EP1656766 - DYNAMIC POWER LINE BANDWIDTH LIMIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 05.02.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.02.2010 | Refusal of application | published on 10.03.2010 [2010/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Main.Net Communications Ltd. 14 Hataas Street 44425 Kfar Saba / IL | [2006/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZALITZKY, Yeshayahu 48 Sold Street 43219 Raanana / IL | 02 /
HADAS, David 9 Hadudaim Street 48074 ROSH-HA'AYIN / IL | [2006/20] | Representative(s) | van Westenbrugge, Andries Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 NL-2502 LS The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2006/20] | van Westenbrugge, Andries Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Postbus 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 03735943.7 | 29.06.2003 | [2006/20] | WO2003IL00546 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005004396 | Date: | 13.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1656766 | Date: | 17.05.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.01.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/24, H04L12/26 | [2006/20] | CPC: |
H04L47/762 (EP,US);
H04B3/544 (EP,US);
H04L41/0896 (EP,US);
H04L43/08 (US);
H04L47/11 (EP,US);
H04L47/13 (EP,US);
H04L47/15 (EP,US);
H04L47/29 (EP,US);
H04L47/70 (EP,US);
H04L47/808 (EP,US);
H04L47/822 (EP,US);
H04L47/824 (EP,US);
H04L47/829 (EP,US);
H04B2203/5408 (EP,US);
H04B2203/5445 (EP,US);
H04L41/5003 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/20] | Extension states | AL | 30.01.2006 | LT | 30.01.2006 | LV | 30.01.2006 | MK | 30.01.2006 | Title | German: | DYNAMISCHE BANDBREITENBEGRENZUNG IN EINEM POWERLINENETZ | [2006/20] | English: | DYNAMIC POWER LINE BANDWIDTH LIMIT | [2006/20] | French: | LIMITE DYNAMIQUE DE LARGEUR DE BANDE DE LIGNE ELECTRIQUE | [2006/20] | Entry into regional phase | 30.01.2006 | National basic fee paid | 30.01.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.01.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/20] | 22.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2010/10] | 03.11.2009 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2010/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.01.2006 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.02.2006 | 30.06.2009 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5724659 (DANIEL BRIAN MICHAEL [US], et al) [X] 37-41 * abstract * * column 2, line 10 - column 4, line 54 *; | [X]US2002129143 (MCKINNON MARTIN W [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,9,37-41 * abstract * * figure 20 * * page 2, paragraph 18- - page 3, paragraph 21 * * claim 1 *; | [A]WO03010896 (MAIN NET COMM LTD [IL], et al) [A] 1-41* the whole document * |