blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1521642

EP1521642 - DEVICE FOR THE APPLICATION OF A FLUID [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  21.02.2014
Database last updated on 24.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip21.02.2014Revocation of patentpublished on 26.03.2014  [2014/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Eftec Europe Holding AG
Grafenauweg 8
6304 Zug / CH
[2007/18]
Former [2005/15]For all designated states
Eftec Europe Holding AG
Grafenauweg 8
6304 Zug / CH
Inventor(s)01 / NYANDER, Anders
Nöbbelövsvägen 15
S-291 91 Kristianstad / SE
 [2005/15]
Representative(s)Hepp Wenger Ryffel AG
Friedtalweg 5
9500 Wil / CH
[2011/27]
Former [2008/16]Wilming, Martin
Hepp Wenger Ryffel AG Friedtalweg 5
9500 Wil / CH
Former [2005/15]Akerman, Marten Lennart
Albihns Malmö AB Box 4289
203 14 Malmö / SE
Application number, filing date03738853.508.07.2003
[2005/15]
WO2003SE01194
Priority number, dateSE2002000216510.07.2002         Original published format: SE 0202165
[2005/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2004007089
Date:22.01.2004
Language:EN
[2004/04]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1521642
Date:13.04.2005
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.01.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2005/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1521642
Date:02.05.2007
Language:EN
[2007/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.01.2004
ClassificationIPC:B05B15/08, B05B12/04, B05B1/32
[2005/15]
CPC:
B05B1/302 (EP); B05B1/14 (SE); B05B1/169 (EP);
B05B1/3013 (SE); B05B12/04 (EP,SE); B05B15/652 (EP);
B05B7/24 (SE); B05B12/1472 (EP); B05B13/0431 (EP);
B05B15/68 (EP); B05B7/16 (EP); B05B7/32 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/15]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUR AUFTRAGUNG VON FLÜSSIGKEITEN[2005/15]
English:DEVICE FOR THE APPLICATION OF A FLUID[2005/15]
French:DISPOSITIF D'APPLICATION D'UN FLUIDE[2005/15]
Entry into regional phase08.02.2005National basic fee paid 
08.02.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
08.02.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.02.2004Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
08.02.2005Examination requested  [2005/15]
14.11.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
10.07.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.11.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.03.2007Fee for grant paid
14.03.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  29.01.2008  13.02.2008  ADMISSIBLE
ABB PATENT GmbH
Kallstadter Strasse 1
68309 Mannheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Miller, Toivo
ABB Patent GmbH
Wallstadter Strasse 59
68520 Ladenburg / DE
 02  30.01.2008  24.08.2011  WITHDRAWN
ECCO FINISHING AB
Box 93
532 22 Skara / SE
Opponent's representative
Brann AB
P.O. Box 3690
Sveavägen 63
103 59 Stockholm / SE
 03  04.02.2008  13.02.2008  ADMISSIBLE
Dürr Systems GmbH
Otto-Dürr-Strasse 9
70435 Stuttgart / DE
Opponent's representative
Beier, Ralph
V. Bezold & Partner
Patentanwälte - PartG mbB
Akademiestraße 7
80799 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2013/46]
Opponent(s)01  29.01.2008  13.02.2008  ADMISSIBLE
ABB PATENT GmbH
Kallstadter Strasse 1
68309 Mannheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Miller, Toivo
ABB Patent GmbH, Wallstadter Strasse 59
68520 Ladenburg / DE
 02  30.01.2008  24.08.2011  WITHDRAWN
ECCO FINISHING AB
Box 93
532 22 Skara / SE
Opponent's representative
Brann AB
P.O. Box 12246
102 26 Stockholm / SE
 03  04.02.2008  13.02.2008  ADMISSIBLE
Dürr Systems GmbH
Otto-Dürr-Strasse 9
70435 Stuttgart / DE
Opponent's representative
Beier, Ralph
v. Bezold & Partner Akademiestrasse 7
80799 München / DE
Former [2011/39]
Opponent(s)01  29.01.2008  13.02.2008  ADMISSIBLE
ABB PATENT GmbH
Kallstadter Strasse 1
68309 Mannheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Miller, Toivo
ABB Patent GmbH, Wallstadter Strasse 59
68520 Ladenburg / DE
 02  30.01.2008  24.08.2011  WITHDRAWN
ECCO FINISHING AB
Box 93
532 22 Skara / SE
Opponent's representative
Fröderberg, Anders Oskar
BRANN AB P.O. Box 12246
102 26 Stockholm / SE
 03  04.02.2008  13.02.2008  ADMISSIBLE
Dürr Systems GmbH
Otto-Dürr-Strasse 9
70435 Stuttgart / DE
Opponent's representative
Beier, Ralph
v. Bezold & Partner Akademiestrasse 7
80799 München / DE
Former [2008/11]
Opponent(s)01  29.01.2008   
ABB PATENT GmbH
Kallstadter Strasse 1
68309 Mannheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Miller, Toivo
ABB Patent GmbH, Wallstadter Strasse 59
68520 Ladenburg / DE
 02  30.01.2008  07.02.2008  ADMISSIBLE
ECCO FINISHING AB
Box 93
532 22 Skara / SE
Opponent's representative
Fröderberg, Anders Oskar
BRANN AB Västgötagatan 2 P.O. Box 17192
104 62 Stockholm / SE
 03  04.02.2008   
Dürr Systems GmbH
Otto-Dürr-Strasse 9
70435 Stuttgart / DE
Opponent's representative
Beier, Ralph
v. Bezold & Partner Patentanwälte Akademiestraße 7
D-80799 München / DE
Former [2008/10]
Opponent(s)01  29.01.2008    ADMISSIBLE
ABB PATENT GmbH
Kallstadter Strasse 1
68309 Mannheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Miller, Toivo
ABB Patent GmbH, Wallstadter Strasse 59
68520 Ladenburg / DE
 02  30.01.2008   
ECCO FINISHING AB
Box 93
532 22 Skara / SE
Opponent's representative
Fröderberg, Anders Oskar
BRANN AB Västgötagatan 2 P.O. Box 17192
104 62 Stockholm / SE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
16.05.2008Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
06.09.2008Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
21.04.2010Date of oral proceedings
17.06.2010Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
17.06.2010Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
19.12.2013Legal effect of revocation of patent [ N /P ]
19.12.2013Legal effect of revocation of patent [2014/13]
04.02.2014Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition17.08.2010Appeal received No.  T1732/10
27.10.2010Statement of grounds filed
19.12.2013Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
13.08.2010Appeal received No.  T1732/10
27.10.2010Statement of grounds filed
19.12.2013Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
19.12.2013Date of oral proceedings
07.01.2014Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
24.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH02.05.2007
CY02.05.2007
DK02.05.2007
EE02.05.2007
FI02.05.2007
LI02.05.2007
RO02.05.2007
SI02.05.2007
TR02.05.2007
LU08.07.2007
IE09.07.2007
MC31.07.2007
BG02.08.2007
GR03.08.2007
HU03.11.2007
[2013/46]
Former [2009/43]CH02.05.2007
CY02.05.2007
DK02.05.2007
EE02.05.2007
FI02.05.2007
LI02.05.2007
RO02.05.2007
SI02.05.2007
TR02.05.2007
LU08.07.2007
IE09.07.2007
MC31.07.2007
BG02.08.2007
GB02.08.2007
GR03.08.2007
HU03.11.2007
Former [2009/39]CH02.05.2007
CY02.05.2007
DK02.05.2007
EE02.05.2007
FI02.05.2007
LI02.05.2007
RO02.05.2007
SI02.05.2007
LU08.07.2007
IE09.07.2007
MC31.07.2007
BG02.08.2007
GB02.08.2007
GR03.08.2007
Former [2009/34]CH02.05.2007
CY02.05.2007
DK02.05.2007
EE02.05.2007
FI02.05.2007
LI02.05.2007
RO02.05.2007
SI02.05.2007
IE09.07.2007
MC31.07.2007
BG02.08.2007
GB02.08.2007
GR03.08.2007
Former [2009/24]CH02.05.2007
DK02.05.2007
EE02.05.2007
FI02.05.2007
LI02.05.2007
RO02.05.2007
SI02.05.2007
IE09.07.2007
MC31.07.2007
BG02.08.2007
GB02.08.2007
GR03.08.2007
Former [2009/11]CH02.05.2007
DK02.05.2007
EE02.05.2007
FI02.05.2007
LI02.05.2007
RO02.05.2007
SI02.05.2007
SK08.07.2007
IE09.07.2007
MC31.07.2007
BG02.08.2007
GB02.08.2007
GR03.08.2007
Former [2009/03]CH02.05.2007
DK02.05.2007
FI02.05.2007
LI02.05.2007
RO02.05.2007
SI02.05.2007
SK08.07.2007
IE09.07.2007
MC31.07.2007
BG02.08.2007
GB02.08.2007
GR03.08.2007
Former [2008/45]CH02.05.2007
DK02.05.2007
FI02.05.2007
LI02.05.2007
RO02.05.2007
SI02.05.2007
SK08.07.2007
IE09.07.2007
MC31.07.2007
BG02.08.2007
GR03.08.2007
Former [2008/28]CH02.05.2007
DK02.05.2007
FI02.05.2007
LI02.05.2007
RO02.05.2007
SI02.05.2007
SK08.07.2007
MC31.07.2007
BG02.08.2007
GR03.08.2007
Former [2008/26]CH02.05.2007
DK02.05.2007
FI02.05.2007
LI02.05.2007
SI02.05.2007
SK08.07.2007
MC31.07.2007
BG02.08.2007
GR03.08.2007
Former [2008/22]CH02.05.2007
DK02.05.2007
FI02.05.2007
LI02.05.2007
SI02.05.2007
MC31.07.2007
BG02.08.2007
GR03.08.2007
Former [2008/09]CH02.05.2007
DK02.05.2007
FI02.05.2007
LI02.05.2007
SI02.05.2007
BG02.08.2007
Former [2008/08]CH02.05.2007
DK02.05.2007
FI02.05.2007
LI02.05.2007
SI02.05.2007
Former [2008/07]CH02.05.2007
FI02.05.2007
LI02.05.2007
SI02.05.2007
Former [2007/49]CH02.05.2007
FI02.05.2007
LI02.05.2007
Cited inInternational search[A]US3570725  (BAKER ROBERT G, et al);
 [A]DE3421008  (BEHR & SOHN HERMANN [DE]);
 [A]US5887800  (MCCLOSKY STAN H [US]);
 [A]US5941463  (HERSTEK GLEN [US], et al);
 [A]US6053434  (FILIPSSON MATS [SE]);
 [A]US6325302  (GUZOWSKI RAYMOND J [US], et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.