EP1483781 - DIAGNOSTIC SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR INTEGRATED REMOTE TOOL ACCESS, DATA COLLECTION, AND CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.10.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.11.2014 [2014/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ILS Technology, Inc. 5300 Broken Sound Blvd., Suite 150 Boca Raton, FL 33487 / US | [2004/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PERRY, Stuart, T. 9315 Pinto Drive Lakeworth, FL 33467 / US | 02 /
VOICU, Mihai 619 NE 14th Avenue Hallendale, FL 33009 / US | 03 /
BARBOZA, Sunil 9639 Via Emilie Boca Raton, FL 33428 / US | 04 /
JAOUHAR, Charif 9733 Arbor oaks Lane 203 Boca Raton, FL 33428 / US | 05 /
KEEVER, John 1400 SW 21st Lane Boca Raton, FL 33486 / US | 06 /
DE LA ROSA, David 2681 NW 40th St. Boca Raton, FL 33434 / US | 07 /
HARIHARAN, Sivaram 4024 Sapphire Cove Weston, FL 33331 / US | 08 /
MACEAN, Adrian 212 Via D Este 1106 Delray Beach, FL 33445 / US | 09 /
WEBSTER, Jim 2572 SW 11th Court Boynton Beach, FL 33426 / US | 10 /
GU, Qingyi 825 NW 13 St. 105 Boca Raton, FL 33486 / US | 11 /
LIANG, Jenny 11169 NW 46th Dr. Coral Springs, FL 33076 / US | 12 /
JOHNSON, Lynette 13490 SW 29 St. Davie, FL 33330 / US | 13 /
HEMPSTEAD, Todd 12671 Yardley Dr. Boca Raton, FL 33428 / US | 14 /
GILLESPIE, Jason 1111 SW 5th Street Boca Raton, FL 33486 / US | 15 /
AUPPERLEE, Eric 27 Oneida Street Deer Park, NY 11729 / US | 16 /
WUSSOW, Wendy 1245 SW 5th Court Boca Raton, FL 33432 / US | 17 /
JORDAN, Sylviane 4649 Pinetree Drive Delray Beach, FL 33445 / US | [2005/13] |
Former [2004/50] | 01 /
PERRY, Stuart, T. 9315 Pinto Drive Lakeworth, FL 33467 / US | ||
02 /
VOICU, Mihai 619 NE 14th Avenue Hallendale, FL 33009 / US | |||
03 /
BARBOZA, Sunil 9639 Via Emilie Boca Raton, FL 33428 / US | |||
04 /
JAOUHAR, Charif 9733 Arbor oaks Lane 203 Boca Raton, FL 33428 / US | |||
05 /
KEEVER, John 1400 SW 21st Lane Boca Raton, FL 33486 / US | |||
06 /
DE LA ROSA, David 2681 NW 40th St. Boca Raton, FL 33434 / US | |||
07 /
HARIHARAN, Sivaram 4024 Sapphire Cove Weston, FL 33331 / US | |||
08 /
MACEAN, Adrian 212 Via D Este 1106 Delray Beach, FL 33445 / US | |||
09 /
WEBSTER, Jim 2572 SW 11th Court Boynton Beach, FL 33426 / US | |||
10 /
GU, Qingyi 825 NW 13 St. 105 Boca Raton, FL 33486 / US | |||
11 /
LIANG, Jenny 11169 NW 46th Dr. Coral Springs, FL 33076 / US | |||
12 /
JOHNSON, Lynette 13490 SW 29 St. Davie, FL 33330 / US | |||
13 /
HEMPSTEAD, Todd 12671 Yardley Dr. Boca Raton, FL 33428 / US | |||
14 /
GILLESPIE, Jason 22132 Boca Place Drive 1521 Boca Raton, FL 33433 / US | |||
15 /
AUPPERLEE, Eric 27 Oneida Street Deer Park, NY 11729 / US | |||
16 /
WUSSOW, Wendy 1245 SW 5th Court Boca Raton, FL 33432 / US | |||
17 /
JORDAN, Sylviane 4649 Pinetree Drive Delray Beach, FL 33445 / US | Representative(s) | Pearl Cohen Zedek Latzer Baratz UK LLP The Gridiron Building One Pancras Square London N1C 4AG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/10] | Pearl Cohen Zedek Latzer Baratz UK LLP 15 Old Bailey London EC4M 7EF / GB | ||
Former [2011/50] | Smee, Anthony James Michael, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | ||
Former [2009/25] | Smee, Anthony James Michael Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [2004/50] | Brunner, Michael John GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 03757238.5 | 12.03.2003 | [2004/50] | WO2003US07460 | Priority number, date | US20020363251P | 12.03.2002 Original published format: US 363251 P | [2004/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03105194 | Date: | 18.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/51] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1483781 | Date: | 08.12.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.12.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.08.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/00, G06F11/22 | [2012/17] | CPC: |
G05B19/4183 (EP,US);
G06Q50/00 (KR);
H04L67/535 (EP,US);
G06F11/2294 (EP,US);
G06Q20/382 (EP,US);
H04L67/14 (EP,US);
H04L9/40 (US);
G05B2219/31471 (EP,US);
G05B2219/31479 (EP,US);
G05B2219/32034 (EP,US);
G05B2219/32142 (EP,US);
G05B2223/06 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2004/50] | H01L21/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DIAGNOSESYSTEM UND VERFAHREN FÜR INTEGRIERTES FERNWERKZEUGZUGREIFEN, DATENSAMMELN UND STEUERN | [2004/50] | English: | DIAGNOSTIC SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR INTEGRATED REMOTE TOOL ACCESS, DATA COLLECTION, AND CONTROL | [2004/50] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE DIAGNOSTIC DESTINES A L'ACCES D'OUTILS DISTANTS INTEGRE, COLLECTE ET COMMANDE DE DONNEES | [2004/50] | Entry into regional phase | 23.09.2004 | National basic fee paid | 23.09.2004 | Search fee paid | 23.09.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.09.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/50] | 08.06.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/46] | 07.07.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/46] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.01.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0133759 (AVANTCOM NETWORK INC [US]) [X] 1-29,31,35-46 * page 1, line 22 - page 3, line 4 * * page 7, line 15 - page 9, line 30 * * page 11, line 5 - page 14, line 5 * * page 15, line 32 - page 16, line 22 * * page 17, line 18 - page 18, line 15; figures 2,5,10 *; | [A]US2001054044 (LIU YI BO [CN], et al) [A] 1-29,31,35-46* the whole document *; | [XA]US2002022969 (BERG MARC VAN DEN [US], et al) [X] 29 * the whole document * [A] 1-28,31,35-46; | [XA]US2002029086 (OGUSHI NOBUAKI [JP], et al) [X] 29 * page 1, paragraph 1 - paragraph 3 * * page 2, paragraph 19 - page 3, paragraph 38 * * page 3, paragraph 47 * * page 4, paragraph 50 - paragraph 58; figures 1,2,3,6,7 * [A] 1-28,31,35-46 | International search | [Y]US2001020195 (PATEL PARTHIV S [US], et al); | [A]US2001054044 (LIU YI BO [CN], et al); | [Y]US2002029086 (OGUSHI NOBUAKI [JP], et al) |