|
05.02.2020 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.02.2020 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.01.2020 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.01.2020 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.01.2020 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.01.2020 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.01.2020 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
7 |
|
23.01.2020 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
5 |
|
27.11.2019 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
5 |
|
27.11.2019 |
F3317 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Proprietor + Opponent) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
08.11.2019 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
07.11.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.11.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
07.11.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
07.11.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
07.11.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
07.11.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
07.11.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
07.11.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
07.11.2019 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
07.11.2019 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
07.11.2019 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
07.11.2019 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
07.11.2019 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
07.11.2019 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
07.11.2019 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
07.11.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.11.2019 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
18.10.2019 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
18.10.2019 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
17.10.2019 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
14.10.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.10.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.10.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.10.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.10.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.10.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.10.2019 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.10.2019 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
14.10.2019 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.10.2019 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
27.09.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.09.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
6 |
|
27.09.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
6 |
|
27.09.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
6 |
|
27.09.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
6 |
|
27.09.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
6 |
|
27.09.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
6 |
|
27.09.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
6 |
|
27.09.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
6 |
|
27.09.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.09.2019 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
12.09.2019 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
45 |
|
12.09.2019 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
06.09.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.09.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.09.2019 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
02.09.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.09.2019 |
General enquiry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.09.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.08.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.08.2019 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
07.08.2019 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
07.08.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.08.2019 |
Request for transfer of rights - opponent |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.07.2019 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.01.2019 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.01.2019 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.12.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
17.12.2018 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.12.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.12.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.12.2018 |
Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.12.2018 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.11.2018 |
Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.11.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
09.11.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.11.2018 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.10.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
11.10.2018 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.09.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
26.09.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.09.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.09.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.09.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.09.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.09.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.09.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.09.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.09.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.09.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.09.2018 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.09.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.09.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.09.2018 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
10 |
|
12.09.2018 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.11.2017 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
5 |
|
09.11.2017 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.09.2017 |
General enquiry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.02.2017 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.12.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.12.2016 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.12.2016 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Appeal |
3 |
|
21.12.2016 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Appeal |
5 |
|
21.12.2016 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Appeal |
12 |
|
21.12.2016 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Appeal |
3 |
|
21.12.2016 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.06.2016 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.06.2016 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.03.2016 |
General authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.01.2016 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.01.2016 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.01.2016 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.12.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.12.2015 |
Matter concerning the application |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.12.2015 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.12.2015 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
3 |
|
19.08.2015 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.08.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.08.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.08.2015 |
Request for assignment |
Appeal |
7 |
|
14.07.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
09.07.2015 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Appeal |
3 |
|
09.07.2015 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Appeal |
9 |
|
09.07.2015 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.07.2015 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Appeal |
3 |
|
09.07.2015 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Appeal |
17 |
|
09.07.2015 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Appeal |
8 |
|
09.07.2015 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Appeal |
4 |
|
09.07.2015 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Appeal |
3 |
|
09.07.2015 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Appeal |
14 |
|
09.07.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.07.2015 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
08.07.2015 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
07.07.2015 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
16.03.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
12.03.2015 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the opponent (Association) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.03.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.03.2015 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
10.03.2015 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
10.03.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.03.2015 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
15 |
|
10.03.2015 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
15 |
|
06.03.2015 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
5 |
|
06.03.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
04.03.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
04.03.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
27.02.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.02.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
27.02.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.02.2015 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
4 |
|
27.02.2015 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.02.2015 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.02.2015 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
4 |
|
24.02.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
20.02.2015 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
14 |
|
19.02.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
18.02.2015 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
14 |
|
13.02.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.02.2015 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.02.2015 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
13.02.2015 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
13.02.2015 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
22 |
|
13.02.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.02.2015 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
6 |
|
11.12.2014 |
Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.10.2014 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.10.2014 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
5 |
|
10.10.2014 |
Non-scannable object |
Appeal |
4 |
|
10.10.2014 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
25 |
|
09.10.2014 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
29 |
|
02.10.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.10.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
02.10.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.10.2014 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
20 |
|
30.09.2014 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
7 |
|
29.09.2014 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
7 |
|
29.08.2014 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.08.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
26.08.2014 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.08.2014 |
Reply to a deficiency communication regarding an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.08.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.08.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.08.2014 |
F3045 Inadmissibility of the appeal: missing address / missing name |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.08.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
18.08.2014 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
5 |
|
16.08.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.08.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.08.2014 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.08.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.08.2014 |
Reply to a deficiency communication regarding an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.08.2014 |
Reply to a deficiency communication regarding an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.08.2014 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.08.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.08.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.08.2014 |
F3045 Inadmissibility of the appeal: missing address / missing name |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.08.2014 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
5 |
|
08.08.2014 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
5 |
|
08.08.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
05.08.2014 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.08.2014 |
General enquiry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.08.2014 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.08.2014 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.08.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.08.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.07.2014 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.07.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.07.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.07.2014 |
Refund of fees |
Opposition |
3 |
|
02.07.2014 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.06.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.06.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.06.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.06.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.06.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.06.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.06.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.06.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.06.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.06.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.06.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.06.2014 |
Annex |
Opposition |
22 |
|
02.06.2014 |
Annex |
Opposition |
122 |
|
02.06.2014 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
02.06.2014 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.06.2014 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
02.06.2014 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
27 |
|
02.06.2014 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.06.2014 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.06.2014 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.06.2014 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.06.2014 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.06.2014 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.06.2014 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.05.2014 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.05.2014 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.03.2014 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.2014 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.01.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.01.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.01.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.01.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.01.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.2014 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.01.2014 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.01.2014 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
3 |
|
16.12.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.12.2013 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.12.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.12.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.12.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.12.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.12.2013 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.11.2013 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.11.2013 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.11.2013 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
19.11.2013 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.10.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.10.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.10.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.10.2013 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.10.2013 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.10.2013 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.10.2013 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.10.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.10.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.10.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.10.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.10.2013 |
Request for change of name -opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.10.2013 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.10.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.10.2013 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.10.2013 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.10.2013 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
10 |
|
10.10.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
10.10.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
10.10.2013 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
8 |
|
10.10.2013 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.10.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.10.2013 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.10.2013 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.10.2013 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.10.2013 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.10.2013 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.10.2013 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.10.2013 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.10.2013 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
09.10.2013 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.10.2013 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
08.10.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.2013 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.10.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.10.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.10.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.10.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.10.2013 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.09.2013 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.09.2013 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.09.2013 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.09.2013 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.09.2013 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.09.2013 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.09.2013 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.09.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.09.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.09.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.09.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.09.2013 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.09.2013 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.09.2013 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.09.2013 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
31.08.2013 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.08.2013 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.08.2013 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.08.2013 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.08.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.08.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.08.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.08.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.08.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.08.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.08.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.08.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.08.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.08.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.08.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.08.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.08.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.08.2013 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
16.08.2013 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
12 |
|
16.08.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
43 |
|
15.08.2013 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
12 |
|
15.08.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
43 |
|
13.08.2013 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.08.2013 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.08.2013 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.08.2013 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.08.2013 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
15 |
|
13.08.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
13.08.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.08.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
13.08.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.08.2013 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.08.2013 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.08.2013 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.08.2013 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
4 |
|
09.08.2013 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.07.2013 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.07.2013 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.07.2013 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.06.2013 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.04.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.04.2013 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.04.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.04.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.04.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.04.2013 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.04.2013 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.04.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.04.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.04.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.04.2013 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.04.2013 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.04.2013 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.04.2013 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.04.2013 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.03.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.03.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.03.2013 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.03.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.03.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.03.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.03.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.03.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2013 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
11.03.2013 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
7 |
|
11.03.2013 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
7 |
|
11.03.2013 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
7 |
|
11.03.2013 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
7 |
|
11.03.2013 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.03.2013 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.03.2013 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.03.2013 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.03.2013 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.03.2013 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.03.2013 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.01.2013 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.01.2013 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.12.2012 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.06.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.03.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.03.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.03.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.03.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.03.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
14.03.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
14.03.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
14.03.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.03.2012 |
Description |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.03.2012 |
Fax filed during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
09.03.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
6 |
|
09.03.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
09.03.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.03.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
05.04.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.04.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.04.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.04.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.03.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
8 |
|
29.03.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.03.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.03.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
29.03.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.03.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.03.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
29.03.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.03.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.03.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
25.03.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
8 |
|
25.03.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.03.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
25.03.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
25.03.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
25.03.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
25.03.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
13.12.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.10.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.10.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.10.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.10.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
27.10.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.10.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.10.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.10.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.10.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.10.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.10.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.10.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.10.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
27.10.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.10.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
27.10.2010 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.10.2010 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
64 |
|
01.10.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.10.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.10.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.10.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.10.2010 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.09.2010 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.06.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.06.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.06.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.06.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.05.2010 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.05.2010 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.05.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.05.2010 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.05.2010 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.05.2010 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.05.2010 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.05.2010 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.04.2010 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.04.2010 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
10 |
|
16.04.2010 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
16.04.2010 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
16.04.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.04.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.04.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.04.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.04.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.04.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.04.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.04.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.04.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
16.04.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.04.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.04.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.04.2010 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.04.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
16.04.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
24 |
|
16.04.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
16.04.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
15.04.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.04.2010 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.04.2010 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
18 |
|
15.04.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.04.2010 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.04.2010 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.04.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.04.2010 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
15.04.2010 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
15.04.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
15.04.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
15.04.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
15.04.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
15.04.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
15.04.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
15.04.2010 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.04.2010 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.04.2010 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.04.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
110 |
|
14.04.2010 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
14.04.2010 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
14.04.2010 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.07.2009 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.07.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
18.07.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
18.07.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.07.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.07.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.07.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.07.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
18.07.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
18.07.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
18.07.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
18.07.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.07.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
18.07.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.07.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.07.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.07.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.07.2009 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.07.2009 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
4 |
|
18.07.2009 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
28 |
|
18.07.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
18.07.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
18.07.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
18.07.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
18.07.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.07.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
18.07.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
18.07.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
25 |
|
18.07.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
18.07.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
18.07.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
35 |
|
18.07.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
18.07.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
57 |
|
16.07.2009 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Opposition |
5 |
|
16.07.2009 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.07.2009 |
Drawings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.07.2009 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.07.2009 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.07.2009 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
16.07.2009 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.07.2009 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.07.2009 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
12 |
|
16.07.2009 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.07.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.07.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.07.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
16.07.2009 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
22 |
|
16.07.2009 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
16.07.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
16.07.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
16.07.2009 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
3 |
|
18.06.2009 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.05.2009 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.04.2009 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.04.2009 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.04.2009 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.03.2009 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.03.2009 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.03.2009 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.03.2009 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
37 |
|
18.02.2009 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.12.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.12.2008 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.12.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.12.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
17.12.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.2008 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.12.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
26.11.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.11.2008 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.11.2008 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.11.2008 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.2008 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.11.2008 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
10.11.2008 |
Reply from applicant/patentee regarding third party observations |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
06.11.2008 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.11.2008 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.11.2008 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.11.2008 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.11.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.11.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.11.2008 |
Reply from applicant/patentee regarding third party observations |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
03.11.2008 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.11.2008 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.10.2008 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.10.2008 |
Transmittal of third party observations to applicant |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
30.09.2008 |
Observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
30.09.2008 |
Patent document filed by a Third party |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
30.09.2008 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.09.2008 |
Observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
29.09.2008 |
Patent document filed by a Third party |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
15.09.2008 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.09.2008 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.09.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.07.2008 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2008 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.2008 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.04.2008 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.02.2008 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
19.02.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
19.02.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.02.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.01.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.01.2008 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.2008 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.2008 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.2007 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.2007 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.05.2007 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.04.2007 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.03.2007 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2007 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.06.2006 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.05.2006 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.02.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.02.2006 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.01.2005 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.01.2005 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
14.01.2005 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
12.01.2005 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.12.2004 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.12.2004 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
08.10.2004 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
24.09.2004 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.08.2004 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
26.08.2004 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
26.08.2004 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
26.08.2004 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
26.08.2004 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
26.08.2004 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
26.08.2004 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
26.08.2004 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
28.05.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
14.01.2004 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
14.01.2004 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
10.12.2003 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
10.12.2003 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
08.12.2003 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
20.11.2003 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
20.11.2003 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
39 |
|
13.06.2003 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
13.06.2003 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
6 |
|
13.06.2003 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
18 |
|
13.06.2003 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
13 |
|
08.05.2003 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |