|
18.04.2019 |
Communication of the Registry during review procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
18.04.2019 |
Decision of the Enlarged Board of Appeal in review procedure |
Appeal |
19 |
|
15.04.2019 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.03.2019 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.03.2019 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.03.2019 |
F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.01.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.01.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.01.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.01.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.01.2019 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during review procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
21.01.2019 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during review procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.11.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.10.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.10.2018 |
Communication of the Registry during review procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.10.2018 |
Order from the Enlarged Board of Appeal in review procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.10.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.10.2018 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding review procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.10.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.10.2018 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during review procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.10.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.09.2018 |
Communication from Registry of the Enlarged Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.09.2018 |
Communication of the Enlarged Board of Appeal during review procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
20.09.2018 |
Order from the Enlarged Board of Appeal in review procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.05.2018 |
Communication of the Registry during review procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.05.2018 |
Communication of the Registry during review procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.04.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Appeal |
3 |
|
30.04.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Appeal |
3 |
|
30.04.2018 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.04.2018 |
Order from the Enlarged Board of Appeal in review procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.04.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.04.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.04.2018 |
Letter relating to review procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.04.2018 |
Letter relating to review procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
23.04.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.04.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.04.2018 |
Authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.04.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.04.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.04.2018 |
Letter relating to review procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
23.04.2018 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.04.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.03.2018 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.02.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.02.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.02.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.02.2018 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
25 |
|
14.02.2018 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.02.2018 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.02.2018 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.10.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.10.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.10.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
32 |
|
24.10.2017 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
24.10.2017 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
3 |
|
24.10.2017 |
F3317 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Proprietor + Opponent) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
19.10.2017 |
General authorisation |
Appeal |
3 |
|
19.10.2017 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.09.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.09.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.09.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.09.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.09.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.09.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.09.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.09.2017 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
19 |
|
19.09.2017 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
19 |
|
19.09.2017 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
19 |
|
15.09.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.09.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.09.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.09.2017 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.09.2017 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.09.2017 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.09.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.09.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.09.2017 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
05.09.2017 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.08.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.08.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.08.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.08.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.08.2017 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.07.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.07.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.07.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.07.2017 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.07.2017 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.07.2017 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
14.07.2017 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
20 |
|
14.07.2017 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
14.07.2017 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
14 |
|
08.06.2017 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.05.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.05.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.05.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.05.2017 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.05.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.05.2017 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
04.05.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.05.2017 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
3 |
|
02.05.2017 |
F3039 Attendance note about a phone conversation and continuation sheet |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.05.2017 |
F3039 Attendance note about a phone conversation and continuation sheet |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.05.2017 |
F3042 Dispatch of attendance note about a phone conversation |
Appeal |
3 |
|
02.05.2017 |
F3042 Dispatch of attendance note about a phone conversation |
Appeal |
3 |
|
13.04.2017 |
Communication about missing proof of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.03.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.03.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.03.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.03.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.03.2017 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.03.2017 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.03.2017 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.03.2017 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.03.2017 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.03.2017 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.01.2017 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.01.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.01.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.12.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.12.2016 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
31 |
|
21.12.2016 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
21.12.2016 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.12.2016 |
Intervention of the assumed infringer |
Appeal |
16 |
|
21.12.2016 |
Intervention of the assumed infringer |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.12.2016 |
Intervention of the assumed infringer |
Appeal |
6 |
|
21.12.2016 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
21.12.2016 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
21.12.2016 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
21.12.2016 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
21.12.2016 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
21.12.2016 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
16 |
|
21.12.2016 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
41 |
|
21.12.2016 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
12.10.2016 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
3 |
|
12.10.2016 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
3 |
|
12.02.2016 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.02.2016 |
Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure |
Search / examination |
33 |
|
09.02.2016 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.02.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.02.2016 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.12.2015 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
37 |
|
22.12.2015 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
37 |
|
07.12.2015 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.12.2015 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.10.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.10.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.10.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.10.2015 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
8 |
|
30.09.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.09.2015 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
2 |
|
31.08.2015 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Appeal |
2 |
|
31.08.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.08.2015 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.08.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.08.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.08.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.08.2015 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.07.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.06.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.06.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.06.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.06.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.06.2015 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.06.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.06.2015 |
F3045 Inadmissibility of the appeal: missing address / missing name |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.06.2015 |
F3045 Inadmissibility of the appeal: missing address / missing name |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.06.2015 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.06.2015 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.06.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.06.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.06.2015 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
15 |
|
01.06.2015 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
9 |
|
29.05.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.05.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
9 |
|
29.05.2015 |
Amended description with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
29.05.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
9 |
|
29.05.2015 |
Description |
Appeal |
3 |
|
29.05.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.05.2015 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
8 |
|
20.05.2015 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.04.2015 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.04.2015 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.03.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.03.2015 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.03.2015 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.03.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
31.03.2015 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.03.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.03.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.03.2015 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.03.2015 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.03.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.02.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.02.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.01.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.01.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.01.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.2015 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.2015 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
38 |
|
21.01.2015 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
14 |
|
21.01.2015 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.01.2015 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.01.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.01.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.01.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.01.2015 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
07.01.2015 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.01.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.01.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.01.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.01.2015 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.01.2015 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
07.01.2015 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
07.01.2015 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
07.01.2015 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.10.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.10.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.10.2014 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.10.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.10.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
9 |
|
16.10.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
24 |
|
16.10.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
16.10.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.10.2014 |
Claims |
Opposition |
9 |
|
16.10.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.10.2014 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.10.2014 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.10.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
10.10.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.10.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.10.2014 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.09.2014 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.09.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.09.2014 |
Transmittal of third party observations to applicant |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.09.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.09.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.09.2014 |
Observations by third parties |
Opposition |
17 |
|
17.09.2014 |
Patent document filed by a Third party |
Opposition |
16 |
|
17.09.2014 |
Patent document filed by a Third party |
Opposition |
6 |
|
11.09.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.09.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.09.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.09.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
04.09.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
9 |
|
04.09.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.09.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
5 |
|
04.09.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
04.09.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
04.09.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
04.09.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
04.09.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.09.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
9 |
|
04.09.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
9 |
|
04.09.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
9 |
|
04.09.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
9 |
|
04.09.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
9 |
|
04.09.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
9 |
|
04.09.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
9 |
|
04.09.2014 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.09.2014 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.09.2014 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.09.2014 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.09.2014 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.09.2014 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.09.2014 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.09.2014 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.09.2014 |
Claims |
Opposition |
9 |
|
04.09.2014 |
Claims |
Opposition |
9 |
|
04.09.2014 |
Claims |
Opposition |
9 |
|
04.09.2014 |
Claims |
Opposition |
6 |
|
04.09.2014 |
Claims |
Opposition |
9 |
|
04.09.2014 |
Claims |
Opposition |
9 |
|
04.09.2014 |
Claims |
Opposition |
9 |
|
04.09.2014 |
Claims |
Opposition |
9 |
|
04.09.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.09.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.09.2014 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.09.2014 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.07.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.06.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.06.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.06.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.06.2014 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
14 |
|
17.06.2014 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.06.2014 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.06.2014 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.06.2014 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.05.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.05.2014 |
Reply from applicant/patentee regarding third party observations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
13.02.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.2014 |
Transmittal of third party observations to applicant |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.02.2014 |
Citation filed by a third party |
Opposition |
59 |
|
05.02.2014 |
Citation filed by a third party |
Opposition |
31 |
|
05.02.2014 |
Citation filed by a third party |
Opposition |
4 |
|
05.02.2014 |
Citation filed by a third party |
Opposition |
16 |
|
05.02.2014 |
Non-patent literature filed by a third party |
Opposition |
22 |
|
05.02.2014 |
Observations by third parties |
Opposition |
12 |
|
05.02.2014 |
Observations by third parties |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.11.2013 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
60 |
|
13.09.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.09.2013 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.09.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.09.2013 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.09.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.08.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.08.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.08.2013 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
16 |
|
02.05.2013 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
02.05.2013 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
02.05.2013 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.02.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.02.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.02.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.02.2012 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
8 |
|
15.12.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.12.2011 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.12.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.12.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.12.2011 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.2011 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
26.07.2011 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.07.2011 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.07.2011 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.07.2010 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the opponent (Association) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.07.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.06.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.06.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.06.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
9 |
|
24.06.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
9 |
|
24.06.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
9 |
|
24.06.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
9 |
|
24.06.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.06.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.06.2010 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
28 |
|
24.06.2010 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.06.2010 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.04.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.04.2010 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.04.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.04.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.04.2010 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.12.2009 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.12.2009 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.10.2009 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.09.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.09.2009 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.09.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
168 |
|
03.09.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
03.09.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.09.2009 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
03.09.2009 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
03.09.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
41 |
|
06.11.2008 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.10.2008 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.10.2008 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
14.10.2008 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
14.10.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.09.2008 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.09.2008 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.2008 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
18.06.2008 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.06.2008 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.06.2008 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.06.2008 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
54 |
|
04.12.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.12.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.10.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.10.2007 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.04.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.04.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.04.2007 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.04.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.02.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.02.2007 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.10.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
17.10.2006 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.10.2006 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.09.2006 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.08.2006 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2006 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.07.2006 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.07.2006 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.07.2006 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.07.2006 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.07.2006 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.04.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.04.2006 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.2004 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.12.2004 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.10.2004 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
21.10.2004 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.10.2004 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
24.09.2004 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.05.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
43 |
|
28.05.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
15.01.2004 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
20.11.2003 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.11.2003 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
56 |
|
22.09.2003 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.06.2003 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
12.06.2003 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
11 |
|
12.06.2003 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
34 |
|
12.06.2003 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
11 |
|
12.06.2003 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
1 |