Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1558251

EP1558251 - METHOD OF TREATMENT OF PSYCHOLOGICAL CONDITIONS BY ADMINISTRATION OF NERVE GROWTH FACTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  02.02.2018
Database last updated on 19.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.02.2018Refusal of applicationpublished on 07.03.2018  [2018/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Milkhaus Laboratory, Inc.
70 Elm Street
Providence, RI 02903 / US
[2005/31]
Inventor(s)01 / MCMICHAEL, John
Corner of Westfall and Larry Hill Road, R.D. 1
Delanson, NY 12053 / US
02 / UNICE, Kenneth, A.
495 Pine Street
Meadville, PA 16335 / US
 [2005/31]
Representative(s)Walker, Ross Thomson , et al
Forresters IP LLP
Skygarden
Erika-Mann-Strasse 11
80636 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/16]Walker, Ross Thomson , et al
Forrester & Boehmert
SkyGarden
Erika-Mann-Strasse 11
80636 München / DE
Former [2012/13]Barton, Matthew Thomas , et al
Forrester & Boehmert
SkyGarden
Erika-Mann-Strasse 11
80636 München / DE
Former [2005/31]Brown, John David
FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date03759693.903.10.2003
[2005/31]
WO2003US31380
Priority number, dateUS20020424443P07.11.2002         Original published format: US 424443 P
US2003062432822.07.2003         Original published format: US 624328
[2005/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2004043462
Date:27.05.2004
Language:EN
[2004/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1558251
Date:03.08.2005
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.2004
[2005/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US27.05.2004
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.02.2007
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/44, A61K38/18, A61P25/24
[2007/13]
Former International [2005/31]A61K31/44
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/31]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON PSYCHOLOGISCHEN ERKRANKUNGEN DURCH VERABREICHUNG VON NERVENWACHSTUMSFAKTOR[2005/31]
English:METHOD OF TREATMENT OF PSYCHOLOGICAL CONDITIONS BY ADMINISTRATION OF NERVE GROWTH FACTOR[2005/31]
French:METHODE DE TRAITEMENT D'ETATS PSYCHOLOGIQUES PAR ADMINISTRATION DU FACTEUR DE CROISSANCE DU TISSU NERVEUX[2005/31]
Entry into regional phase19.04.2005National basic fee paid 
19.04.2005Search fee paid 
19.04.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
12.05.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.05.2005Examination requested  [2005/31]
02.05.2007Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.08.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.01.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.07.2012Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 03.07.2012
03.07.2012Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
05.10.2012Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/10]
23.10.2017Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/10]
Appeal following examination05.12.2012Appeal received No.  T1045/13
14.12.2012Statement of grounds filed
23.10.2017Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected
23.10.2017Date of oral proceedings
30.10.2017Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.08.2011
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
12.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
12.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
14.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
13.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
12.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
11.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 09
11.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 10
14.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 11
14.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 12
06.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 13
10.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 14
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.201513   M06   Fee paid on   06.04.2016
31.10.201715   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US2002049422  (BREWITT BARBARA A [US]) [X] 1,2,4,10-28 * page 3, paragraph 18; claim 1 * * page 4, paragraph 21 * * page 5, paragraph 28 *;
 [X]US6024734  (BREWITT BARBARA A [US]) [X] 1,2,4,10-28 * column 7, line 47 - line 63; claims 1,2,5 * * column 9, line 6 - line 49 * * column 10, line 42 - line 54 *
International search[X]US5154924  (FRIDEN PHILLIP [US]);
 [X]US2002028786  (FREY WILLIAM H [US], et al);
 [X]US2001052137  (KLEIN PETER S [US])