EP1505847 - MOBILE COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, RADIO BASE STATION APPARATUS, AND RANDOM ACCESS CONTROL METHOD USED IN THEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.06.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2007 | Withdrawal of application | published on 01.08.2007 [2007/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/06] | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 101-8001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HONDO, Shinya c/o Nec Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [2005/06] | Representative(s) | von Samson-Himmelstjerna, Friedrich, et al Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Widenmayerstrasse 6 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/06] | von Samson-Himmelstjerna, Friedrich R., Dipl.-Phys., et al SAMSON & PARTNER Widenmayerstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03725801.9 | 15.05.2003 | [2005/06] | WO2003JP06107 | Priority number, date | JP20020139375 | 15.05.2002 Original published format: JP 2002139375 | [2005/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03098956 | Date: | 27.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1505847 | Date: | 09.02.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.11.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/38 | [2005/06] | CPC: |
H04W74/002 (EP,US);
H04W72/23 (EP,US);
H04W74/0833 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, SE [2005/36] |
Former [2005/06] | DE, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE | Title | German: | MOBILKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM, FUNKBASISSTATIONSVORRICHTUNG UND DARIN VERWENDETES DIREKTZUGRIFFSSTEUERVERFAHREN | [2005/06] | English: | MOBILE COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, RADIO BASE STATION APPARATUS, AND RANDOM ACCESS CONTROL METHOD USED IN THEM | [2005/06] | French: | SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATION MOBILE, APPAREIL DE STATION DE BASE RADIO, ET PROCEDE DE COMMANDE D'ACCES ALEATOIRE UTILISE DANS CEUX-CI | [2005/06] | Entry into regional phase | 15.11.2004 | Translation filed | 15.11.2004 | National basic fee paid | 15.11.2004 | Search fee paid | 15.11.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.11.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.05.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 15.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/06] | 20.06.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JP2000083005 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE); | [Y]WO0056107 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al); | [Y]JP2001251658 (NTT DOCOMO INC) |