC | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 16.04.2014 | |
BE | 16.04.2014 | ||
CY | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
ES | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 16.04.2014 | |
CY | 16.04.2014 | ||
ES | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 16.04.2014 | |
CY | 16.04.2014 | ||
ES | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 16.04.2014 | |
ES | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 16.04.2014 | |
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 16.04.2014 | |
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 16.04.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1079533 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [X] 1-28 * paragraphs [0006] - [0016] - [0088] - [0092]; figure 7 *; | [X]WO0237706 (ARYYA COMMUNICATIONS INC [US]) [X] 1-28* page 4, line 29 - page 7, line 32; figure 3 *; | [X]EP1213844 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [X] 1-28 * paragraphs [0002] , [0004] , [0008] , [0009]; figures 1-7 * | International search | [A]US5406615 (MILLER II ROBERT R [US], et al); | [A]US5884189 (YAMAZAKI SEIICHI [JP], et al); | [A]US5926479 (BARAN PAUL [US]); | [A]US6169733 (LEE MICHAEL C G [CA]); | [A]US6249686 (DVORKIN VLADIMIR [US], et al); | [AP]US6549778 (MULFORD KEITH I [US]) |